Green Savannah LLC v. Adobe Inc.
Plaintiff: Green Savannah LLC
Defendant: Adobe Inc. doing business as Adobe Systems Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv05568
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The motion hearing previously set for 11/18/2020 is CONTINUED due to being set on a date that is closed to further settings. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (Related documents(s) #21 )(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Adobe Inc.. (Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 10/6/2020) Modified on 10/7/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Adobe Inc. (Pham, Christopher) (Filed on 10/6/2020) Modified on 10/7/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adobe Inc. pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 (Pham, Christopher) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Adobe Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/20/2020. Replies due by 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shadi Hayden with Exhibits A - G, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(Pham, Christopher) (Filed on 10/6/2020) Modified on 10/7/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel R. Warner. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Petition for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14975892.) filed by Green Savannah LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Warner, Daniel) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adobe Inc... (Pham, Christopher) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus Freeman Chaney (Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Quang Pham (Pham, Christopher) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to File Response to Complaint filed by Green Savannah LLC. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Green Savannah LLC. Adobe Inc. served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Green Savannah LLC.. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form emailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Adobe Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/25/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Stephen Kronenberger (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Green Savannah LLC (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Adobe Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14800883.). Filed byGreen Savannah LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Savannah LLC v. Adobe Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Inc. doing business as Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher Quang Pham
Represented By: Marcus Freeman Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Savannah LLC
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Represented By: Daniel Robert Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?