Benjamin v. Unum Life Insurance Company Of America et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Benjamin
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company Of America and Genus Lifesciences Inc. Health And Welfare Plan
Case Number: 4:2020cv04703
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re #17 Notice (Other) filed by Wendy Benjamin. Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 1, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement by Wendy Benjamin (Chandler, Corinne) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO DISMISS GENUS LIFESCIENCES, INC., HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #12 Stipulation.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/24/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Genus Lifesciences Inc. Health And Welfare Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company Of America. (Ingram, Grant) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wendy Benjamin.. (Chandler, Corinne) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS filed by Unum Life Insurance Company Of America. (Blohm, Nicole) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendy Benjamin. Unum Life Insurance Company Of America served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Chandler, Corinne) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Genus Lifesciences Inc. Health And Welfare Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company Of America. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wendy Benjamin (Chandler, Corinne) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Chandler, Corinne) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14690493.). Filed byWendy Benjamin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chandler, Corinne) (Filed on 7/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. Unum Life Insurance Company Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
Represented By: Nicole Yvette Blohm
Represented By: Grant Edward Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genus Lifesciences Inc. Health And Welfare Plan
Represented By: Grant Edward Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Benjamin
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?