Galliani et al v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Raymond Galliani and Sharon Galliani
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2020cv04863
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 10/1/2020. Replies due by 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Coen, #2 Proposed Order)(Kunofsky, Ari) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Internal Revenue Service.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kunofsky, Ari) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ) filed byRaymond Galliani, Sharon Galliani. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin C. Koodrich)(Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ari D. Kunofsky, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(Kunofsky, Ari) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Raymond Galliani, Sharon Galliani.. (Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Other New Case Documents by Personal Service served on Wendy Garbers on July 21, 2020, filed by Raymond Galliani, Sharon Galliani. (Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Other New Case Documents by Certified Mail served on Internal Revenue Service and Attorney General of the United States on July 21, 2020, filed by Raymond Galliani, Sharon Galliani. (Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Raymond Galliani, Sharon Galliani (Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Internal Revenue Service ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14713060.). Filed byRaymond Galliani, Sharon Galliani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galliani et al v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Galliani
Represented By: Benjamin C. Koodrich
Represented By: Jon David Feldhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Galliani
Represented By: Benjamin C. Koodrich
Represented By: Jon David Feldhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Ari David Kunofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?