The Typewritorium Company v. The Travelers Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America and The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04816
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kupec, #2 Exhibit 1 to Kupec Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Proposed Order)(Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Lack of Standing; Failure to State a Claim for Relief filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Skjerven, #2 Declaration of Kupec, #3 Exhibit 1 to Kupec Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen E. Goldman.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Stephen E. Goldman) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14917458.) filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Goldman, Stephen) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Wystan Ackerman.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14911530.) filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ackerman, Wystan) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION for 30 Day Extension to Respond to Complaint (LR 6-1(a)) filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America and Typewritorium Company. (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2020) Modified on 8/7/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (30 day extension requested) filed by The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew B. Downs, #2 Exhibit A to Downs declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Downs declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Downs declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Beth Oliver (Oliver, Linda) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Downs (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2020 02:00 PM. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems. The Travelers Companies, Inc. served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/31/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems.. (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry K. Cimmet and John M. Kelson (Cimmet, Jerry) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Travelers Companies, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14707266.). Filed byThe Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Typewritorium Company v. The Travelers Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Stephen Edward Goldman
Represented By: Wystan M Ackerman
Represented By: Andrew B. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward Goldman
Represented By: Wystan M Ackerman
Represented By: Andrew B. Downs
Represented By: Linda Beth Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Typewritorium Company dba A2Z Business Systems
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Jerry K. Cimmet
Represented By: John M. Kelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?