In re: PG&E Corporation et al v. Fire Victum Trust et al
Appellant: Northern Recycling and Waste Services, LLC/Northern Holdings, LLC, Adventist Health, Paradise Unified School District, Napa County Recycling & Waste Services, LLC/Napa Recycling & Waste Services, LLC and Comcast
Debtor In Possession: In re: PG&E Corporation and Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Appellee: Reorganized Debtors, Fire Victum Trust and Official Committee of Tort Claimants
Case Number: 4:2020cv05414
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion of the Fire Victim Trustee and the Official Committee of Tort Claimants to Dismiss as Moot the Appeal of Paradise Unified School District, et al filed by Fire Victum Trust, Official Committee of Tort Claimants. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/16/2020. Replies due by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Molton, David) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Eric Goodman) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15000485.) filed by Fire Victum Trust. (Goodman, Eric) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission Of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Marek Krzyzowski) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15000250.) filed by Fire Victum Trust. (Krzyzowski, Marek) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission Of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Susan Sieger-Grimm) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14999868.) filed by Fire Victum Trust. (Sieger-Grimm, Susan) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #21 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply. Appellant Brief due by 10/5/2020; Appellee Brief due by 11/20/2020; and Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/21/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Reply filed by Comcast, Adventist Health, Fire Victim Trust, Paradise Unified School District, Northern Recycling and Waste Services, LLC/Northern Holdings, LLC, Napa County Recycling & Waste Services, LLC/Napa Recycling & Waste Services, LLC, . (Goldblatt, Craig) (Filed on 9/3/2020) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 Transmission of Documents on Appeal: Correction to include (Dkt.#8579) the Appellee Designation for Counter-Designation of the Record on Appeal, filed By Appellee Fire Victim Trustee in the Appeal, filed by Appellant Theresa Ann McDonald, related to (Dkt. #8643). (Attachments: #1 Appelee Counter- Designation)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 Transmission of Documents on Appeal: Please disregard (dkt. #8588), the Counter-Designation of the Record on Appeal, filed by Appellee Fire Victim Trustee in the Appeal, filed by Appellants Adventist Health, The Paradise and Napa Entities, and Comcast was inadvertently transmitted in error, related to (dkt. #8643). (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 18 Transmission of Documents on Appeal: Correction to include the Appellee Designation for Counter-Designation of the Record on Appeal, filed By Appellee Fire Victim Trustee In The Appeal, filed by Appellants Adventist Health, The Paradise and Napa Entities, and Comcast, related to (Dkt. #8707). (Attachments: #1 Counter- Designation of the Record on Appeal)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Lauren Lifland. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Joel W.L. Millar. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Danielle Spinelli. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Craig Goldblatt. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Lauren Lifland ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14816343.) filed by Comcast. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lifland, Lauren) (Filed on 8/14/2020) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Joel W.L. Millar ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14816308.) filed by Comcast. (Attachments: #1 New York Certificate of Good Standing, #2 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing)(Millar, Joel) (Filed on 8/14/2020) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Danielle Spinelli ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14816262.) filed by Comcast. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Spinelli, Danielle) (Filed on 8/14/2020) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Craig Goldblatt ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14816211.) filed by Comcast. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldblatt, Craig) (Filed on 8/14/2020) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Thomas Casamassima (Casamassima, Christopher) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Local co-counsel Must Appear on the Docket. Additionally, Counsel in New York doesnt qualify to be local co-counsel. [err201]This filing will not be p rocessed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Craig Goldblatt filed by Comcast, #7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Joel W.L. Millar filed by Comcast, #8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14809597.) filed by Comcast, #6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Danielle Spinelli filed by Comcast (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 *** Document Refiled at #13 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Lauren Lifland ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14809597.) filed by Comcast. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lifland, Lauren) (Filed on 8/13/2020) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 *** Document Refiled at #12 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Joel W.L. Millar (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14792986) filed by Comcast. (Attachments: #1 New York Certificate of Good Standing, #2 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing)(Millar, Joel) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 *** Document Refiled at #11 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Danielle Spinelli (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14792969) filed by Comcast. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Spinelli, Danielle) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 ***Document Refiled at #10 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Craig Goldblatt (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14792876.) filed by Comcast. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldblatt, Craig) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 RECEIPT OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL in PDF Format: Record on Appeal Received and Attached at the Request of the Court (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record, #2 Record on Appeal Documents)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 U.S. Bankruptcy Appellant Panel of the Ninth Circuit Notice of Transfer of Appeal to District Court. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BAP. BAP Court case number BAP 20-1170. File received. Filed by Paradise Unified School District, Napa County Recycling & Waste Services, LLC/Napa Recycling & Waste Services, LLC, Adventist Health, Comcast, Northern Recycling and Waste Services, LLC/Northern Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Objection of BAP, #2 Notice of Appeal, #3 Notice of Referral, #4 Transmittal, #5 Docket Report)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: PG&E Corporation et al v. Fire Victum Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Northern Recycling and Waste Services, LLC/Northern Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Peter Salvador Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Adventist Health
Represented By: Rebecca Jean Winthrop
Represented By: Robin Dale Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Paradise Unified School District
Represented By: Peter Salvador Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Napa County Recycling & Waste Services, LLC/Napa Recycling & Waste Services, LLC
Represented By: Peter Salvador Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Comcast
Represented By: Lauren R. Lifland
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Casamassima
Represented By: Danielle M Spinelli
Represented By: Craig T Goldblatt
Represented By: Joel W.L. Millar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: In re: PG&E Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Reorganized Debtors
Represented By: Ray C. Schrock
Represented By: Peter J. Benvenutti
Represented By: Stephen Karotkin
Represented By: Jessica Liou
Represented By: Theodore Tsekerides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fire Victum Trust
Represented By: Joel S. Miliband
Represented By: David J. Molton
Represented By: Susan Sieger-Grimm
Represented By: Eric R. Goodman
Represented By: Marek Krzyzowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Tort Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?