Official Committee of Tort Claimants v. PG&E Corporation et al
Not Classified By Court: Official Committee of Tort Claimants, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells
Appellant: Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund, City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System and Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellee: PG&E Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv04567
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Goldsmith (Goldsmith, David) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume VI of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume V of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume IV of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume III of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume II of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Appendix re #4 Appellant's Brief Volume I of VI filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF (Michelson, Randy) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 RECEIPT OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL in PDF Format: Record on Appeal Received and Attached at the Request of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record, #2 Record on Appeal Documents)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30088. File received electronically. Filed by City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System, Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund, Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Certificate of Service re Appeal, #3 Court's Certificate of Mailing, #4 Order Confirming Ch 11 Plan, #5 Docket Report Pt. 1, #6 Docket Report Pt. 2, #7 Docket Report Pt. 3, #8 Docket Report Pt. 4, #9 Docket Report Pt. 5)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Official Committee of Tort Claimants v. PG&E Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Tort Claimants
Represented By: Joseph M. Esmont
Represented By: Robert Alan Julian, Esq.
Represented By: Chris Bator
Represented By: Lauren T. Attard
Represented By: Kimberly S. Morris
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: John H. MacConaghy
Represented By: Cecily A. Dumas
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Represented By: Dustin Matthew Dow
Represented By: Eric R. Goodman
Represented By: Lars H. Fuller
Represented By: David John Richardson
Represented By: Elyssa S. Kates
Represented By: Kody D.L. Kleber
Represented By: Jorian L. Rose
Represented By: eric E. sagerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: James Cornell Behrens
Represented By: Gregory Allan Bray
Represented By: Samuel A. Khalil
Represented By: Thomas R. Kreller
Represented By: Pul S. Aronzon
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Dexter
Represented By: Alan J. Stone
Represented By: Andrew Michael Leblanc
Represented By: Dennis F. Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico
Represented By: James Leon Ostaszewski
Represented By: Carol C. Villegas
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Represented By: Thomas A. Dubbs
Represented By: Wendy Tsang
Represented By: Randy Michelson
Represented By: Jeffrey Dubbin
Represented By: Frank H. Busch
Represented By: Louis J Gottlieb
Represented By: Aram M Boghosian
Represented By: David J. Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund
Represented By: Hadiya Khan Deshmukh
Represented By: Willow E. Radcliffe
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: Brian Edward Cochran
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Hadiya Khan Deshmukh
Represented By: Willow E. Radcliffe
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: Brian Edward Cochran
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund
Represented By: Hadiya Khan Deshmukh
Represented By: Willow E. Radcliffe
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: Brian Edward Cochran
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Lynette C. Kelly
Represented By: Timothy S. Laffredi
Represented By: Cameron Gulden
Represented By: Marta Elena Villacorta
Represented By: Jason Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PG&E Corporation
Represented By: Andriana Georgallas
Represented By: Thomas B. Rupp
Represented By: Thomas Bogdan Rupp
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Max Africk
Represented By: Jane Kim
Represented By: Tobias S. Keller
Represented By: John Nolan
Represented By: Ray C. Schrock
Represented By: Kevin Kramer
Represented By: Timothy G. Cameron
Represented By: Katherine B Kohn
Represented By: Theodore Tsekerides
Represented By: Bradley Robert Schneider
Represented By: Jared R Friedmann
Represented By: Matthew Goren
Represented By: Stephen Karotkin
Represented By: Dara Levinson Silveira
Represented By: Paul H. Zumbro
Represented By: Omid H. Nasab
Represented By: Kevin Bostel
Represented By: Jessica Liou
Represented By: David Levine
Represented By: Richard W. Slack
Represented By: Kevin Orsini
Represented By: David A. Herman
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?