Canyon Capital Advisors LLC v. PG&E Corporation
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Not Classified By Court: Official Committee of Tort Claimants, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells
Appellant: Canyon Capital Advisors LLC
Appellee: PG&E Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv04949
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Appellant's BRIEF Appellee Brief due by 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appellant's Appendix of Documents Part I, #2 Appendix Appellant's Appendix of Documents Part II, #3 Appendix Appellant's Appendix of Additional Authorities)(Murphy, Bennett) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Rescheduling Hearing on Motion to Dismiss re #6 Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss Appeal by Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC filed by PG&E Corporation. Responses due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore E. Tsekerides, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss Appeal by Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC filed by PG&E Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/25/2020. Replies due by 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore E. Tsekerides, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 RECEIPT OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL in PDF Format: Record on Appeal Received and Attached at the Request of the Court re appeal #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record, #2 Record on Appeal Documents)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 ***DISREGARD, E-FILED IN THE WRONG CASE** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2020. Total Time in Court: 21 Minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney: Avi Kaufman. Defendant Attorney: Esteban Morales Fabila. Plaintiffs unopposed motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement (docket no. 69 ) is argued by the parties. Parties are directed to meet and confer and e-file by August 6th 1) a stipulated proposed revision to release language in the settlement agreement and 2) further detail regarding the policies and procedures that constitute injunctive relief for the class members. The motion will be deemed submitted upon receipt of the August 6th filings. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Jennifer Nassiri. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Ca nyon Capital Advisors LLC). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Bennett Murphy. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Cany on Capital Advisors LLC). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number USBC, San Francisco, 19-30088. File received. Filed by Canyon Capital Advisors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Memorandum Decision, #3 Order Confirming Ch. 11 Plan, #4 Certificate of Service of Jennifer Nassiri, #5 Court Certificate of Mailing, #6 Docket Report - Part 1, #7 Docket Report - Part 2, #8 Docket Report - Part 3, #9 Docket Report - Part 4, #10 Docket Report - Part 5, #11 Docket Report - Part 6, #12 Docket Report - Part 7, #13 Docket Report - Part 8, #14 Docket Report - Part 9, #15 Docket Report - Part 10, #16 Docket Report - Part 11, #17 Docket Report - Part 12, #18 Docket Report - Part 13, #19 Docket Report - Part 14, #20 Docket Report - Part 15, #21 Docket Report - Part 16, #22 Docket Report - Part 17, #23 Docket Report - Part 18, #24 Docket Report - Part 19, #25 Docket Report - Part 20, #26 Docket Report - Part 21, #27 Docket Report - Part 22, #28 Docket Report - Part 23)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canyon Capital Advisors LLC v. PG&E Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Represented By: Cameron Gulden
Represented By: Jason Blumberg
Represented By: Timothy S. Laffredi
Represented By: Lynette C. Kelly
Represented By: Marta Elena Villacorta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Tort Claimants
Represented By: Chris Bator
Represented By: Eric R. Goodman
Represented By: Lauren T. Attard
Represented By: Robert Alan Julian, Esq.
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Lars H. Fuller
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Green
Represented By: Elyssa S. Kates
Represented By: Joseph M. Esmont
Represented By: Dustin Matthew Dow
Represented By: John Harrington MacConaghy, Esq.
Represented By: Kody D.L. Kleber
Represented By: David John Richardson
Represented By: Jorian L. Rose
Represented By: Kimberly S. Morris
Represented By: Cecily A. Dumas
Represented By: eric E. sagerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Dennis F. Dunne
Represented By: Pul S. Aronzon
Represented By: James Cornell Behrens
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Dexter
Represented By: Gregory Allan Bray
Represented By: Samuel A. Khalil
Represented By: Andrew Michael Leblanc
Represented By: Alan J. Stone
Represented By: Thomas R. Kreller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Canyon Capital Advisors LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lynne Nassiri
Represented By: Bennett J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PG&E Corporation
Represented By: David Levine
Represented By: David A. Herman
Represented By: Jared R Friedmann
Represented By: Dara Levinson Silveira
Represented By: Tobias S. Keller
Represented By: Omid H. Nasab
Represented By: Katherine B Kohn
Represented By: Timothy G. Cameron
Represented By: Kevin Bostel
Represented By: Matthew Goren
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Thomas Bogdan Rupp
Represented By: Kevin Orsini
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldring
Represented By: Ray C. Schrock
Represented By: Paul H. Zumbro
Represented By: Jessica Liou
Represented By: John Nolan
Represented By: Jane Kim
Represented By: Richard W. Slack
Represented By: Stephen Karotkin
Represented By: Kevin Kramer
Represented By: Andriana Georgallas
Represented By: Theodore Tsekerides
Represented By: Bradley Robert Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?