Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors et al v. PG&E Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Official Committee of Tort Claimants, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Ad Hoc Committee of Holders of Trade Claims
Appellee: PG&E Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv04570
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew K. Kelsey. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David M. Feldman. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew D. McGill. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #9 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule. Appellant Brief due by 9/21/2020; Appellee Brief due by 10/21/2020; and Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/10/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. ***Disregard entered in error*** Each attorney must file their own Notice of Appearance. At this time the Pro Hac Vice applications for Feldman, Kelsey, McGill are still pending. [err102] Re: #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Ad Hoc Committee of Holders of Trade Claims. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Choi (Choi, Michelle) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing Schedule filed by Ad Hoc Committee of Holders of Trade Claims, PG&E Corporation. (Neumeister, Michael) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Scott Neumeister (Neumeister, Michael) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Matthew K. Kelsey) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 29978908.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/10/2019 filed by Ad Hoc Committee of Holders of Trade Claims. (Kelsey, Matthew) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (David M. Feldman) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 29978784.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/10/2019 filed by Ad Hoc Committee of Holders of Trade Claims. (Feldman, David) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Matthew D. McGill) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 29978952.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/10/2019 filed by Ad Hoc Committee of Holders of Trade Claims. (McGill, Matthew) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 RECEIPT OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL in PDF Format: Record on Appeal Received and Attached at the Request of the Court (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record, #2 Single PDF Document to Transmit a ROA to Dist Ct)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30088. File received. Filed by Ad Hoc Committee of Holders of Trade Claims. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Court's Certificate of Mailing, #3 Order Confirming Ch. 11 Plan, #4 Memorandum Decision, #5 Memorandum Decision re Postpetition Interest, #6 Interlocutory Order, #7 Docket Report Pt. 1, #8 Docket Report Pt. 2, #9 Docket Report Pt. 3, #10 Docket Report Pt. 4, #11 Docket Report Pt. 5)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors et al v. PG&E Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Tort Claimants
Represented By: John H. MacConaghy
Represented By: eric E. sagerman
Represented By: Chris Bator
Represented By: Eric R. Goodman
Represented By: Lauren T. Attard
Represented By: Robert Alan Julian, Esq.
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Represented By: Elyssa S. Kates
Represented By: Joseph M. Esmont
Represented By: Dustin Matthew Dow
Represented By: Jorian L. Rose
Represented By: Kody D.L. Kleber
Represented By: David John Richardson
Represented By: Lars H. Fuller
Represented By: Kimberly S. Morris
Represented By: Cecily A. Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Dennis F. Dunne
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Dexter
Represented By: Gregory Allan Bray
Represented By: Paul S. Aronzon
Represented By: James Cornell Behrens
Represented By: Andrew Michael Leblanc
Represented By: Alan J. Stone
Represented By: Thomas R. Kreller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Jason Blumberg
Represented By: Timothy S. Laffredi
Represented By: Lynette C. Kelly
Represented By: Cameron Gulden
Represented By: Marta Elena Villacorta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ad Hoc Committee of Holders of Trade Claims
Represented By: Michael Scott Neumeister
Represented By: Michelle Choi
Represented By: Matthew Dempsey McGill
Represented By: David Michael Feldman
Represented By: Matthew K. Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PG&E Corporation
Represented By: David Levine
Represented By: Jared R Friedmann
Represented By: Andriana Georgallas
Represented By: Dara Levinson Silveira
Represented By: Tobias S. Keller
Represented By: Omid H. Nasab
Represented By: Katherine B Kohn
Represented By: Timothy G. Cameron
Represented By: Kevin Bostel
Represented By: David A. Herman
Represented By: Matthew Goren
Represented By: Thomas Bogdan Rupp
Represented By: Kevin Orsini
Represented By: Stephen Karotkin
Represented By: Ray C. Schrock
Represented By: Paul H. Zumbro
Represented By: Jessica Liou
Represented By: John Nolan
Represented By: Jane Kim
Represented By: Richard W. Slack
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldring
Represented By: Kevin Kramer
Represented By: Theodore Tsekerides
Represented By: Bradley Robert Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?