Harrison v. Whole Foods Market
Plaintiff: Patrina Harrison
Defendant: Whole Foods Market
Case Number: 4:2020cv04867
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patrina Harrison. Service waived by Whole Foods Market waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transmittal Sheet)(Harrison, Patrina) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Do not Use Summons Returned Executed to File this Document. You must use WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. The E vent Can be Found Under: Civil Events - Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process - Waiver of Service Executed. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: #17 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Patrina Harrison. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrina Harrison. All Parties. CORRECTION of [DKt. 16] by [DKt. 17], WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patrina Harrison. Service waived by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover)(Harrison, Patrina) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 10, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The Correct Event Can be Found Under: Civil Events Initial Pleadings and Service Service of Process Waiver of Service E xecuted. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #16 Summons Returned Executed filed by Patrina Harrison. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 ***WRONG EVENT USED, DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrina Harrison. All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Sheet)(Harrison, Patrina) (Filed on 9/10/2020) Modified on 9/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Patrina Harrison Regarding Rule 26(f) Meeting. (Harrison, Patrina) (Filed on 8/23/2020)
August 23, 2020 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Patrina Harrison. (Harrison, Patrina) (Filed on 8/23/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 ADR Remark: The ADR Unit is in receipt of ECF No. #11 , Request for ADR Phone Conference. Please note an ADR Phone Conference will not be scheduled until Defendant has appeared. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Harrison, Patrina) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for ADR Phone Conference (Harrison, Patrina) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Service of Request to Waive Summons by Patrina Harrison. (Harrison, Patrina) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrina Harrison. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Pre-Suit Notice Letter from Patrina Harrison to Whole Foods Market. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Lawsuit and REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Whole Foods Market on 07/17/20 by Patrina Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Waiver)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Patrina Harrison. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patrina Harrison. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Patrina Harrison. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process against Whole Foods Market. Filed by Patrina Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Whole Foods Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrina Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?