Russo et al v. Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: Frank D. Russo, Sumner Davenport & Associates, LLC and Koonan Litigation Consulting, LLC
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv04818
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 1/11/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website: www.cand.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #21 Stipulation. Response to complaint/Motions due by 10/5/2020. Responses due by 10/26/2020. Replies due by 11/9/2020. Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 12/1/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Microsoft Corporation, Sumner Davenport & Associates, LLC, Frank D. Russo, and Koonan Litigation Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2020) Modified on 8/19/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Priyamvada Arora (Arora, Priyamvada) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitty Somvichian (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John W. Barrett. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/17/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Yvette Golan. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/17/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 **ATTACHMENT INCOMPLETE. SEE DKT. NO. 19 FOR CORRECT ENTRY.*** ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Yvette Golan. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (fs, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***ATTACHMENT INCOMPLETE. SEE DKT. NO. 20 FOR CORRECT ENTRY"** ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John W. Barrett. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (fs, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Yvette Golan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14817412.) filed by Koonan Litigation Consulting, LLC, Frank D. Russo, Sumner Davenport & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Good Standing)(Golan, Yvette) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials YGR immediately after the case number. No furthe r action is necessary. Re: #12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of John W. Barrett ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14810472.) filed by Frank D. Russo, Koonan Litigation Consulting, LLC, Sumner Davenport & Associates, LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of John W. Barrett ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14810472.) filed by Koonan Litigation Consulting, LLC, Frank D. Russo, Sumner Davenport & Associates, LLC. (Barrett, John) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent of Microsoft Corporation on July 29, 2020, filed by Koonan Litigation Consulting, LLC, Frank D. Russo, Sumner Davenport & Associates, LLC. (Bryant, Arthur) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Koonan Litigation Consulting, LLC, Frank D. Russo, Sumner Davenport & Associates, LLC.. (Bryant, Arthur) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/22/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Recusal by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14707420.). Filed byFrank D. Russo, Sumner Davenport & Associates, LLC, Koonan Litigation Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russo et al v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank D. Russo
Represented By: Todd Walburg
Represented By: Arthur H. Bryant
Represented By: Yvette Y Golan
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sumner Davenport & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Todd Walburg
Represented By: Arthur H. Bryant
Represented By: Yvette Y Golan
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koonan Litigation Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Todd Walburg
Represented By: Arthur H. Bryant
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Yvette Y Golan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Represented By: Priyamvada Arora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?