Shinjin Vapor LLC v. Bolt USA, LLC
Plaintiff: SHIJIN VAPOR LLC
Defendant: BOLT USA, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv05238
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. You are hereby notified that the hearing re #12 Motion to Dismiss or for Transfer of Venue is VACATED. The matter is taken under submission on the papers. In the event that the court determines that oral argument is necessary, the court will issue a notice to the parties with instructions on the hearing procedure at a future date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byBolt USA, LLC. (Myers, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case ) Certificate of Service, Per the Court's Request with Proper Division and Initials filed byShijin Vapor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl of Doan, #2 Declaration Decl of Aditya, #3 Declaration Decl of Prada)(Kamarei, Ali) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Document has incorrect case number]
September 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401]. Case number, Judge's initials and divisional office are incorrect. Correct case number is: 4:20-cv-05238- PJH - Oakland Division. Please make corrections and re-file in its entirety Re: #16 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Shijin Vapor LLC (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 9, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re:[1 6] Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Shijin Vapor LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY - COUNSEL TO RE-FILE WITH CORRECT CASE NUMBER AND DIVISIONAL OFFICE*** OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case ) and Certificate of Service filed byShijin Vapor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tony Doan ISO Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Adita Vaidya ISO Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration of Marisella Prada ISO Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Kamarei, Ali) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/11/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re:[1 5] Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Bolt USA, LLC, #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Bolt USA, LLC, #13 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Bolt USA, LLC, #14 Declaration in Support filed by Bolt USA, LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bolt USA, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Nisar Mohammed for Bolt USA, LLC. (Myers, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Nisar Mohammed in Support of #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byBolt USA, LLC. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Myers, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byBolt USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Myers, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Motion and MOTION to Dismiss or for Transfer of Venue filed by Bolt USA, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 9/9/2020. Replies due by 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Myers, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/26/2020) Modified on 9/22/2020 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shijin Vapor LLC Proof of Service of Summons (Kamarei, Ali) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/17/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 8/17/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SHIJIN VAPOR LLC.. (Kamarei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2020 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BOLT USA, LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Kamarei, Ali) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by SHIJIN VAPOR LLC Certificate of Interested Parties (Kamarei, Ali) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOLT USA, LLC by Plaintiff SHIJIN VAPOR, LLC against SHIJIN VAPOR LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14754334.). Filed bySHIJIN VAPOR LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7 to Complaint, #2 Summons Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Kamarei, Ali) (Filed on 7/30/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinjin Vapor LLC v. Bolt USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIJIN VAPOR LLC
Represented By: Ali Kamarei, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOLT USA, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Duane Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?