Kohn v. State Bar of California et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Kohn
Defendant: State Bar of California and California Committee of Bar Examiners
Case Number: 4:2020cv04827
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 33 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #29 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction) filed by California Committee of Bar Examiners, State Bar of California. (Holloway, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/14/2020) Modified on 9/15/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2020 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT against California Committee of Bar Examiners, State Bar of California. Filed by Benjamin Kohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Claim)(Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 9/7/2020) Modified on 9/8/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton re: #30 Motion for Leave to File.(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2020)
September 1, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Motion for Leave to file. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. R e: #30 Amended Complaint filed by Benjamin Kohn (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Benjamin Kohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Claim)(Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2020 Filing 29 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Benjamin Kohn. Responses due by 9/14/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Denial of Accommodations from Bar)(Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 28 Defendants' REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed by California Committee of Bar Examiners, State Bar of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Further Declaration of Lisa Jeong Cummins in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Holloway, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byBenjamin Kohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Claim)(Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Kohn re #23 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Opposition (re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction) filed by Benjamin Kohn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's declaration under penalty of perjury, #2 Affidavit Dr. Clarke's affidavit, #3 Affidavit Plaintiff's administrative addendum)(Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, filed by California Committee of Bar Examiners, State Bar of California. Responses due by 8/24/2020. Replies due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lisa Jeong Cummins in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Declaration Declaration of John Adams in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Holloway, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT from: U.S. Marshal Service as to State Bar of California, California Committee of Bar Examiners re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #13 Order, #18 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCalifornia Committee of Bar Examiners, State Bar of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John Adams in Support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Declaration of Lisa Jeong Cummins in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Holloway, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to California Committee of Bar Examiners, State Bar of California. (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 ***CLERKS'S ERROR, INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED, RE-FILED AT. DKT #20 *** Summons Issued as to California Committee of Bar Examiners, State Bar of California. (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 #Electronic filing error Re: #16 Exhibits filed by Benjamin Kohn, #15 Exhibits filed by Benjamin Kohn, #17 Declaration in Support filed by Benjamin Kohn. Judge name or initials are missing or incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on all future filings: 4:20-cv-04827-PJH (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 Declaration in Support of #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed byBenjamin Kohn. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 EXHIBITS re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byBenjamin Kohn. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBITS re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byBenjamin Kohn. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Re: #11 Exhibits filed by Benjamin Kohn. & #12 Exhibits filed by Benjamin Kohn.No title Page. Proof of Service e-filed separately and not as an a ttachment, requires a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 regarding first page requirement. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/21/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 EXHIBITS filed byBenjamin Kohn. (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 EXHIBITS filed byBenjamin Kohn. (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 7/20/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Kohn (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: No title Page. Certificate of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, requires a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. [err201] Re: #6 Certificate of Service filed by Benjamin Kohn. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Kohn (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Benjamin Kohn. (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Benjamin Kohn. Responses due by 8/3/2020. Replies due by 8/10/2020. (Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/18/2020)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against State Bar of California, California Committee of Bar Examiners. Filed by Benjamin Kohn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Selvagn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/18/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kohn v. State Bar of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of California
Represented By: Kenneth John Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Committee of Bar Examiners
Represented By: Kenneth John Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Kohn
Represented By: Matthew M Selvagn, Matth
Represented By: Matthew M. Selvagn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?