Structurlam Mass Timber Corporation v. Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.
Plaintiff: structurlam Mass Timber Corporation
Defendant: Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv05428
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Responses due by 10/30/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Case stayed until 11/24/2020 hearing date. The 11/9/2020 Case Management Conference date is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Status Conference held on 9/21/2020. Case stayed until motion hearing date. Responses due by 10/30/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Total Time in Court: 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, Status Conference set for Monday, 9/21/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers to be held via Zoom. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ) filed byRudolph and Sletten, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gest ISO R&S's Response to Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time)(Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Navi Singh Dhillon in Support of Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time, #2 Declaration of Nischay K. Bhan in Support of Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time, #3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tutor Perini Corporation for Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.. (Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David C. Romyn, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Kelli Quinn)(Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE HELD VIA ZOOM. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 11/9/2020 02:00 PM via Zoom before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website: www.cand.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David Christian Romyn (Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.. (Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation. Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nischay Kishan Bhan. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph Colagiovanni. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/07/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nischay Kishan Bhan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14787213.) filed by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Bar Membership for Nischay Kishan Bhan)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Alfred Colagiovanni, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14787104.) filed by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Bar Membership for Joseph Alfred Colagiovanni, Jr.)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation.. (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14780077.). Filed bystructurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Structurlam Mass Timber Corporation v. Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron David Acevedo Gest
Represented By: David Christian Romyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: structurlam Mass Timber Corporation
Represented By: Navtej Singh Dhillon
Represented By: Nischay Kishan Bhan
Represented By: Joseph A Colagiovanni, Jr
Represented By: Shamus Sean Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?