Beltran Carrero et al v. Barr, et al
Petitioner: Marco Paul Silveira, S.D. C B and Yelitsa Eleonora Beltran Carrero
Respondent: Henry Lucero, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Matthew T. Albence, AnnMarie Highsmith, William Barr, Daniel Renaud and Mark A Morgan
Case Number: 4:2020cv05522
Filed: August 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 24 OBJECTIONS to re #22 Amended Document, by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, AnnMarie Highsmith, Henry Lucero, Mark A Morgan, Daniel Renaud. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #19 Respondent's Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Signed on 10/6/2020.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 PETITIONERS/PLAINTIFFSS REPLY BRIEF by Yelitsa Eleonora Beltran Carrero. Amendment to #18 Opposition/Response to Motion, 19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 NO BIRTHDATE Defaced passport, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Defaced passport, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 Essential traveler Regulations, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of ECF Service)(Enyinwa, Emmanuel) (Filed on 10/6/2020) Modified on 10/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Late Reply Brief filed by Yelitsa Eleonora Beltran Carrero. (Enyinwa, Emmanuel) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document , #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byMarco Paul Silveira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Defaced visa, #2 Exhibit Ex 2. Defaced visa, #3 Exhibit Ex 3. Essential traveler Reg, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of ECF Service)(Enyinwa, Emmanuel) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, AnnMarie Highsmith, Henry Lucero, Mark A Morgan, Daniel Renaud. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET 17 filed byMatthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, AnnMarie Highsmith, Henry Lucero, Mark A Morgan, Daniel Renaud. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byMatthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, AnnMarie Highsmith, Henry Lucero, Mark A Morgan, Daniel Renaud. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Mariza Marin)(Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #15 Stipulation regarding briefing schedule for Petitioners' motion for temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction #3 . Signed on 9/4/2020.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, AnnMarie Highsmith, Henry Lucero, Mark A Morgan, Daniel Renaud, Yelitsa Eleonora Beltran Carrero, Marco Paul Silviera and S.D.C.B.. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 9/4/2020) Modified on 9/8/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, AnnMarie Highsmith, Henry Lucero, Mark A Morgan, Daniel Renaud.. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Petitioners' counsel has engaged in a pattern of contacting the court with questions that go beyond administrative issues. Given this pattern, the court will no longer respond to petitioners' counsel's phone calls. If petitioners' counsel has a request of the court, he must e-file the request on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/4/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 Statement re 11 Order,, by S.D. C B. (Enyinwa, Emmanuel) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: On 8/12/2020, the court ordered Petitioners to file the consent or declination form indicating whether they consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge and file a statement regarding the status of service on Defendants. Petitioners have filed their consent form but have not filed a statement regarding service. By no later than 8/28/2020, Petitioners shall file a statement indicating whether the Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order have been served on Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/26/20. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by S.D. C B, Yelitsa Eleonora Beltran Carrero, Marco Paul Silveira.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Enyinwa, Emmanuel) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Petitioners have filed an Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 requesting immediate relief. The court cannot decide this matter without the consent of all parties, served and unserved, to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge assigned to this matter. Therefore, Petitioners shall file either the consent or declination form indicating whether they consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. The forms are available at https://cand.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/. Petitioners shall also file a statement indicating whether the Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order have been served on Defendants, as the status of service is not clear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/12/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by S.D. C B, Yelitsa Eleonora Beltran Carrero, Marco Paul Silveira. (Enyinwa, Emmanuel) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by S.D. C B, Yelitsa Eleonora Beltran Carrero, Marco Paul Silveira Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Enyinwa, Emmanuel) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). Please complete correct Civil Cover Shee t and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet.#Electronic filing error. Re: 2 Amended Document filed by Marco Paul Silveira (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Marco Paul Silveira. (Enyinwa, Emmanuel) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). Please complete correct Civil Cover Shee t and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. #Electronic filing error. Re: 1 Petiti on for Writ of Mandamus filed by Marco Paul Silveira (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran Carrero et al v. Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marco Paul Silveira
Represented By: Emmanuel Eke Enyinwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: S.D. C B
Represented By: Emmanuel Eke Enyinwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yelitsa Eleonora Beltran Carrero
Represented By: Emmanuel Eke Enyinwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Henry Lucero
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AnnMarie Highsmith
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Renaud
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark A Morgan
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?