Fennix v. Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharon Fennix
Defendant: Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv05207
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the hearing on the pending motions to remand #9 and to dismiss #8 are continued to October 1, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Judicial Notice Re: #15 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc. (Wang, Shirley) (Filed on 8/26/2020) Modified on 8/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF SHARON FENNIXS COMPLAINT ) filed byTenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc.. (Wang, Shirley) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the hearings on Plaintiff's motion to remand #8 and Defendant's motion to dismiss, currently set for September 10, 2020, are continued to September 24, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. The parties will receive instructions for the remote hearings prior to that date. The briefing schedules shall remain unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Remand ) filed bySharon Fennix. (Feghali, Allen) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Remand ) filed byTenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc.. (Wang, Shirley) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF SHARON FENNIXS COMPLAINT ) filed bySharon Fennix. (Feghali, Allen) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF SHARON FENNIXS COMPLAINT filed byTenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc.. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Wang, Shirley) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF SHARON FENNIXS COMPLAINT filed by Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2020 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 8/19/2020. Replies due by 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF JAIME QUIJANO, #2 Proposed Order)(Wang, Shirley) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand filed by Sharon Fennix. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2020 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 8/19/2020. Replies due by 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feghali, Allen) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc... (Wang, Shirley) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sharon Fennix.. (Feghali, Allen) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sharon Fennix (Feghali, Allen) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc. (Wang, Shirley) (Filed on 7/30/2020) Modified on 7/31/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/28/20 20. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Name of Interested Entities must be entered. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[1-4] Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-584834. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14750305). Filed by Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jaime Quijano in support of removal, #3 Declaration Declaration of Shirley Wang in support of removal, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities)(Wang, Shirley) (Filed on 7/29/2020) Modified on 7/30/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fennix v. Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Fennix
Represented By: Allen Victor Feghali
Represented By: Kane Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Shirley C. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?