The International Church of the Foursquare Gospel et al v. PG&E Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Official Committee of Tort Claimants, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellant: The International Church of the Foursquare Gospel
Appellee: PG&E Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv04569
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #6 Stipulation SUSPENDING BRIEFING ON MERITS OF APPEAL PENDING RESOLUTION OF REORGANIZED DEBTORS #4 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020) Modified on 9/4/2020 to correct spacing (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SUSPENDING BRIEFING ON MERITS OF APPEAL PENDING RESOLUTION OF REORGANIZED DEBTORS 4 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by PG&E Corporation and The International Church of the Foursquare Gospel. (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 9/3/2020) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE RE #4 Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss as Moot the Appeal of the International Church of the Foursquare Gospel and Certain Camp Fire Victims. Notice is hereby given that the briefing set by counsel is reset as follows pursuant to Local Rule 7-3: Responses due by 9/9/2020 and Replies due by 9/16/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss as Moot the Appeal of the International Church of the Foursquare Gospel and Certain Camp Fire Victims filed by PG&E Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/2/2020. Replies due by 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of John Boken, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 8/26/2020) Modified on 8/27/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30088. File received. Filed by The International Church of the Foursquare Gospel. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Court's Certificate of Mailing, #3 Order Confirming Ch. 11 Plan, #4 Docket Report Pt. 1, #5 Docket Report Pt. 2, #6 Docket Report Pt. 3, #7 Docket Report Pt. 4, #8 Docket Report Pt. 5)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The International Church of the Foursquare Gospel et al v. PG&E Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Tort Claimants
Represented By: eric E. sagerman
Represented By: John H. MacConaghy
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Represented By: Chris Bator
Represented By: Lauren T. Attard
Represented By: Eric R. Goodman
Represented By: Kody D.L. Kleber
Represented By: Robert Alan Julian, Esq.
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Elyssa S. Kates
Represented By: Joseph M. Esmont
Represented By: Dustin Matthew Dow
Represented By: Jorian L. Rose
Represented By: David John Richardson
Represented By: Lars H. Fuller
Represented By: Kimberly S. Morris
Represented By: Cecily A. Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Paul S. Aronzon
Represented By: James Cornell Behrens
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Dexter
Represented By: Gregory Allan Bray
Represented By: Samuel A. Khalil
Represented By: Andrew Michael Leblanc
Represented By: Alan J. Stone
Represented By: Dennis F. Dunne
Represented By: Thomas R. Kreller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Jason Blumberg
Represented By: Timothy S. Laffredi
Represented By: Lynette C. Kelly
Represented By: Cameron Gulden
Represented By: Marta Elena Villacorta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The International Church of the Foursquare Gospel
Represented By: Joseph Anthony West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PG&E Corporation
Represented By: David Levine
Represented By: Jared R Friedmann
Represented By: Andriana Georgallas
Represented By: Dara Levinson Silveira
Represented By: Omid H. Nasab
Represented By: Katherine B Kohn
Represented By: Kevin Bostel
Represented By: Timothy G. Cameron
Represented By: Tobias S. Keller
Represented By: David A. Herman
Represented By: Kevin Orsini
Represented By: Stephen Karotkin
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldring
Represented By: Matthew Goren
Represented By: Ray C. Schrock
Represented By: Paul H. Zumbro
Represented By: Jessica Liou
Represented By: John Nolan
Represented By: Jane Kim
Represented By: Richard W. Slack
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Thomas B. Rupp
Represented By: Kevin Kramer
Represented By: Theodore Tsekerides
Represented By: Bradley Robert Schneider
Represented By: Thomas Bogdan Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?