The Regents of the University of California v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Matthew Albence, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 4:2020cv04621
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT BY SEPTEMBER 4, 2020 AND EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINE. Responses due by 10/13/2020. Status Report due by 9/4/2020. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 6, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 4, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:20-cv-04621-JST. Re:[2 5] Status Report filed by The Regents of the University of California (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 25 JOINT STATUS REPORT by The Regents of the University of California, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf and Matthew Albence. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/4/2020) Modified on 8/5/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT BY AUGUST 4, 2020 re (18 in 4:20-cv-04592-JST) Status Report filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, State of California, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf, Matthew Albence. Status Report due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 23, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (16) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-04592-JST; granting (21) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-04621-JSW. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 7/21/2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Matthew Albence, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf, The Regents of the University of California. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 7/14/2020) Modified on 7/15/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2020 Filing 20 Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Orders by The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chun, A.) (Filed on 7/14/2020) Modified on 7/15/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Responses due by 7/16/2020. Replies due by 7/20/2020. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 14, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RELATING CASE 20-cv-04621-JSW to 20-cv-04592-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 14, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Regents of the University of California re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Doe Nos. 1-4 to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by The Regents of the University of California. Responses due by 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Motion for Doe Nos. 1-4 to Proceed Under Pseudonym)(Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiff The Regents of The University of California's Administrative Motion for Order Shortening Time Re: Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Motion to Shorten Time)(Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Regents of the University of California. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/16/2020. Replies due by 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Doe No. 1, #2 Declaration of Doe No. 2, #3 Declaration of Doe No. 3, #4 Declaration of Doe No. 4, #5 Declaration of Iyengar, #6 Plaintiff RJN iso Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Exhibit A - RJN, #8 Exhibit B - RJN, #9 Exhibit C - RJN, #10 Exhibit D - RJN, #11 Exhibit E - RJN, #12 Exhibit F - RJN, #13 Exhibit G - RJN, #14 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by The Regents of the University of California. (Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/13/2020) Modified on 7/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Shorten Time and Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff to serve Defendants with Order. Responses due 12:00 by 7/17/2020. Replies due by 2:00 p.m. 7/20/2020. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 13, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/13/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Matthew Albence, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf.(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Regents of the University of California.. (Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Shorten Time (Plaintiff The Regents of The University of Californias Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time Re: Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction) filed by The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Motion for Order Shortening Time)(Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte Application (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) filed by The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alcocer, #2 Declaration of Beck, #3 Declaration of Byington, #4 Declaration of Christ, #5 Exhibit A to Christ Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Christ Declaration, #7 Declaration of Deas, #8 Declaration of Schooley, #9 Declaration of Wakimoto, #10 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for TRO, #11 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff TRO and Order to Show Cause)(Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Regents of the University of California (Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons) (Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Regents of the University of California ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14680182.). Filed byThe Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Romano, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/10/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Regents of the University of California v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Jennifer Salzman Romano
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Represented By: Molly A. Jones
Represented By: Allison Margaret Woodall
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Represented By: Sonya Una Sanchez
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?