Starratt v. TFC Credit Corporation of California et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Starratt
Defendant: Joben Enterprises, Inc. and TFC Credit Corporation of California
Case Number: 4:2020cv04896
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joben Enterprises, Inc., TFC Credit Corporation of California.. (Ito, Peter) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Joben Enterprises, Inc., TFC Credit Corporation of California. (Ito, Peter) (Filed on 8/21/2020) Modified on 8/26/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Starratt.. (Alsina-Batista, Carlos) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 01:30 PM. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Joben Enterprises, Inc., TFC Credit Corporation of California. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 ***WRONG PDF ATTACHED, SEE DOCKET ENTRY #6 *** Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) Modified on 7/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Alsina-Batista, Carlos) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Joben Enterprises, Inc., TFC Credit Corporation of California ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14720232.). Filed byLisa Starratt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alsina-Batista, Carlos) (Filed on 7/22/2020) Modified on 7/24/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starratt v. TFC Credit Corporation of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joben Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TFC Credit Corporation of California
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Starratt
Represented By: Carlos C Alsina-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?