Haletky v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Nina Haletky
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04879
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/24/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 11:00 AM. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020) Modified on 8/21/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc's ANSWER to Complaint byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Christine Davidson for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Partial Dismissal as to Codefendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.) by Nina Haletky (Alsina-Batista, Carlos) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nina Haletky. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Alsina-Batista, Carlos) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nina Haletky. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Alsina-Batista, Carlos) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nina Haletky.. (Alsina-Batista, Carlos) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Experian Information Solutions, Inc.)(Alsina-Batista, Carlos) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14716501.). Filed byNina Haletky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alsina-Batista, Carlos) (Filed on 7/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haletky v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey Christine Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Haletky
Represented By: Carlos C Alsina-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?