Simmons v. Ripple Labs Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Simmons
Defendant: Ripple Labs Inc., Bradley Garlinghouse and XRP II, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv05127
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE AND CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/21/2020. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from New York Southern; Case: 1:20cv02236. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 01:30 PM. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02236. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California.(ama)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO TRANSFER CASE TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED, AND REQUESTED by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff Daniel Simmons and Defendants Ripple Labs Inc., XRP II LLC, and Mr. Bradley Garlinghouse, that this action be transferred to the Northern District of California. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/24/2020) (ama)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Stipulation and Consent to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., XRP II LLC..(Marshall, Damien)
July 1, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Telephone Conference held on 7/1/2020. Plaintiff's and Defendants' counsel appeared by telephone. Defendants are granted leave to file a motion to dismiss with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due July 22, 2020; opposition due August 12, 2020; and reply due August 19, 2020. (Motions due by 7/22/2020., Replies due by 8/19/2020., Responses due by 8/12/2020). (jar)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Zenner Michaelson on behalf of Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., XRP II LLC..(Michaelson, Andrew)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Damien Jerome Marshall on behalf of Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., XRP II LLC. New Address: King & Spalding LLP, 1185 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, 10036, 212-790-5357..(Marshall, Damien)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ross E. Pitcoff dated 05/19/2020 re: #7 LETTER MOTION for Conference Request for Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Damien J. Marshall dated May 14, 2020. . Document filed by Daniel Simmons..(Pitcoff, Ross)
May 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/20/2020 (jwh)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Conference: The application is GRANTED. The plaintiff is directed to respond to the defendants' letter by Wednesday, May 20, 2020. The parties are further directed to appear for a pre-motion teleconference on July 1, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. The parties may dial (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 302 9857 at that time. (Telephone Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/15/2020) (jwh)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference Request for Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Damien J. Marshall dated May 14, 2020. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., XRP II LLC..(Marshall, Damien)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED, AND REQUESTED by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff Daniel Simmons and Defendants Ripple Labs Inc., XRP II LLC, and Mr. Bradley Garlinghouse, that the deadline for Defendants to serve an answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed on March 12, 2020 in the above-captioned case shall be extended from April 2, 2020 to June 3, 2020. There have been no prior extensions. Granting this extension will not alter the date of any event or deadline fixed by the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Bradley Garlinghouse answer due 6/3/2020; Ripple Labs Inc. answer due 6/3/2020; XRP II LLC answer due 6/3/2020., Motions terminated: #4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Damien J. Marshall dated March 19, 2020. filed by Ripple Labs Inc., XRP II LLC, Bradley Garlinghouse. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/19/2020) (kv)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., XRP II LLC..(pne)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Damien J. Marshall dated March 19, 2020. Document filed by Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., XRP II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation).(Marshall, Damien)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ripple Labs, Inc., XRP II, LLC and Bradley Garlinghouse, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel Simmons..(Pitcoff, Ross)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pitcoff, Ross)
March 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ross Evan Pitcoff to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; the summons request should not be filed as an attachment to another document. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
March 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Ross Evan Pitcoff. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
March 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ross Evan Pitcoff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement); Dollar Demand $11,920,622,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 850 (Securities/Commodities); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $119,000; the County code has been modified to Queens. (pne)
March 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bradley Garlinghouse, Ripple Labs Inc., XRP II LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19098597)Document filed by Daniel Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons).(Pitcoff, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Ripple Labs Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Simmons
Represented By: Ross Evan Pitcoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ripple Labs Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Zenner Michaelson
Represented By: Damien Jerome Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Garlinghouse
Represented By: Andrew Zenner Michaelson
Represented By: Damien Jerome Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XRP II, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Zenner Michaelson
Represented By: Damien Jerome Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?