Epic Games, Inc. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

The maker of Fortnite, Epic Games, has sued Apple, asking the court to bar Apple from requiring developers to use its app payment system.

Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Petitioner: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations, App Annie Inc. and Amazon.com Services LLC
Counter Claimant: Apple Inc.
Counter Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Interested Party: Donald R. Cameron, Kabam, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Valve Corporation, PayPal, Inc., Visa Inc. and The Gearbox Entertainment
Not Classified By Court: Roblox, Inc., Spotify USA Inc., Yoga Buddhi Co., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Match Group, Inc., Shelley Gould, Netflix, Inc., Google LLC, Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd and NVIDIA Corporation
3Rd Party Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: Robert Pepper, Edward W. Hayter, Stephen H. Schwartz and Edward Lawrence
Intervenor: Nintendo of America Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv05640
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
2 Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 805 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicole Lauren Castle , Peter J. Sacripanti, John J. Calandra and Michael R. Huttenlocher (Castle, Nicole) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 804 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM GLU MOBILE INC. by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting (440) Stipulation in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; granting (330) Stipulation in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR; granting (695) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-05640-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO CONSUMER PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDERS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;granting (436) Stipulation in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; granting (325) Stipulation in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM ZYNGA, INC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/25/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM WALT DISNEY COMPANY. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/25/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM ELECTRONIC ARTS INC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/25/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 798 ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM NIANTIC, INC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/25/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 797 Statement of Recent Decision by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 796 Joint Trial Transcript Errata by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 6/11/2021) Modified on 6/11/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #788 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael R. Huttenlocher. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 794 POSTTRIAL ORDER NO. 1 RE: (1) ORDER GRANTING PENDING STIPULATION; (2) SONY INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT LLCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CLARIFY; (3) FINAL SEALING REQUESTS; AND (4) DEFERRED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/9/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 793 APPLE INC.S RESPONSE TO #791 OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Apple Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 6/9/2021) Modified on 6/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2021 Filing 792 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/2021 - 5/24/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 791 Epic Games, Inc.'s Objections to Apple Inc.'s Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Epic Games, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 6/8/2021) Modified on 6/9/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2021 Filing 790 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/24/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 789 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/21/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 788 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Michael R. Huttenlocher (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16042357) filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Huttenlocher, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2021) Modified on 6/4/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2021 Filing 787 NOTICE of Appearance by Dwight Craig Donovan (Donovan, Dwight) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 786 Declaration of Don Sechler in Support of #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed bySony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Related document(s) #778 ) (Cove, John) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 785 Declaration of David P. Chiappetta in Support of #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Related document(s) #778 ) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 784 Declaration of Asim M. Bhansali in Support of #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #778 ) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 29, 2021 Filing 783 Declaration of Victoria F. Maroulis in Support of #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Related document(s) #778 ) (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 5/29/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 782 CORRECTED Transcript of Proceedings held on May 11, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/28/2021) Modified on 5/28/2021 (oh, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2021 Filing 781 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re #778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 780 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #777 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law") (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 779 Proposed Findings of Fact by Apple Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 778 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Final Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #4 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 777 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Brent Byars, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Redacted), #4 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Unredacted))(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2021) Modified on 6/1/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2021 Filing 776 Notice of Submission of Full Set of Expert Written Direct Testimony re #509 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. Expert 1, #2 Ex. Expert 1 (Sealed), #3 Ex. Expert 2, #4 Ex. Expert 2 (Sealed), #5 Ex. Expert 3, #6 Ex. Expert 3 (Sealed), #7 Ex. Expert 4, #8 Ex. Expert 5, #9 Ex. Expert 13, #10 Ex. Expert 13 (Sealed), #11 Ex. Expert 16, #12 Ex. Expert 16 (Sealed))(Related document(s) #509 ) (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2021) Modified on 5/28/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2021 Filing 775 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3 - 24/2021 Full Trial before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 774 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/17 & 18/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 773 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/6 & 7/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 772 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/21- 5/24/21 All Trial Days before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 771 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/21 - 5/24/21 Trial Days before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 27, 2021 Filing 770 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 21, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 27, 2021 Filing 769 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 14, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 27, 2021 Filing 768 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 13, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 767 REPLY (re #708 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) ) filed byApple Inc.. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 766 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3, 5/21 & 5/24 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Stute, William) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 765 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 11, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 764 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 6, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 763 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 5, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman Pamela Hebel, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 762 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 4, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 761 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on May 3, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2021. (desS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 760 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 24, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 758 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 21, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 757 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 20, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 756 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 19, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 755 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 18, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 754 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 17, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 752 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/6/21 and transcripts going forward until the end of the trial before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 750 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/20/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 753 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held and completed on 5/24/2021.Total Time in Court: 3:33. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 749 EXHIBIT TO DECLARATION OF RACHEL S. BRASS IN RESPONSE TO #699 EPIC GAMES, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF EX. EXPERT 1 filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. Expert 1)(Related document(s) #699 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/24/2021) Modified on 5/25/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2021 Filing 748 Declaration of RACHEL S. BRASS in Support of #699 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ex. Expert 1 filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #699 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits PX-1017 and PX-2946 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order, #3 PX-1017, #4 PX-2946, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 746 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/21/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 745 NOTICE of Errata Regarding Filing of Unredacted Final Versions of Expert Written Direct Testimony by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. Expert 6, #2 Ex. Expert 12)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/24/2021) Modified on 5/25/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2021 Filing 743 Notice of Filing of Unredacted Written Direct Testimony filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. Expert 6, #2 Ex. Expert 7, #3 Ex. Expert 8, #4 Ex. Expert 11)(Related document(s) #489 ) (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/23/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2021 Filing 742 NOTICE of Filing of Expert Written Direct Testimony by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. Expert 6, #2 Ex. Expert 7, #3 Ex. Expert 8, #4 Ex. Expert 10, #5 Ex. Expert 11, #6 Ex. Expert 12)(Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/23/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2021 Filing 741 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Withdrawal of Exhibits from Evidence filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 5/23/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2021 Filing 740 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit PX-1047 and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order, #3 PX-1047, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/23/2021)
May 23, 2021 Filing 739 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Clarification re #715 Order ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION OF NON-PARTY SONY INTERACTIVE ENTERTAINMENT FOR CLARIFICATION RE: TRIAL ORDER NO. 7 [ECF 715] filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. Responses due by 5/27/2021. (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/23/2021)
May 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 738 ORDER GRANTING #725 STIPULATION RE: ADMISSION OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2021)
May 23, 2021 Filing 737 Opposition to #708 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 5/23/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2021 Filing 751 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/21/2021. Further Bench Trial set for Monday, 5/24/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 5:14. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 736 Declaration of Shane M. Palmer in Support of #707 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Epic's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed bySpotify USA Inc.. (Related document(s) #707 ) (Palmer, Shane) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 735 EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF RACHEL S. BRASS IN SUPPORT OF #729 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO PARTIALLY SEAL PORTIONS OF THE PARTIES TRIAL EXHIBITS AND LIVE TRIAL TESTIMONY RELATED THERETO filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Epic Ex. Depo. 8, #2 Epic Ex. Depo. 9, #3 Epic Ex. Depo. 11, #4 Epic Ex. Depo. 12, #5 Epic Ex. Depo. 13, #6 Epic Ex. Depo. 19, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #729 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/21/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2021 Filing 734 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #731 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed (Karin, John) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 733 Declaration of Don Sechler in Support of #731 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed bySony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Related document(s) #731 ) (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 732 Declaration of Cynthia Williams in Support of #731 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Related document(s) #731 ) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 731 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Kreiner in Support of Epic's Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit A of Joseph Kreiner Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 730 EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF RACHEL S. BRASS IN SUPPORT OF #729 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO PARTIALLY SEAL PORTIONS OF THE PARTIES TRIAL EXHIBITS AND LIVE TRIAL TESTIMONY RELATED THERETO filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 DX-4089A, #2 PX-0101, #3 PX-0191, #4 PX-1085, #5 PX-1086, #6 PX-1901, #7 PX-1922, #8 PX-2090, #9 PX-2174, #10 PX-2302, #11 PX-2303, #12 PX-2309, #13 PX-2337, #14 PX-2350, #15 PX-2366, #16 PX-2367, #17 PX-2378, #18 PX-2389, #19 PX-2390)(Related document(s) #729 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/21/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2021 Filing 729 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 728 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/21/21 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 727 Class Plaintiffs' Schedule Re: In-Person Attendance at Trial, Week of May 24, 2021 by Donald R. Cameron. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/21/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2021 Filing 726 Press Pool Schedule for Week of May 24, 2021 by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 5/21/2021) Modified on 5/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2021 Filing 744 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/20/2021. Further Bench Trial set for Friday, 5/21/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:24. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 725 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Admission of Exhibits and Deposition Designations filed by Epic Games, Inc. Apple Inc. (Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 5/20/2021) Modified on 5/21/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2021 Filing 724 NOTICE of Joint Filing Pursuant to Stipulation Governing Objections to Deposition Testimony by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc (Attachments: #1 Deposition Objections Chart and Rulings Thereon)(Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 5/20/2021) Modified on 5/21/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2021 Filing 723 NOTICE of Submission of Amended and Redacted Versions of Certain Expert Written Direct Testimony and Withdrawal of Certain Expert Written Direct Testimony by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. Expert 1, #2 Ex. Expert 16)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/20/2021) Modified on 5/21/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2021 Filing 722 Brief Regarding Susan Athey's Direct Written Testimony filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of Yonatan Even, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 721 MOTION to Strike Dr. Susan Athey's Written and Oral Expert Testimony filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2021 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/21/2021. Replies due by 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Perry, #2 Exhibit A, Perry Decl., #3 Exhibit B, Perry Decl., #4 Proposed Order)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 720 Epic Games Inc.'s Response to Declaration of Kyle Andeer in Support of Apple's Joint Letter Submission Regarding Clawback of Document by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 5/20/2021) Modified on 5/21/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2021 Filing 719 Declaration of Kyle Andeer in Support of #717 Order in Support of Apple's Joint Letter Submission Regarding Clawback of Document filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #717 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 718 Discovery Order re: #714 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple Inc.'s Clawback of Document. Apple's clawback is SUSTAINED. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/20/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 717 DISCOVERY ORDER re #716 Order. The Court orders Apple to file the Andeer Declaration and orders Epic to file its response. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/20/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 716 DISCOVERY ORDER re #714 Discovery Letter Brief. The Court orders Apple to email the document by 1:00 p.m. today for in camera review, along with any declarations in support of its claims of attorney-client privilege and work product. Epic may file any response to those declarations by 4:00 p.m. today. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/20/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 715 TRIAL ORDER NO. 7 RE: (1) PENDING STIPULATIONS; (2) BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PARTIAL FINDINGS; AND (3) WEEK 2 SEALING REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/20/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #708 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c): Responses due by 5/23/2021 by 12:00 PM PDT. Replies due by 5/26/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 714 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple Inc.'s Clawback of Document filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 5/19/2021) Modified on 5/20/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2021 Filing 713 NOTICE of Submission of Amended and Redacted Versions of Expert Written Direct Testimony by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert 6, #2 Exhibit Expert 7, #3 Exhibit Expert 8)(Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/19/2021) Modified on 5/20/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2021 Filing 712 REPLY (re #602 MOTION Regarding Adverse Credibility Finding ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Calandra, #2 Declaration of J. Srinivasan)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 711 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/19/2021. Further Bench Trial on Thursday, 5/20/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:38. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 710 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #699 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ex. Expert 1 (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 709 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/18/2021. Further Bench Trial set for Wednesday, 5/19/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:15. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 708 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2021 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/20/2021. Replies due by 5/21/2021. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 707 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Epic Games, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Response to Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg - SEALED/UNREDACTED, #2 Epic Games, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Response to Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg - PUBLIC/REDACTED, #3 Exhibit A SEALED/UNREDACTED, #4 Exhibit A PUBLIC/REDACTED, #5 Declaration of Samuel A. Stuckey in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Exhibits to Its Administrative Motion for Leave To File Sur-Reply in Response to Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 706 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Epic Games, Inc.. Responses due by 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yonatan Even in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion for Leave To File Sur-Reply in Response to Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg, #2 Epic Games, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Response To Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg, #3 Declaration of Yonatan Even in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Response To Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion To Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Proposed Order)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 705 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Redlined Content Licence and Distribution Agreement filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 704 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Trial Exhibit by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/18/2021) Modified on 5/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2021 Filing 703 TRIAL BRIEF re Testimony of Dr. Cragg by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Exhibit A)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Brief re Cragg Testimony filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Reply Brief), #3 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Reply Brief), #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 701 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 10, 11, 12, 13 & 14, 2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 699 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ex. Expert 1 filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert 1 [UNREDACTED], #2 Exhibit Expert 1 [REDACTED], #3 Declaration of M. Brent Byars in Support of Epic Games Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal, #4 Proposed Order on Administrative Motion to Seal)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 698 Epic Games, Inc.'s Notice of Submission of Redacted Versions of Expert Written Direct Testimony by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Lesser Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 1, #2 Lesser Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 13, #3 Lesser Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 14, #4 Lesser Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 15, #5 Lesser Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 16)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2021) Modified on 5/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2021 Filing 700 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/17/2021. Further Bench Trial Tuesday, 5/18/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:19. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 697 RESPONSE re #657 Trial Brief Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Stuckey in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit A to Decl. of S. Stuckey, #3 Exhibit B to Decl. of S. Stuckey, #4 Exhibit C to Decl. of S. Stuckey, #5 Exhibit D to Decl. of S. Stuckey, #6 Exhibit E to Decl. of S. Stuckey, #7 Proposed Order Denying Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 696 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg, #2 Exhibit B - Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Written and Oral Testimony of Dr. Michael I. Cragg (REDACTED), #3 Declaration of S. Stuckey in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #4 Proposed Order Granting Epic Games, Inc.'s Motion to file Under Seal, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 695 Stipulated [Proposed] Supplemental Protective Order Governing Discovery From Glu Mobile, Inc. filed by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (DeJong, Brittany) (Filed on 5/17/2021) Modified on 5/18/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2021 Filing 694 Declaration of Steven Singer in Support of #650 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits To J. Wesley Earnhardt's Declaration In Support Of Epic Games, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.'s Motion Fo filed byNintendo of America Inc.. (Related document(s) #650 ) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 693 Declaration of David P. Chiappetta in Support of #650 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits To J. Wesley Earnhardt's Declaration In Support Of Epic Games, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.'s Motion Fo filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #650 ) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 692 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of SPOT-EPIC-00001047 filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Kung, #2 Declaration of Shane M. Palmer, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 691 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #602 MOTION Regarding Adverse Credibility Finding ) filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Kressin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 690 Declaration of Jenna Hardy in Support of #660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byThe Gearbox Entertainment. (Related document(s) #660 , #659 ) (Ball, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 688 TRIAL ORDER NO. 6 RE: EXHIBITS ONLY CONTAINING HEARSAY RE: #604 and #608 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/17/2021. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 687 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 14, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 686 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 13, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 685 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 12, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman, Pamela Hebel, Raynee Mercado, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 683 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 10, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Batalo-Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/17/2021) Modified on 5/18/2021 (oh, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, requires a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. [err201] No further action is necessary. Re: #678 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 16, 2021 Filing 682 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Materials Relied Upon By Experts filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/16/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2021 Filing 681 EXHIBITS re #660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal accompanying Declaration of Benjamin Kung (Dkt. No. 680) filed bySpotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A (DX-5549), #2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B (DX-5550))(Related document(s) #660 ) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 680 Declaration of Benjamin Kung in Support of #660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySpotify USA Inc.. (Related document(s) #660 ) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 679 Declaration of Shane M. Palmer in Support of #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed bySpotify USA Inc.. (Related document(s) #659 ) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 678 EXHIBITS re #660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Sony Interactive's Proposed Redactions to PX-2456, accompanying Declaration of Don Sechler (ECF 677) filed bySony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Attachments: #1 PX-2456 (redacted), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #660 ) (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 677 Declaration of Don Sechler in Support of #660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of PX-2456 filed bySony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Related document(s) #660 ) (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 676 Notice of Withdrawal of Written Direct Testimony by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/15/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2021 Filing 675 Declaration of PETER WARMAN in Support of #662 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #662 , #659 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 674 Declaration of JONATHAN ROSS CHRISTIE in Support of #662 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #662 , #659 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 673 Declaration of Cynthia Williams in Support of #660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties Trial Exhibits and any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Related document(s) #660 ) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 672 Declaration of Ryan Takemoto in Support of #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byVisa Inc.. (Related document(s) #659 ) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 671 Corrected EXHIBITS re #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 DX-4800 (corrected), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #659 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/15/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2021 Filing 670 Declaration of Brian Sims in Support of #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byPayPal, Inc.. (Related document(s) #659 ) (Yang, Yi) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 669 Declaration of Asim M. Bhansali in Support of #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #659 ) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 15, 2021 Filing 668 Declaration of David P. Chiappetta in Support of #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Related document(s) #659 ) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/15/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 689 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/14/2021. Further Bench Trial set for Monday, 5/17/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 6:22. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 667 NOTICE of Filing of Four-Hour Deposition Designations Pursuant to Trial Order No. 2 by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2021 Filing 666 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations Pursuant to Trial Order No. 2 by Apple Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2021 Filing 665 Declaration of Kyle Batter in Support of #660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #662 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Related document(s) #660 , #662 ) (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 664 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re #662 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 663 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Sechler in support of motion, #2 Declaration of Patrick Colsher in support of motion, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit H, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, #19 Redacted Version of Exhibit I, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, #21 Redacted Version of Exhibit J, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J, #23 Proposed Order, #24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cove, John) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 662 EXHIBITS re #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cragg Direct Demonstrative, #2 DX-3122, #3 DX-3174, #4 DX-3248, #5 DX-3465, #6 DX-4089, #7 DX-4094, #8 DX-4170, #9 DX-4199, #10 DX-4312, #11 DX-4495, #12 DX-4760, #13 DX-4793, #14 DX-4794, #15 DX-4795, #16 DX-4796, #17 DX-4797, #18 DX-4800, #19 DX-4807, #20 DX-4809, #21 DX-4815, #22 DX-5338, #23 PDX-0041, #24 PX-0432, #25 PX-0526, #26 PX-0602, #27 PX-0603, #28 PX-0604, #29 PX-0605, #30 PX-0606, #31 PX-0607, #32 PX-0608, #33 PX-0609, #34 PX-0610, #35 PX-0611, #36 PX-0612, #37 PX-0747, #38 PX-1000, #39 PX-1001, #40 PX-1003, #41 PX-1026, #42 PX-1036, #43 PX-1049, #44 PX-1050, #45 PX-1066, #46 PX-1077, #47 PX-2126, #48 PX-2142, #49 PX-2176, #50 PX-2326, #51 PX-2328, #52 PX-2385, #53 PX-2391, #54 PX-2392)(Related document(s) #659 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 661 Proposed Order re #660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Epic Games, Inc.. (Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Kreiner, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joseph Kreiner, #3 DX-5549 (Sealed), #4 DX-5550 (Sealed), #5 DX-3233 (Sealed), #6 DX-3233 (Redacted), #7 DX-3297 (Sealed), #8 DX-3297 (Redacted), #9 DX-4362 (Sealed), #10 DX-4362 (Redacted), #11 DX-4800 (Sealed), #12 DX-4800 (Redacted), #13 Hitt Demonstratives (Sealed), #14 Hitt Demonstratives (Redacted), #15 PX-2456 (Sealed), #16 PX-2456 (Redacted), #17 PX-2469 (Sealed), #18 PX-2469 (Redacted))(Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Partially) Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 658 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May, 12, 13 & 14, 2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 657 TRIAL BRIEF re Testimony of Dr. Cragg by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 656 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Brief re Testimony of Dr. Cragg filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Trial Brief), #4 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Declaration of R. Brass), #5 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Trial Brief), #6 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Declaration of R. Brass), #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 655 Press Pool Schedule for Week of May 17, 2021 by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2021 Filing 654 Class Plaintiffs' Schedule re In-Person Attendance at Trial, Week of May 17, 2021 by Donald R. Cameron. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2021 Filing 653 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/13/2021. Further Bench Trial set Friday, 5/14/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:16. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/13/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 652 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Valve Corporation. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 651 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/12/2021. Further Bench Trial set Thursday, 5/13/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:16. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 650 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits To J. Wesley Earnhardt's Declaration In Support Of Epic Games, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.'s Motion For An Adverse Credibility Finding") filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Wesley Earnhardt, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit B (Redacted), #6 Proposed Order)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 649 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of SPOT-EPIC-00000925 and SPOT-EPIC-00001023 filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Kung, #2 Declaration of Shane M. Palmer, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 648 Brief ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Opposition To Apple Inc.'s Motion For An Adverse Credibility Finding And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Wesley Earnhardt, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (Redacted Version), #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 647 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 6, 7, 10, 11, 2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #586 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer K. Bracht. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #581 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Harry Phillips. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #559 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Steven L. Holley. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 643 TRIAL ORDER NO. 5 RE: (1) MOTION FOR ADVERSE CREDIBILITY FINDING; (2) SEALING REQUESTS; (3) STIPULATIONS; AND (4) RELATED CASES COUNSEL ACCESS TO SEALED DOCUMENTS AND TRANSCRIPTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/12/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 642 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/2021 - 5/12/2021 and all future dates of trial before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 641 (Corrected) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Materials Relied Upon By Experts filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/12/2021) Modified on 5/12/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2021 Filing 640 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Materials Relied Upon By Experts, filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. SEALED AT FILERS REQUEST. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/12/2021) Modified on 5/12/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/13/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2021 Filing 639 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/11/2021. Further Bench Trial set Wednesday, 5/12/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:14. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 638 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of SPOT-EPIC-00000932 filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Kung, #2 Declaration of Shane M. Palmer, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 637 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding App Store App Categories filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 DX-5552)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/11/2021) Modified on 5/12/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2021 Filing 635 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Materials Relied Upon By Experts filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/11/2021) Modified on 5/12/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2021 Filing 634 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/1/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 633 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3,4,5/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 632 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/2021 - All trial days before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 631 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/2021 - All trial days before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 630 NOTICE of Appearance by Arpine Lawyer for Defendant Apple Inc. (Lawyer, Arpine) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 636 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/10/2021. Further Bench Trial set for Tuesday, 5/11/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:32. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 629 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Testimony Submitted With Four-Hour Deposition Designations filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 5/10/2021) Modified on 5/11/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2021 Filing 628 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Li for Defendant Apple Inc. (Li, Dana) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 627 Declaration in Support of #596 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Deposition Testimony and any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed Declaration of Brian Sims in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal filed byPayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #596 ) (Yang, Yi) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #510 Stipulation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 625 MOTION for Leave to File Non-Party Nintendo of America Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration. filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order Granting Non-Party Nintendo's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration, #2 Declaration Declaration of Steven Singer Non-Party Nintendo's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 624 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Nintendo of America Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of DX-3464 filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration Steven Singer)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/10/2021) **Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 5/10/2021 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2021 Filing 622 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/2021 and full trial before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 621 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 5, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2812 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 620 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 7, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2812 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 619 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 6, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Pamela Hebel, telephone number 925-899-2812 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 617 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 4, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 616 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 3, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #427 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #425 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Related documents(s) #427 , #425 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2021: #1 Supplement Master Index) (oh, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2021 Filing 615 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re Samsung Request to Seal May 4, 2021 Trial Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/9/2021)
May 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 614 TRIAL ORDER NO. 4 RE: (1) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL; AND (2) PARTIAL RULING ON EXPERT OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/2021. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2021)
May 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 613 TRIAL ORDER NO. 3 RE: BENCH TRIAL WEEK 1 PARTY SEALING REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/2021. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2021)
May 8, 2021 Filing 612 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion #611 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibits (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/8/2021)
May 8, 2021 Filing 611 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibits filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order, #3 DX-4178, #4 PX-0059, #5 PX-0201, #6 PX-0314, #7 PX-0413, #8 PX-0414)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/8/2021)
May 8, 2021 Filing 610 Declaration of Steven Singer in Support of #596 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Deposition Testimony and any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed Portions of DX-4365, DX-4485, PX-2456, and PX-2442 I, filed byNintendo of America Inc.. (Related document(s) #596 ) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/8/2021)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 609 TRIAL ORDER NO. 2 RE: (1) #598 #601 FACEBOOK INC. ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CLARIFY; AND (2) #491 #505 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/7/2021. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 608 Brief re: Exhibits Containing inadmissible Hearsay filed byApple Inc.. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 607 NOTICE by Donald R. Cameron re #485 Pretrial Order Class Plaintiffs' Schedule Re: In-Person Attendance at Trial, Week of May 10, 2021 (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 606 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/5/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 605 NOTICE by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations re #485 Pretrial Order Press Pool Schedule for Week of May 10, 2021 (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 604 Brief ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Brief Regarding Apple Inc.'s Rule 802 Objections To Third Party Statements To Apple") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 603 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/6/2021. Further Bench Trial set Friday, 5/7/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:17. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 602 MOTION Regarding Adverse Credibility Finding filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/20/2021. Replies due by 5/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 601 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Clarification re: Trial Order No. 1 (ECF #594 ) (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #598 ) filed by Facebook, Inc. Responses due by 5/10/2021. (Curran-Huberty, Emily) (Filed on 5/6/2021) Modified on 5/7/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2021 Filing 598 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. Motion for Clarification re: Trial Order No.1 #594 (Curran-Huberty, Emily) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 597 Declaration of Sanghoon Park in Support of #596 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Deposition Testimony and any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Related document(s) #596 ) (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 596 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Deposition Testimony and any References at Trial to the Information Sought to be Sealed filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Kreiner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The proper event is a motion. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re : #598 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION OF NON-PARTY FACEBOOK, INC. FOR CLARIFICATION RE: TRIAL ORDER NO. 1 [ECF 594] filed by Facebook, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 600 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/5/2021. Further Bench Trial set 5/6/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6 hours. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information: ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 595 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/4/2021 and 5/5/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by NVIDIA Corporation, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 594 TRIAL ORDER NO.1 RE: STIPULATIONS, MEDIA REQUEST, AND REMAINING THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/5/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021) Modified on 5/6/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2021 Filing 593 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A Macdonald on behalf of Non-Party Netflix, Inc. (Macdonald, Matthew) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 5, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, requires a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. [err201] No further action is necessary. Re: #580 UNREDACTED EXHIBIT H to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 599 Corrected #592 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/4/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021) Modified on 5/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2021 Filing 592 ***SEE DOCKET #599 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY*** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/4/2021. Further Bench Trial set Wednesday, 5/5/2021 at 8:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 6:13. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information: ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2021) Modified on 5/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2021 Filing 591 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bracht for Defendant Apple Inc. (Bracht, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 590 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Dansey for Defendant Apple Inc. (Dansey, Lauren) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 589 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Netflix, Inc. re #588 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibits PX-0197 and PX-2140 (Harding, Lauren) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 588 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Trial Exhibits PX-0197 and PX-2140 filed by Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Harding, Lauren) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 587 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Harding on behalf of Non-Party Netflix, Inc. (Harding, Lauren) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 586 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by J. Bracht for Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15926040.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Bracht, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 585 NOTICE of Appearance by Soolean Choy for Defendant Apple Inc. (Choy, Soolean) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 584 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Doc Bedel for Defendant Apple Inc. (Bedel, Anthony) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 583 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Time to Respond to #562 Consumer Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Entry of Supplemental Protective Orders filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Dettmer)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/4/2021) Modified on 5/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2021 Filing 582 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt for Defendant Apple Inc. (Kleinbrodt, Julian) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 581 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by H. Phillips for Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15924156.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Phillips, Harry) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 580 UNREDACTED EXHIBIT H re #576 Non-Party Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal (Related Docket Entries #453 , #489 and #505 ) (CORRECTION OF DOCKET [576-17] EXHIBIT H) filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Related document(s) #576 ) (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/4/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2021 Filing 579 Request to Modify List of Pre-Authorized Pool Reporters re #485 Pretrial Order, #475 Response by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 5/4/2021) Modified on 5/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2021 Filing 577 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Parties' Trial Exhibits and Live Trial Testimony Related Thereto filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 578 Corrected #572 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/3/2021. [minutes corrected to reflect correct exhibit number on the minute sheet.] (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2021 Filing 576 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal [Related Docket Entries #453 , #489 and #505 filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (SEE DOCKET ENTRY #580 FOR CORRECTED VERSION OF ATTACHMNENT 17) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Cove, Jr., #2 Exhibit A (Redacted), #3 Exhibit A (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit B (Redacted), #5 Exhibit B (Unredacted), #6 Exhibit C (Redacted), #7 Exhibit C (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit D (Redacted), #9 Exhibit D (Unredacted), #10 Exhibit E (Redacted), #11 Exhibit E (Unredacted), #12 Exhibit F (Redacted), #13 Exhibit F (Unredacted), #14 Exhibit G (Redacted), #15 Exhibit G (Unredacted), #16 Exhibit H (Redacted), #17 Exhibit H (Unredacted), #18 Exhibit I (Redacted), #19 Exhibit I (Unredacted), #20 Exhibit J (Redacted), #21 Exhibit J (Unredacted), #22 Declaration of Don Sechler, #23 Proposed Order, #24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cove, John) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/4/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2021 Filing 575 Declaration of Benjamin Kung in Support of #509 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Related document(s) #509 ) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2021 Filing 574 Declaration of Benjamin Kung in Support of #489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony filed bySpotify USA Inc.. (Related document(s) #489 ) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 573 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Roblox Inc's Administrative Motion to Partially Seal Written Direct Testimony filed by Roblox, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mark Barbolak in support of Apple Inc.'s and Epic Games, Inc.'s Motions to Seal Certain Expert Testimony, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Non-Party Roblox Inc's Administrative Motion to Partially Seal Written Direct Testimony, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hammon, Patrick) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 572 ***SEE DOCKET #578 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY*** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Bench Trial held on 5/3/2021. Further Bench Trial Tuesday, 5/4/2021 at 8:00AM.Total Time in Court: 4:22. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. FOR PUBLIC ACCESS TO BENCH TRIAL:Please use the following Dial in information:ATT PUBLIC DIAL IN: 1-877-336-1839Access Code: 9403112(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2021 Filing 571 MOTION for Joinder In #514 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal PX-2339 filed by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Bennet in Support of Joinder, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Andrew Bennet, #3 Proposed Order)(Tullman, Molly) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2021 Filing 570 Declaration of Adrian Ong in Support of #509 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations filed by Match Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #509 ) (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2021 Filing 569 Declaration of Karl Quackenbush in Support of #489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony, #509 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations filed by Valve Corporation. (Related document(s) #489 , #509 ) (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2021 Filing 568 Declaration of Steven Singer in Support of #489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony, #505 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Designations filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Related document(s) #489 , #505 ) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2021 Filing 567 DECLARATION of David P. Chiappetta in Opposition to #489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony, #505 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Designations (to Partially Seal)filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Cynthia Williams)(Related document(s) #489 , #505 ) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 5/3/2021) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2021 Filing 566 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry H. Cornillie for Defendant Apple Inc. (Cornillie, Henry) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 2, 2021 Filing 565 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J. Rho for Defendant Apple Inc. (Rho, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/2/2021)
May 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 564 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 9 RE: ADDITIONAL THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL Re: #551 and #561 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/2/2021. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 563 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Access to Sealed Portions of Trial Testimony filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 562 Consumer Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion For Entry of Supplemental Protective Orders filed by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. Responses due by 5/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brittany N. DeJong, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeJong, Brittany) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 561 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 560 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Kung, #2 Declaration of Shane M. Palmer, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 559 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Steven L. Holley ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15914706.) filed by Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Holley, Steven) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 558 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Michael Palmer on Behalf of Spotify USA Inc. (Palmer, Shane) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 557 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan P. Cullen on Behalf of Spotify USA Inc. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 556 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF REDACTED VERSION OF WRITTEN DIRECT TESTIMONY OF NED S. BARNES, CPA by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert 2, WRITTEN DIRECT TESTIMONY OF NED S. BARNES, CPA)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 555 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Trial Exhibits of Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc. filed by Kabam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marc E. Mayer, #2 Declaration of Erick Chang, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Mayer, Marc) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 554 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 redacted version, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 sealed version, #3 Declaration Declaration of Steven Singer in Spport of Non Party Nintendo of America's Administrative Motion to Seal, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 553 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Mayer on behalf of Non-Party Kabam, Inc. (Mayer, Marc) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 552 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Chiappetta For Non-Party Nintendo of America Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 551 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David P. Chiappetta in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, #3 Declaration of David Hampton in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, #4 Redacted Hampton Ex. A PX-2477 DX-5523, #5 Unredacted Hampton Ex. A PX-2477 DX-5523, #6 Declaration of Herbert Holzer in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, #7 Redacted Holzer Ex. A PX-2478, #8 Unredacted Holzer Ex. A PX-2478, #9 Redacted Holzer Ex. B DX-5528, #10 Unredacted Holzer Ex. B DX-5528, #11 Declaration of David Los in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, #12 Redacted Los Ex. A DX-3110 5402, #13 Unredacted Los Ex. A DX-3110 5402, #14 Declaration of Stephanie Louie in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, #15 Redacted Louie Ex. A DX-3918, #16 Unredacted Louie Ex. A DX-3918, #17 Declaration of Cynthia Williams in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Proposed Trial Exhibits, #18 Redacted Williams Ex. A PX-2475 DX-5521, #19 Unredacted Williams Ex. A PX-2475 DX-5521 Part 1, #20 Unredacted Williams Ex. A PX-2475 DX-5521 Part 2, #21 Redacted Williams Ex. B PX-2476 DX-5522, #22 Unredacted Williams Ex. B PX-2476 DX-5522, #23 Redacted Williams Ex. C DX-3437, #24 Unredacted Williams Ex. C DX-3437, #25 Redacted Williams Ex. D DX-3587, #26 Unredacted Williams Ex. D DX-3587, #27 Redacted Williams Ex. E DX-3764, #28 Unredacted Williams Ex. E DX-3764)(Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 550 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Trial Exhibits filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ellen London in Support of Non-Party Lyft, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Trial Exhibits, #2 Declaration Declaration of Mojin Chen in Support of Non-Party Lyft, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Trial Exhibits, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Non-Party Lyft, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Confidential Information Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 & 79.5, #4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit C)(London, Ellen) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 549 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen London on Behalf of Non-Party Lyft, Inc. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 548 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 8 RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL THE COURTROOM DURING PRESENTATION OF CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL AT TRIAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/30/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 547 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7: RE THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/30/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 546 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -Trial Exhibits- filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exh 1, #4 Unredacted Version of Exh 1, #5 Redacted Version of Exh 2, #6 Unredacted Version of Exh 2, #7 Redacted Version of Exh 3, #8 Unredacted Version of Exh 3, #9 Redacted Placeholder of Exh 4, #10 Unredacted Version of Exh 4)(Curran-Huberty, Emily) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 545 DECLARATION OF BRIAN SIMS IN SUPPORT OF #515 APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL filed by PayPal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Yang, Yi) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 544 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 543 DECLARATION OF BRIAN SIMS IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (re #515 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Partially Seal the Courtroom) filed by PayPal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Yang, Yi) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 542 REDACTED EXHIBIT re #489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re: Expert Written Direct Testimony, #490 Notice (Other), (Replacement for 489-3 and 490-1 (Expert #6)) filed by Apple Inc. (Related document(s) #489 , #490 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 541 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 540 DECLARATION OF RACHEL S. BRASS IN RESPONSE TO EPIC GAMES, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS EXPERT WRITTEN DIRECT EXAMINATIONS filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 1), #3 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 2), #4 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 3), #5 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 13), #6 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 14), #7 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 15), #8 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 16), #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #509 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 539 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #515 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Partially Seal the Courtroom ) filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 538 SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE TRIAL STIPULATIONS filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 537 Proposed Order re #489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony, #505 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Designations, #491 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of its Four-Hour Deposition Designation, #509 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations by Google LLC. (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 536 Epic Games, Inc.'s Statement Responding to Pretrial Order No. 6 & Apple Inc.'s Objections to Expert Testimony by Epic Games, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 535 DECLARATION OF ANDREW ROPE IN SUPPORT OF SEALING PORTIONS PROPOSED TRIAL TESTIMONY re #509 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations, #489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony, #505 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Designations, #491 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of its Four-Hour Deposition Designation filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #509 , #489 , #505 , #491 ) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 534 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER RE: OBJECTIONS TO EXPERT TESTIMONY re #520 Statement, #521 Order on Objections to Expert Testimony by Apple Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 533 Class Plaintiffs' Schedule Re: In-Person Attendance at Trial, Week of May 3, 2021 re #485 Pretrial Order by Donald R. Cameron.(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2021 Filing 532 Press Pool Schedule for Week of May 3, 2021 re #485 Pretrial Order by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2021 Filing 531 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 530 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #509 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 529 Declaration of Adrian Ong in Support of #491 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of its Four-Hour Deposition Designation filed byMatch Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #491 ) (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 528 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Match Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H)(Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 527 Epic Games, Inc.'s Notice of Submission of Redacted Version of Written Direct Testimony of Dr. David S. Evans (Ex. Expert 1) by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 1)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2021 Filing 526 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Trial Exhibits filed by Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karl Quackenbush in Support of Non-Party Valve Corporation's Administrative Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits of Defendant Apple, Inc., #2 Proposed Order Granting Non-Party Valve Corporation's Administrative Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits of Defendant Apple, Inc., #3 Exhibit A Unredacted DX3585, #4 Exhibit B Unredacted DX5333, #5 Exhibit C Unredacted DX3931, #6 Exhibit D Unredacted DX4202, #7 Exhibit E Unredacted DX4388, #8 Exhibit F Unredacted DX3746, #9 Exhibit G Unredacted DX3868 DX5322, #10 Exhibit H Unredacted DX4514 DX5321, #11 Exhibit I Unredacted DX4200 DX5365)(Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 525 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Roblox Inc's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal filed by Roblox, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Hans Gunawan Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e)(1) In Support of Roblox Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Non-Party Roblox Inc's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hammon, Patrick) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 524 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 523 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Maben Hammon. (Hammon, Patrick) (Filed on 4/29/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2021 Filing 522 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Yoga Buddhi Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas J. Dixon, #2 Declaration of Benjamin Simon, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #10 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #12 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #14 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #16 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, #18 Redacted Version of Exhibit H, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, #20 Redacted Version of Exhibit I, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, #22 Redacted Version of Exhibit J, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J)(Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 521 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6 RE: OBJECTIONS TO EXPERT WRITTEN DIRECT TESTIMONY #517 #518 #520 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/29/2021. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 520 Statement of Objections to Apple Expert's Written Direct Testimony by Epic Games, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/29/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2021 Filing 519 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Rebuttal Expert Direct Testimony filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2021 Filing 518 OBJECTIONS to Expert Testimony by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Perry, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 517 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Objections to Expert Testimony filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Perry, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Objections to Expert Testimony), #4 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Athey Deposition), #5 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Objections to Expert Testimony), #6 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Athey Deposition), #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 516 Non-Party Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Sechler, #2 Declaration of John F. Cove, Jr., #3 Exhibit Exhibit A (Redacted), #4 Exhibit Exhibit A (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit Exhibit B (Redacted), #6 Exhibit Exhibit B (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit Exhibit C (Redacted), #8 Exhibit Exhibit C (Unredacted), #9 Proposed Order, #10 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cove, John) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2021 Filing 515 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Partially Seal the Courtroom filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 514 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PX-2339 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #4 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 513 Third Party ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION PER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 TO SEAL TRIAL EXHIBITS IN THEIR ENTIRETY filed by App Annie Inc.. Responses due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin M. Crosson, #2 Declaration of Ketaki Rao, #3 Proposed Order)(Crosson, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 512 Discovery Order re #493 Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/28/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 511 PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERDEFENDANT EPIC GAMES, INC.S RESPONSE TO DECLARATIONS OF PHILLIP W. SCHILLER AND SEAN CAMERON IN SUPPORT OF APPLES OPPOSITION TO EPICS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Epic Games, Inc. (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2021 Filing 510 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Expert Direct Testimony filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2021 Filing 509 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Its Expert Written Direct Examinations filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of M. Brent Byars, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 1, #6 Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 2, #7 Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 2, #8 Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 3, #9 Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 3, #10 Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 13, #11 Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 13, #12 Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 14, #13 Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 14, #14 Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 15, #15 Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 15, #16 Redacted Version of Ex. Expert 16, #17 Unredacted Version of Ex. Expert 16)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2021 Filing 508 NOTICE of submission of written direct testimony of expert witnesses by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. Expert 1, #2 Ex. Expert 2, #3 Ex. Expert 3, #4 Ex. Expert 4, #5 Ex. Expert 5, #6 Ex. Expert 13, #7 Ex. Expert 14, #8 Ex. Expert 15, #9 Ex. Expert 16)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Filing 507 EXHIBITS re #506 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibit K, #2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit L, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit N, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit O, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit P, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit R, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit S)(Related document(s) #506 ) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 506 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Rope, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I)(Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 505 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Designations filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Brass, #2 Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 504 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to seal portions of trial exhibits and testimony , Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by NVIDIA Corporation. Responses due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Patel, #2 Declaration of Marc David Peters, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Patel Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Patel Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Patel Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Patel Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Patel Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Patel Exhibit C)(Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 503 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition Testimony in Support of Apple Inc.'s Position in #493 Joint Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Dettmer, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, Dettmer Decl'n, #4 Exhibit A, Dettmer Decl'n)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 502 Notice of Supporting Materials Cited in #493 Letter Brief by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Filing 501 DECLARATION of PHILLIP W. SCHILLER in Opposition to #493 to Epic's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed byApple Inc. (Related document(s) #493 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Filing 500 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc David Peters for Non-Party NVIDIA Corporation (Peters, Marc) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 499 DECLARATION of SEAN CAMERON in Opposition to #493 to Epic's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Apple Inc. (Related document(s) #493 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Filing 498 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Admissibility of Documents Submitted With Four-Hour Deposition Designations filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE ENTRY OF DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S TRIAL EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/27/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER re #493 Letter Brief filed by Epic Games, Inc. The Court orders Apple to submit the documents by emailing them by 5p.m. today. The Court orders Apple to file any declarations in support of its claim of privilege by 11:59 p.m. today. Epic may file a response to these declarations by noon tomorrow. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/27/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 495 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations by Apple Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE ENTRY OF EPIC GAMES INC.'S TRIAL EQUIPMENT INTO COURTHOUSE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/27/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 493 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Clawback Of Documents filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Filing 492 Epic Games, Inc.'s Four-Hour Deposition Designation (Redacted) by Epic Games, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Filing 491 Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of its Four-Hour Deposition Designation filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Brent Byars, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Epic Games, Inc.'s Four-Hour Deposition Designation, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Filing 490 NOTICE of Filing of Expert Written Direct Testimony by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. Expert 6, #2 Ex. Expert 7, #3 Ex. Expert 8, #4 Ex. Expert 9, #5 Ex. Expert 10, #6 Ex. Expert 11, #7 Ex. Expert 12)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Filing 489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Written Direct Testimony filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 6), #4 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 7), #5 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 8), #6 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 11), #7 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 6), #8 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 7), #9 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 8), #10 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. Expert 11), #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 488 Epic Games, Inc.'s Tentative Updated Trial Witness List by Epic Games, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/26/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2021 Filing 487 Second Revised Tentative Witness List by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/26/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2021 Filing 486 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DX-3891 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Brass, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit DX-3891, #4 Exhibit DX-3891 (unredacted), #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 485 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/26/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 484 Proposed Order Authorizing Entry of Apple's Trial Equipment by Apple Inc.. (Lo, Jason) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 483 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 25, 2021 Filing 482 Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.'s Supplemental List of Summary Exhibits by Epic Games, Inc. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/25/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2021 Filing 481 Defendant Trial Exhibit List by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/25/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2021 Filing 480 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S UPDATED LIST OF DISCOVERY EXCERPTS, AUDIO, AND VIDEO LIKELY TO BE USED AT TRIAL by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/25/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2021 Filing 479 Proposed Order Authorizing the Entry of Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.'s Trial Equipment Into Courthouse by Epic Games, Inc.. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #464 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew John Reynolds. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #463 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Karl Huth. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 476 Class Plaintiffs' Response to Court's Order re In-Person Attendance at Trial re #468 Pretrial Order by Donald R. Cameron. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2021 Filing 475 Proposed Protocol for Press Pool Trial Coverage re #468 Pretrial Order by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 4/23/2021) Modified on 4/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #473 Stipulation re Breach of Contract Counterclaim. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 473 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Claim for Breach of Contract filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/22/2021) Modified on 4/23/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2021 Filing 471 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 21, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #469 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2021. (Related documents(s) #469 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 472 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Pretrial Conference held via Zoom Webinar Videoconference on 4/21/2021 and via the District Court Audio Streaming Pilot. Total Time in Court: 1:30. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2021) Modified on 4/22/2021 (fs, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2021 Filing 470 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/21/21 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 469 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/21/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 468 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/21/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 467 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/21/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 465 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Objections to Deposition Testimony filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/20/2021 Modified on 4/21/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2021 Filing 464 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Matthew John Reynolds of Huth Reynolds LLP ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15862505.) filed by Shelley Gould. (Reynolds, Matthew) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 463 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Karl Huth of Huth Reynolds LLP ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15862001.) Filed by Shelley Gould. (Huth, Karl) (Filed on 4/20/2021) Modified on 4/21/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2021 Filing 462 Response re #457 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Trial Access byEpic Games, Inc.. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 461 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM WEBINAR VIDEOCONFERENCE HEARING FOR THE Pretrial Conference set for Wednesday, 4/21/2021 09:00 AM VIA ZOOM Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinar (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related documents(s) 460 Live Aud io Stream: www.youtube.com/user/USDCCAND (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 460 CLERK'S NOTICE :This court is a participant in the District Court Audio Streaming Pilot. See www.uscourts.gov/about-federal-courts/judicial-administration/district-court-audio-streaming-pilot. The parties in this case have consented to audio streaming the Wednesday, April 21, 2021 at 9:00 AM Pretrial Conference. Members of the press and public may listen to the live audio stream of the hearing at the court's YouTube channel: www.youtube.com/user/USDCCAND. Pretrial Conference set for WEDNESDAY, 4/21/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 459 Joint Response to #458 April 16, 2021 Order by Epic Games, Inc., Apple, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/19/2021) Modified on 4/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER re #457 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Trial Access filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. Filing due no later than 12:30 PM PDT on April 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/16/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 457 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Trial Access filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations. Responses due by 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 456 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 455 NOTICE of Appearance of Katie Townsend as Counsel, filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations (Townsend, Katie) (Filed on 4/16/2021) Modified on 4/19/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2021 Filing 454 Epic Games, Inc.'s Tentative Revised Trial Witness List by Epic Games, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2021 Filing 453 Exhibit List by Apple Inc... (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 452 Stipulation and Proposed Order re Trial Stipulations filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2021 Filing 451 Tentative Revised Trial Witness List by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2021 Filing 450 Expert Witness List by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2021 Filing 449 Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.'s Audio Visual Exhibit List by Epic Games, Inc. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2021 Filing 448 Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.'s Exhibit List by Epic Games, Inc. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2021 Filing 447 Exhibit List of Discovery Excerpts Audio Video Likely To Be Used At Trial by Apple Inc... (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 466 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Status Conference held via Zoom platform on 4/13/2021.Total Time in Court: 08 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 446 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #441 MOTION to Appoint Special Master ) filed byApple Inc.. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Order Granting #440 Stipulation for Expedited Briefing. The Court will set a hearing, if necessary, after receipt and review of Apple's Responsive Brief. Entered by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 12, 2021 Filing 444 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal re #410 Proposed Findings of Fact, #408 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected) filed by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Sechler Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e)(1) in Response to Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Partially Seal its Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law, #2 Proposed Order Granting Non-Party Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC's Administrative Motion to Keep Competitively Sensitive Information Under Seal)(Cove, John) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G Berkowitz (Berkowitz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 442 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Cove, Jr (Cove, John) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 441 MOTION to Appoint Special Master filed by Epic Games, Inc.. Responses due by 4/26/2021. Replies due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin C. Clarke in Support of Epic Games, Inc.'s Motion to Appoint Special Master, #2 Proposed Order Appointing Special Master for Pre-Trial Rulings)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 440 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Expedited Briefing and Hearing regarding Epic's Motion for Special Master filed by Epic Games, Inc. Apple, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/13/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2021 Filing 439 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION by Class Plaintiffs for Permission to View Trial via Zoom filed by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. Responses due by 4/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Rachele R. Byrd, #2 Proposed Order)(Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 438 Declaration of R. Brass in Support of #404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #404 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/13/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S MOTION FOR PRETRIAL SANCTIONS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;denying #419 Motion. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 436 Letter Brief re #419 MOTION For Pre-Trial Sanctions Against Epic Games, Inc. re #418 Order on Stipulation filed byYoga Buddhi Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #419 ) (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 435 Declaration of ANDREW ROPE in Support of #408 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conclusions of Law (Corrected) filed by Google LLC. (Related document(s) #408 ) (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/13/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2021 Filing 434 NOTICE of Appearance by Asim M. Bhansali (Bhansali, Asim) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 433 Declaration of Douglas J. Dixon in Response (re #404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed by Match Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adrian Ong)(Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/13/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2021 Filing 432 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/9/21, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #424 Transcript Order, #415 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2021. (Related documents(s) #424 , #415 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 431 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #419 MOTION For Pre-Trial Sanctions Against Epic Games, Inc. re #418 Order on Stipulation ) filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Wesley Earnhardt, #2 Exhibit A to Earnhardt Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Earnhardt Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Earnhardt Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Earnhardt Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Earnhardt Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Earnhardt Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Earnhardt Declaration, #9 Declaration of Nathan E. Denning, #10 Exhibit A to Denning Declaration, #11 Exhibit B to Denning Declaration, #12 Proposed Order)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 430 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas James Dixon (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 429 Declaration of Sanghoon Park in Support of #408 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected) filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Related document(s) #408 ) (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 428 Joint Pretrial Conference Statement by Epic Games, Inc.,Apple Inc.. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/9/2021) Modified on 4/12/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2021 Filing 427 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Apple Inc.. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 426 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #409 Declaration in Support, #408 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected), #404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 425 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Epic Games, Inc.. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 424 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/9/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (432) Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; granting (318) Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR; granting (416) Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order in case 4:20-cv-05640-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 422 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #409 Declaration in Support, #408 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected), #404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #401 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brandon Kressin. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #402 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Kanter. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 419 MOTION For Pre-Trial Sanctions Against Epic Games, Inc. re #418 Order on Stipulation filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Karen Hoffman Lent and Exhibits A-C, #2 Declaration Of Jay P. Srinivasan and Exhibits A-F, #3 Declaration Of Michelle Lowery and Exhibits A-D, #4 Proposed Order)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #417 Stipulation for Expedited Briefing Schedule. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 417 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing Regarding Apple's Motion for Pre-Trial Sanctions, filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games Inc. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/9/2021) Modified on 4/12/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2021 Filing 416 STIPULATED PROPOSED Supplemental Protective Order Governing Discovery From Google filed by Apple Inc., Yoga Buddhi Co., Valve Corporation, Stephen H. Schwartz, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Robert Pepper, Microsoft Corporation, Edward Lawrence, Edward W. Hayter, Facebook Inc, Epic Games Inc, Donald R. Cameron. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 4/9/2021) Modified on 4/12/2021 (amd3S, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2021 Filing 415 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/9/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Discovery Order re: #403 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic Expert Productions filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/9/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 413 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held on 4/9/2021 at 8:00 a.m., by Zoom Video Conference.Total Time in Court: 8:00-8:31/ Total Time: 31 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Lauren Moskowitz. Defendant Attorney: Jay Srinivasan. Proceedings: Discovery hearing held, argument heard, matter submitted. Court to issue Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 412 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #409 Declaration in Support, #408 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected), #404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 411 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing re ECF Docket No. 403, set for 4/9/2021 at 8:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Today, 4/8/2021, by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for 4/9/2021 at 8:00 a.m., Zoom Discovery hearing, re ECF Docket No. 403. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceed ings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Video Camera hearing set for 4/9/2021 08:00 AM. (Related documents(s) #403 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 410 Proposed Findings of Fact by Apple Inc. and Conclusions of Law (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #405 ). (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 409 Declaration of M. Brent Byars in Support of #404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #404 ) (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 408 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Conclusions of Law (Corrected) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #4 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 407 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Epic Games, Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 4/8/2021) Modified on 4/9/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2021 Filing 406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #4 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 7, 2021 Filing 405 ***SEE DOCKET ENTRY #410 FOR CORRECTED PDF WITH CAPTION PAGE*** Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Apple Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2021 Filing 404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2021 Filing 403 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic Expert Productions filed by Apple Inc. Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2021 Filing 402 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Jonathan Kanter (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15800892) filed by Yoga Buddhi Co. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/6/2021) Modified on 4/7/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2021 Filing 401 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Brandon Kressin (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15800347) filed by Yoga Buddhi Co. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kressin, Brandon) (Filed on 4/6/2021) Modified on 4/7/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2021 Filing 400 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas James Dixon (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Discovery Order re: (395 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Subpoenas To Non-Party Facebook, Inc. filed by Apple Inc., (428 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Subpoenas To Non-Party Facebook, Inc. filed by Apple Inc., (314 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Subpoenas To Non-Party Facebook, Inc. filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/6/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
April 5, 2021 Filing 398 Letter from J. Wes Earnhardt to Magistrate Judge Hixson in response to Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Subpoenas To Non-Party Facebook, Inc. (Docket No. 395) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Filing 397 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith Bond Jennison for Non-Party Microsoft Corporation (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Filing 396 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Chiappetta for Non-Party Microsoft Corporation (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Filing 395 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Subpoenas To Non-Party Facebook, Inc. filed by Apple Inc., Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/5/2021) Modified on 4/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2021 Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance of Justin Paul Raphael for 3d Party Respondent Facebook, Inc.. (Raphael, Justin) (Filed on 4/2/2021) Modified on 4/5/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2021 Filing 393 NOTICE of Appearance of Rosemarie Theresa Ring as Counsel for 3d Party Respondent Facebook, Inc.. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 4/2/2021) Modified on 4/5/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2021 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance of Emily Claire Curran-Huberty as Counsel for 3d Party Respondent Facebook, Inc.. (Curran-Huberty, Emily) (Filed on 4/2/2021) Modified on 4/5/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/5/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 389 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/30/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 390 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Pretrial Conference held via Zoom Webinar Videoconference on 3/26/2021. The 4/2/2021 at 9:01AM Compliance Deadline is vacated.Total Time in Court: 1:03. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 388 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/26/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Donald R. Cameron, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 387 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 26, 2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 386 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/26/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 25, 2021 Filing 385 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 3/26/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to joi n webinar s (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related documents(s) #371 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER re #378 Joint Discovery Letter Brief for Apple Inc. and Epic Games filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 3/24/2021. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #382 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Evan R. Kreiner. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 382 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Evan R. Kreiner (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15740652) filed by Apple Inc. (Kreiner, Evan) (Filed on 3/23/2021) Modified on 3/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 381 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/23/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 380 DISCOVERY ORDER re ECF No. #378 . As the joint discovery letter brief is hard to evaluate without seeing both sides' expert reports, the Court will review them in camera. The Court orders the parties to email their expert reports by March 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 3/22/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 379 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM DISCOVERY HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 3/25/2021 at 10:00 AM, re ECF Docket No. 378, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.On 3/24/2021, by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for the 3/25/2021, 10:00 a.m., Zoom Discovery Hearing re Docket No. 378, Joint Letter Brief. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebr oadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/z oom/. Video Camera hearing set for 3/25/2021 10:00 AM, re ECF Docket No. 378. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 378 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. and Epic Games. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 3/22/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2021 Filing 377 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Pretrial Schedule filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 3/21/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2021 Filing 376 Witness List by Epic Games, Inc. ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Tentative Trial Witness List"). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 375 Witness List by Apple Inc. (Tentative Initial). (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #373 Stipulation re Case Schedule. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 373 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CASE SCHEDULE filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 3/15/2021) Modified on 3/16/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2021 NOTICE OF INPUTING ALL BENCH TRIAL DATES FOR THE 5/3/2021 BENCH TRIAL SO THAT DATES WILL BE REFLECTED ON COURT'S CALENDAR:Set Hearing Dates : Bench Trial set for 5/3/2021 at 8:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez. Bench Trial set for 5/4/2021 at 8:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez. Bench Trial set for 5/5/2021 at 8:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/6/2021 at 8:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/7/2021 at 8:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/10/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/11/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/12/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/13/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/14/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/17/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/18/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/19/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/20/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/21/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Bench Trial set for 5/24/2021 08:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #349 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gavin W. Skok. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 371 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/2/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 369 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/01/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Donald R. Cameron, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 368 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 1, 2021, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #365 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2021. (Related documents(s) #365 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 370 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further CMC and Pretrial Conference held on 3/1/2021 via Zoom Webinar. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 3/26/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Total Time in Court: 1:02. Court Reporter: Duane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 367 Unsealed Exhibit to Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions re #343 Order filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Related document(s) #343 ) (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 3/1/2021) Modified on 3/2/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2021 Filing 366 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/1/2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 365 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 1, 2021 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 364 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE Further Case Management Conference set for Monday, 3/1/2021 09:30 AM Via Zoom Webinar Videoconference. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinar (public hearings) . If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscou rts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference (Related documents(s) #132 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 363 CLERK'S NOTICE: This Court is a participant in the District Court Audio Streaming Pilot. See : https://www.uscourts.gov/about-federal-courts/judicial-administration/district-court-audio-streaming-pilotWith the consent of the parties, the Monday, March 1, 2021 at 9:30am Case Management Conference hearing has been approved for participation in the District Court Audio Streaming Pilot. Members of the press and public may listen to the live audio stream of this hearing at the courts YouTube channel: www.youtube.com/user/USDCCAND. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 362 STIPULATION Regarding Audio Streaming Pilot Project filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 361 ***AMENDED**** Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/24/2021, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #359 Transcript Order, #358 Transcript Order, #353 Transcript Order, #354 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2021. (Related documents(s) #359 , #358 , #353 , #354 ) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF AUDIO STREAMING PILOT PROJECT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/25/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 359 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Valve Corporation, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 358 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Donald R. Cameron, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 357 *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET #361 ) *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/24/2021, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (353 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Transcript Order, (354 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2021. (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021) Modified on 2/26/2021 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Discovery Order re: (346 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., (413 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., (292 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/24/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 355 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held on 2/24/2021 at 9:00 a.m., by Zoom Video Conference.Total Time in Court: 49 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Appearances:Gavin Skok (Pro Hac Vice Counsel, Pending), Rep. Non-Party Valve Corp.Jaemin Chang, Local Co-Counsel, Rep. Non-Party Valve Corp.Robert F. Lopez, Representing for Developer PlaintiffsJay P. Srinivasan and Michelle Lowery, Representing Def. Apple, Inc. Proceedings: Discovery hearing held. Argument heard, matter submitted. Court to issue Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 354 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 24, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 353 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 352 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 2/22/2021) Modified on 2/23/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Order Granting #350 Stipulation Re Extension of Deposition Date. Entered by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 22, 2021 Filing 350 Further Stipulation and Proposed Order Permitting Non-Party Deposition of Adrian Ong of Match Group, Inc. After the Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Wesley)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 2/22/2021) Modified on 2/23/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2021 Filing 349 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Gavin W. Skok (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15602806) filed by Valve Corporation. (Skok, Gavin) (Filed on 2/22/2021) Modified on 2/23/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2021 Filing 348 Unsealed Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic's Outstanding Document Requests and Supporting Exhibits filed byEpic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Related document(s) #335 ) (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 2/19/2021) Modified on 2/22/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2021 Filing 347 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 2/24/2021 at 9:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. On 2/23/20, by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for the 2/24/2021, at 9:00 a.m., Zoom Discovery Hearing re the Joint Letter brief, re ECF Docket Nos.: 11-6714 Doc. No. 413, 19-3074 Doc. No. 292, 20-5640 Doc. No. 346. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadca sting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/< /A<. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 2/24/2021 at 9:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 346 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Non-Party Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lowery, Michelle) (Filed on 2/18/2021) Modified on 2/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #340 Stipulation between Epic Games Inc. and Apple Inc. re: case schedule. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #341 Stipulation Permitting Non-Party Deposition of Adrian Ong. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER re (261 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (241 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (371 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") filed by Stephen H. Schwartz, Robert Pepper, Harry Bass, Crystal Boykin, Epic Games, Inc., Edward Lawrence, Edward W. Hayter, Kevin Fahey. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/18/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 342 STATUS REPORT re Motions to Seal by Apple Inc.. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 15, 2021 Filing 341 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Permitting Non-Party Deposition of Adrian Ong of Match Group, Inc. After the Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff filed by Epic Games, Inc., and Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Wesley Earnhardt)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 2/15/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2021 Filing 340 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Case Schedule filed by Apple Inc., and Epic Games, Inc.. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 2/15/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 DISCOVERY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson denying #338 Discovery Letter Brief. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2021)
February 14, 2021 Filing 338 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Request for an Extension filed by Apple Inc., and Epic Games. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 2/14/2021) Modified on 2/16/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER re Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/12/2021. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report from Apple due by 2/17/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/12/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting in part and denying in part #297 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] STIPULATED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM SPOTIFY by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting as modified by the Court (402) Stipulation in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; granting as modified by the Court (276) Stipulation in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR; granting as modified by the Court (320) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-05640-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #330 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Darin P. McAtee. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #321 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Omid Nasab. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Brass (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 330 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Darin P. McAtee (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-15549330) filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(McAtee, Darin) (Filed on 2/8/2021) Modified on 2/9/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Discovery Order re #319 Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/8/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 6, 2021 Filing 328 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/5/21, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Official Reporter, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #323 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2021. (Related documents(s) #323 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 327 Unsealed Exhibits to #290 Joint Discovery Letter Briefs Regarding Cook, Cue, and Federighi filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Related document(s) #290 ) (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 2/5/2021) Modified on 2/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2021 Filing 326 Brief of Amici Curiae Developer Plaintiffs Regarding Trial Elements filed byDonald R. Cameron. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 325 Consumer Plaintiffs' Amicus Brief Regarding Trial Elements, Legal Framework and Remedies re #276 Statement by Edward W. Hayter, Edward Lawrence, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 2/5/2021) Modified on 2/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2021 Filing 324 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 5, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 323 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/05/21 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 322 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held by Zoom Video Conference on 2/5/2021 at 1:00 p.m. Total Time in Court: 1:00-1:21 - total 21 minutes Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Lauren Moskowitz. Defendant Attorney: Ethan Dettmer. Proceedings: Discovery Hearing held by Zoom Video Conference. Argument heard. Court order parties to meet and confer about their outstanding issues. Court will not issue an order. If the parties can't resolve their issues they may contact the Courtroom Deputy, by email, to schedule a hearing. Courtroom Deputy Information: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 321 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Omid Nasab for Epic Games, Inc. (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-15538520) filed by Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nasab, Omid) (Filed on 2/5/2021) Modified on 2/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2021 Filing 320 STIPULATED [PROPOSED] SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY FROM SPOTIFY filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Lavely, Vanessa) (Filed on 2/4/2021) Modified on 2/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2021 Filing 319 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Apple's Attorney Lists filed byEpic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 2/4/2021) Modified on 2/4/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #312 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Zainab N. Ahmad. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #292 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nathan E. Denning. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #289 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Justin C. Clarke. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #288 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Betty Yang. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 314 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben Michael Harrington for Developer Plaintiffs (Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 312 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Zainab Ahmad (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15526032) filed by Apple Inc. (Ahmad, Zainab) (Filed on 2/2/2021) Modified on 2/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2021 Filing 311 DECLARATION OF ETHAN DETTMER IN SUPPORT OF #297 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF REGARDING EPICS OUTSTANDING DOCUMENT REQUESTS AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Exhibit 1), #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 4), #4 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 5), #5 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 1), #6 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 4), #7 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 5), #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #297 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 2/2/2021) Modified on 2/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2021 Filing 310 DECLARATION OF ETHAN DETTMER IN SUPPORT OF #270 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL JOINT LETTER BRIEFS AND EXHIBITS filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Exhibit J), #3 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Exhibit J), #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #270 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 2/2/2021) Modified on 2/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting (394) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; denying without prejudice (223) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (266) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR; granting (294) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05640-YGR. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 308 Letter Brief (Redacted #269 Joint Letter Brief re Discovery) filed byApple Inc.. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 307 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/01/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Donald R. Cameron, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 306 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/1/21, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #303 Transcript Order, #305 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2021. (Related documents(s) #303 , #305 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/01/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Discovery Order re #297 Joint Letter Brief Concerning Epic's RFPs. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/1/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 303 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 302 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Video Camera hearing set for 2/5/2021 01:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, rec ording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.can d.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Video Camera hearing set for 2/5/2021 01:00 PM. (Related documents(s) 301 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 301 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held on 2/1/2021 by Zoom. Total Time in Court: 26 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Lauren Moskowitz. Defendant Attorney: Jay Srinivasan. Proceedings: Discovery Conference held by Zoom Video Conferencing. The Court requested Apple to try to produce the requested documents to Epic by 2/5/2021. A further hearing is scheduled for: 2/5/2021 at 1:00 pm, by Zoom. By noon on : 2/4/2012, counsel shall file a joint letter brief with any remaining issues regarding the depositions or any other discovery issues the Court should review. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/1/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 300 Transcript of Zoom Webinar Proceedings held on January 25, 2021, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #277 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2021. (Related documents(s) #277 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #297 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Letter Brief Concerning Epic's RFPs with Supporting Exhibits. Correction of Docket #298 . (Karin, John) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 298 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #297 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Letter Brief Concerning Epic's RFPs and Supporting Exhibits (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 297 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Letter Brief Concerning Epic's RFPs filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren A. Moskowitz, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Letter Brief Concerning Epic's RFPs, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit by Apple, #17 Exhibit by Apple, #18 Exhibit by Apple, #19 Exhibit by Apple, #20 Exhibit by Apple, #21 Exhibit by Apple)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 295 REDACTION Request re Court Order by Samsung Electronics America Inc. (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Dettmer, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Sealed Discovery Order)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 27, 2021 Filing 293 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING START TIME OF ZOOM DISCOVERY HEARING: The Zoom Video Conference Discovery Hearing scheduled for 2/1/2021, shall be heard at 9:00 a.m., rather than 10:00 a.m. All counsel shall join the Zoom call at 9:00 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 27, 2021 Filing 292 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nathan Denning ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15499916.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Denning, Nathan) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Discovery Order (Public Redacted Version) re (264 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR, 291 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR, 392 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR). Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/26/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 291 DISCOVERY ORDER - DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL RE: (372 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition") filed by Stephen H. Schwartz, Robert Pepper, Harry Bass, Crystal Boykin, Epic Games, Inc., Edward Lawrence, Edward W. Hayter, Kevin Fahey, (241 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (271 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to G to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (248 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to L to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (240 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed by Apple Inc., (249 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to G to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (269 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed by Apple Inc., (370 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed by Apple Inc., (377 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to L to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (242 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Depositions") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (371 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") filed by Stephen H. Schwartz, Crystal Boykin, Harry Bass, Robert Pepper, Epic Games, Inc., Edward Lawrence, Kevin Fahey, Edward W. Hayter, (247 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed by Apple Inc., (261 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (260 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed by Apple Inc., (378 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to G to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (376 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed by Apple Inc., (262 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition") filed by Epic Games, Inc., (270 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to L to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions") filed by Epic Games, Inc... Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/26/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 289 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Justin C. Clarke ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15491937.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Clarke, Justin) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 288 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15490719.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Yang, Betty) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 #Electronic filing error. No caption Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requireme nt. Re-filing of the document is not necessary, but please include a caption page in the future. Re: #229 Exhibits filed by Epic Games, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 287 EXHIBITS re #271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to G to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition"), #270 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to L to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions"), #261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits"), #262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition") Declaration of E. Dettmer In Support of Motions to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Joint Discovery Letter re Apex Witnesses), #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 1), #4 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. B), #5 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. C), #6 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. E), #7 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. F), #8 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. I), #9 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. J), #10 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. K), #11 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. L), #12 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Joint Discovery Letter re Deposition of Cook), #13 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. C), #14 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. D), #15 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. E), #16 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. F), #17 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. G), #18 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Joint Discovery Letter re Apex Witnesses), #19 Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 1), #20 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. A), #21 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. B), #22 Unredacted Version of Document to be Sealed (Ex. C), #23 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Exhibit D), #24 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. E), #25 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. F), #26 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. G), #27 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. H), #28 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. I), #29 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. J), #30 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. K), #31 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. L), #32 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Joint Discovery Letter re Cook Deposition), #33 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. C), #34 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. D), #35 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. E), #36 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. F), #37 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. G), #38 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #271 , #270 , #261 , #262 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 286 EXHIBITS re #246 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, ("Unsealed Exhibits to Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic's Requests for Production of Documents [ECF No. 213]") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Related document(s) #246 ) (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 285 Declaration of Gary A. Bornstein in Support of #269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #269 ) (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 284 Declaration of Kyle Batter in Support of #269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Related document(s) #269 ) (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Kenneth Batter (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Kenneth Batter on behalf of Victoria Maroulis (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 281 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM FURTHER DISCOVERY HEARING. Video Camera hearing set for 2/1/2021 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh On 1/29/2021, by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for the 2/1/2021 Disco very Zoom Hearing at 10:00 a.m. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Video Camera hearing set for 2/1/2021 10:00 AM. (Related documents(s) 280 ) (This is a text -only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 280 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held by Zoom Videoconferencing on 1/25/2021 at 10:00 a.m.Total Time in Court: 1 hour 25 minutes Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Appearances:Case No. 11-6714 YGR (TSH)- In re Apple iPhone Antitrust Litigation:Rachele R. Byrd for Consumer PlaintiffsJay Srinivasan for Defendant Apple Inc.Case No. 19-3074 YGR(TSH)- Cameron et al. v. Apple Inc.Robert F. Lopez and Benjamin J. Siegel for Plaintiff DevelopersJay Srinivasan - for Defendant Apple Inc.Case No. 20-5640 YGR (TSH)- Epic Games v. Apple Inc.Lauren Moskowitz for Plaintiff EpicVictoria Maroulis, Kyle Batter and Richard Rosalez for non-party SEAJay Srinivasan for Defendant Apple Inc.Proceedings: Discovery Conferences held. Matters submitted. Court to issue Order. Deadlines and Hearing: Joint Letter Briefs due 1/29/2021 by Noon. A further hearing is scheduled for: 2/1/2021 at 10:00 a.m., by Zoom. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 279 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Samsung Electronics America Inc, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 278 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 25, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 277 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 #Electronic filing error. No caption Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requireme nt and re-file in its entirety. Re: #275 Exhibits filed by Epic Games, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 276 Joint Submission Regarding Trial Elements, Legal Framework and Remedies re #132 Order by Epic Games, Inc. and Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-Remedies Sought--Specific Relief)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 1/22/2021) Modified on 1/25/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2021 Filing 275 EXHIBITS re: ECF 213 as per Court Order in ECF 246 filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #247 Stipulation and Amended Protective Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 273 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to G to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition") (Karin, John) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 272 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #270 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to L to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions") (Karin, John) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to G to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition") filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren M. Moskowitz, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 270 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A to L to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions") filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren M. Moskowitz, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Srinivasan, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Letter Brief re Discovery, #4 Exhibit 1, Joint Letter Brief re Discovery, #5 Exhibit 2, Joint Letter Brief re Discovery, #6 Exhibit 3, Joint Letter Brief re Discovery, #7 Exhibit 4, Joint Letter Brief re Discovery, #8 Exhibit 5, Joint Letter Brief re Discovery, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 (This is a duplicate order - of Discovery Order 267 - posted in error) Discovery Order rescheduling Discovery Hearing from 1/21/2021 to 1/25/2021 at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/20/2021.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) Modified on 1/20/2021 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Discovery Order rescheduling hearing from 1/21/2021 to 1/25/2021 at 10:00 a.m., by Zoom Video Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/20/2021. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Kenneth Batter (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Kenneth Batter for Victoria F. Maroulis (Batter, Kyle) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 264 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition") (Karin, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 263 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Plaintiffs' Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") (Karin, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition") filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren A. Moskowitz, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cook Deposition)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 1/20/2021) Modified on 1/21/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2021 Set/Reset Hearing re : Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 1/25/2021 at 10:00 AM., before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel shall by COB on Friday, 1/22/2021, email the Courtroom Deputy with their appearances. Courtroom Deputy email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions and Supporting Exhibits") filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren A. Moskowitz, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Cue and Federighi Depositions, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 1/19/2021) Modified on 1/21/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2021 Filing 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Discovery filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Lo, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Letter Brief re Discovery, #4 Exhibit 1, Joint Letter Brief re Discovery, #5 Exhibit 2, Joint Letter Brief re Discovery, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lo, Jason) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #252 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Karen L. Dunn. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #251 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William A. Isaacson. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #250 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jessica E. Phillips. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #244 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hector J. Valdes. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #238 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christina N. Barreiro. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #237 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Samuel A. Stuckey. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #236 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Vanessa A. Lavely. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 252 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Karen L. Dunn ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15461748.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 251 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for William A. Isaacson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15461670.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 250 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jessica E. Phillips ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15461555.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Phillips, Jessica) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Richardson Dearborn (Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 248 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 18, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 247 AMENDED STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Apple Inc. and Epic Games, Inc. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 1/14/2021) Modified on 1/15/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting in part and denying in part #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (365) Amended Stipulation in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; granting (233) Amended Stipulation in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR; granting (242) Amended Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-05640-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 244 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15427394.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Valdes, Hector) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #227 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 242 AMENDED STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Apple Inc., Apple, Inc., and Epic Games, Inc. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 1/8/2021) Modified on 1/11/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER RE: CASE SCHEDULING. Set/Reset Deadlines as to extending briefing deadlines in 11-6714-YGR and 19-3074- YGR: Class Certification Motion due by 6/1/2021. Responses due by 8/10/2021. Replies due by 10/12/2021. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2021 10:00 AM OPST in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/8/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 240 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held on 1/8/2021 by Zoom Video Conference. Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus/Total Time in Court: 9:00-9:17 - 17 minutes. Appearances: Case No. 11-6714 YGR (TSH)-In re Apple iPhone Antitrust Litigation:Counselfor Consumer Plaintiffs: Rachele R. Byrd Counsel for Defendant: Jay Srinivasan for Apple Inc. Case No. 19-3074 YGR(TSH)- Cameron et al. v. Apple Inc.Counsel for Plaintiffs: Robert F. Lopez/Benjamin J. Siegel - for CameronCounsel for Defendant: Jay Srinivasan - for Apple Inc.Case No. 20-5640 YGR (TSH)- Epic Games v. Apple Inc.Counsel for Plaintiff: Lauren Moskowitz for EpicCounsel for Defendant: Jay Srinivasan - Apple Inc. Proceedings: Discovery Hearing held, argument heard, matter submitted. Court to issue Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #211 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Karen Lent. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 238 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15413786.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barreiro, Christina) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 237 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15413809.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stuckey, Samuel) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 236 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15413727.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lavely, Vanessa) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Discovery Order re #233 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/7/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 234 Statement Concerning Defendant Apple Inc.'s Statement in Response to Order Tentatively Denying Administrative Motion to Modify Case Schedule by Epic Games, Inc.. (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 1/6/2021) Modified on 1/7/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2021 Filing 233 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 232 EXHIBITS re #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A and B to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic's Requests for Production of Documents filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Joint Discovery Letter Brief), #2 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 6), #3 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 7), #4 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. A), #5 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. B))(Related document(s) #213 , #217 ) (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 231 Declaration of Jay P. Srinivasan in Support of #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A and B to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic's Requests for Production of Documents filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Joint Discovery Letter Brief), #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 6), #4 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 7), #5 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. A), #6 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. B))(Related document(s) #213 , #217 ) (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 230 Joint Request for Clarification re #132 Order by Apple Inc. and Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 1/4/2021) Modified on 1/5/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 1, 2021 Filing 229 EXHIBITS re: ECF 187 as per Court Order in ECF 206 filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 1/1/2021)
December 31, 2020 Filing 228 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #227 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portion of Transcript") (Karin, John) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 227 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portion of Transcript") filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren A. Moskowitz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Transcript [Redacted], #5 Transcript [Unredacted])(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Discovery Order re #213 Joint Letter. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/31/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to E. Dettmer Declaration filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration ISO Sealing, #3 Declaration ISO Statement, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 224 Declaration of Ethan D. Dettmer in Support of #223 Notice (Other) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 223 STATEMENT in Response to Order Tentatively Denying Administrative Motion to Modify Case Schedule by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Rollins)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 12/31/2020) Modified on 1/4/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/30/2020 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 220 Discovery Hearing held by Zoom Videoconferencing on 12/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson:Total Time in Court: 59 mins.Court Reporter: Ana Dub Appearances:Case No. 11-6714 YGR (TSH)-In re Apple iPhone Antitrust Litigation:Counselfor Consumer Plaintiffs: Rachele R. Byrd Counsel for Defendant: Jay Srinivasan for Apple Inc.Case No. 19-3074 YGR(TSH)- Cameron et al. v. Apple Inc.Counsel for Plaintiffs: Robert F. Lopez - for CameronCounsel for Defendant: Jay Srinivasan - for Apple Inc.Case No. 20-5640 YGR (TSH)- Epic Games v. Apple Inc.Counsel for Plaintiff: Lauren Moskowitz for EpicCounsel for Defendant: Jay Srinivasan - Apple Inc.Proceedings: Discovery Conferences held. Matter submitted. Court to issue Order.Deadlines and Hearing: By 1/6/2021 letter briefs due by Noon, for the 1/8/2021 discovery hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 219 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 12-18-2020, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (329 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/29/2021. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 218 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ("Epic Games, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A and B to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic's Requests for Production of Documents") (Karin, John) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supporting Exhibits A and B to the Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic's Requests for Production of Documents filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/30/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER re ECF No. #213 : On page 4 of the joint discovery letter brief, Epic Games cites APL_APPSTORE_00227526 and an excerpt from the Fischer deposition. The Court orders Epic to file those documents by noon Pacific time on December 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/29/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 215 Clerks Notice Continuing Discovery Hearing: The Zoom Videoconference Discovery hearing scheduled for tomorrow 12/29/2020 at 10:00 a.m., is CONTINUED TO: 12/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m. All parties shall join the Zoom hearing at that date and time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 214 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Karin, John) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren A. Moskowitz in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Epic's Requests for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 24, 2020 Filing 212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Transcript), #3 Declaration of E. Dettmer - Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Filed Under Seal, #4 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #5 Declaration of E. Dettmer - Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #6 Exhibit A - Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #7 Exhibit B - Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #8 Exhibit C - Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed)(Lewis, Veronica) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 211 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15359048.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #166 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin Diessel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #164 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Elizabeth Rodd. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #163 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nicole Castle. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #162 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John Calandra. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting in part and denying in part (308) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; granting in part and denying in part (187) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:19-cv-03074-YGR; granting in part and denying in part (187) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05640-YGR. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 205 EXHIBITS re #187 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Joint Discovery Letter Brief), #2 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. A), #3 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. C), #4 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 4))(Related document(s) #187 ) (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 204 Declaration of Jay P. Srinivasan in Support of #187 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Joint Discovery Letter Brief), #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. A), #4 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. C), #5 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 4))(Related document(s) #187 ) (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held by Zoom Videoconference on 12/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Total Time in Court: 17 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Appearances:11-6714 YGR (TSH) - In Re Apple iPhone Antitrust LitigationConsumer Plaintiffs Counsel: Rachele R. ByrdDefendant Apple Counsel: Jay Srinivasan19-3074 YGR (TSH) - Cameron et al. v. Apple Inc.Counsel for Plaintiffs: Benjamin J. SiegelCounsel for Defendant: Jay Srinivasan20-5640 YGR (TSH) - Epic Games, Inc. v. Apple Inc.Plaintiff's Counsel: Lauren MoskowitzDefendant's Counsel: Jay SrinivasanProceedings: Discovery hearing held. Court had reviewed the parties joint letter brief and issued an Oral Ruling: There shall be 16 Apple Depositions. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Discovery Order re: (323 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR), (201 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR), (199 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR). Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/18/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 201 Joint Discovery Letter Brief regarding Apple depositions filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit 1)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #161 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peter John Sacripanti. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #168 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert S. Hoff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 198 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-15-20, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (313 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Transcript Order, (311 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Transcript Order, (316 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Transcript Order, (312 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2021. (kapS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020) Modified on 12/30/2020 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2020 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan D. Dettmer (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 196 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 12/29/2020 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.On 12/28/2020 by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for the 12/29/2020 Discovery Zoom Hearing. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Zoom Video Camera hearing set for 12/29/2020 at 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 195 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 1/8/2021 at 9:00 AM., before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.On 1/7/2021, by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for the 1/7/2021 Discovery Zoom Hearing. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.g ov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 1/8/2021 at 9:00 AM . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 194 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 1/8/2021 at 9:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.On 1/7/2021, by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for the 1/7/2021 Discovery Zoom Hearing. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 1/8/2021 at 09:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 193 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing (Apex Issue) set for 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.On 1/20/2021, by COB, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know appearances for the 1/21/2021 Discovery Zoom Hearing. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand .uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Discovery Order re: ECF Nos. #269 , #270 , #271 , #295 , #298 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; ECF Nos. #145 , #146 , #147 , #173 , #177 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR; ECF Nos. #170 , #173 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/16/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 191 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 12/18/2020 at 9:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.On 12/17/2020, counsel will email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, with their appearances so that they may be promoted to Panelist, so they may participate in the hearing on 12/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Courtroom Deputy email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or vi deoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Zoom Video Camera hearing set for 12/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this ent ry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held by Zoom Videoconferencing on 12/15/2020 at 10:00 a.m.Total Time in Court: 2 hours 56 mins.Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Appearances:Case No. 11-6714 YGR (TSH)-In re Apple iPhone Antitrust Litigation:Rachele R. Byrd for Consumer PlaintiffsEthan Dettmer and Jay Srinivasan for Defendant Apple Inc.Lawrence Papale for Plaintiff Edward Lawrence Case No. 19-3074 YGR(TSH)- Cameron et al. v. Apple Inc.Counsel for Plaintiffs:Steve W. Berman Robert F. LopezBenjamin J. SiegelTheodore WojcikCounsel for Defendant Apple Inc.:Ethan Dettmer and Jay Srinivasan Case No. 20-5640 YGR (TSH)- Epic Games v. Apple Inc.Lauren Moskowitz for Plaintiff EpicEthan Dettmer and Jay Srinivasan for Defendant Apple Inc.Proceedings: Discovery Conferences held. Matter submitted. Court to issue Order.Deadlines and Hearing:Re Scheduling of Depositions:Counsel to meet and confer re Number of Depositions. By noon, on 12/17/2020, they shall file a stipulation and proposed order, of if unable to agree, a Joint Letter Brief, no more than ten (10 )pages, five (5) pages each. A hearing will be scheduled for: 12/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m., by Zoom Webinar for further hearing re depositions.Apex Issue: Counsel to file a Joint Letter Brief by 1/19/2020, COB, no more than ten (10) pages, five(5)pages each. Hearing scheduled for: 1/21/2020 at 10:00 a.m., by Zoom Webinar.Re Docket No. 269 - Consumer Plaintiff's request for Production 47: Parties to file a joint discovery letter brief by 1/6/2021 concerning (and attaching) Plaintiffs expert declaration (and any declaration by Apple in response) concerning the relevance of RFP 47 to the Consumer Plaintiffs claims. Hearing scheduled for: 1/8/2021 at 9:00 a.m., by Zoom Webinar.Re additional letter briefs on other discovery disputes: The next round of joint letter briefs concerning issues the parties previewed at the end of the hearing are due 12/28/2020 by Noon. Hearing scheduled for 12/29/2020 at 10:00 a.m., by Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (186 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: VALIDATION PROTOCOL filed by Apple Inc., (307 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: VALIDATION PROTOCOL filed by Apple Inc., (186 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: VALIDATION PROTOCOL filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/15/2020. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 188 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #187 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Karin, John) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 187 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yonatan Even in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit A, #17 Exhibit B, #18 Exhibit C, #19 Exhibit D)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 12/15/2020) Modified on 12/16/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing Video Camera hearing set for 12/18/2020 09:00 AM. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 186 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: VALIDATION PROTOCOL filed by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc., and Donal R. Cameron. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 12/14/2020) Modified on 12/15/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2020 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C Lo (Lo, Jason) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 184 EXHIBITS re #173 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Joint Discovery Letter Brief), #2 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 1), #3 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 4), #4 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 6))(Related document(s) #173 ) (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 183 Declaration of Jay P. Srinivasan in Support of #173 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Joint Discovery Letter Brief), #3 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 1), #4 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 4), #5 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed (Ex. 6))(Related document(s) #173 ) (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 182 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/20, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (179 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Transcript Order, (181 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Transcript Order, (180 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2021. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/09/2020 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/9/2020 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 179 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/09/2020 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 178 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held by Zoom on 12/9/2020 at 1:00 p.m.Total Time in Court: 59 minutes/Recorded by Zoom: 1:00-1:59. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Counsel Appearances: 4:11-cv-6714 YGR (TSH)- In re Apple iPhone Antitrust LitigationCounsel for Pltf: Rachele R. Byrd/Counsel for Def: Ethan Dettmer4:19-cv-3074 YGR (TSH) - Cameron, et al. v. Apple Inc.Counsel for Pltf: Robert F. Lopez/Counsel for Def: Ethan Dettmer4:20-cv-5640 YGR(TSH) - Epic Games v. Apple Inc.Counsel for Pltf: Lauren Moskowitz/Counsel for Def: Ethan DettmerProceedings: Discovery Hearing held. Court Ordered as follows: Epic Games and Apple are to meet and confer re validation procedure in light of the Courts guidance. By 12/14/2020, the parties shall file either a stipulation and proposed order or a joint discovery letter brief with competing proposed orders. This issue will be added to the agenda for the December 15, 2020 hearing Court also Ordered: Parties to meet and confer re Deposition limits. By 12/14/2020, they shall file either a stipulation and proposed order or a joint discovery letter brief not to exceed 10 pages (5 pages per side). This issue will also be added to the agenda for the December 15 hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/9/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Marvin Stevens (Stevens, Bethany) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Cannom on behalf of Defendant and Counter-claimant Apple Inc. (Cannom, Hannah) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 175 CLERK'S NOTICE adding an additional matter to the Agenda of the Discovery Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2020 at 10:00 a.m.:At the Discovery Hearing presently scheduled for 12/15/2020 at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson, the Court is adding an additional matter for discussion. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the Joint Letter Brief, filed on ECF, dated 12/7/2020.Any questions shall be directed to the Courtroom Deputy by email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. re #173 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Karin, John) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 173 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF LAUREN A. MOSKOWITZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS, #2 Proposed Order, #3 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF REGARDING ADDITIONAL APPLE DOCUMENT CUSTODIANS, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 172 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Discovery Hearing set for 12/15/2020 at 10:00 AM - Zoom Videoconference Only. before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. This is re ECF Docket No. 158, Joint Discovery Letter Brief.On 12/14/2020, counsel will email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, with their appearances so that they may be promoted to Panelist, so they may participate in the hearing on 12/15/2020 at 10:00 AM. Courtroom Deputy email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Per sons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Discovery Hearing set for 12/15/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (Related documents(s) #158 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 171 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Discovery Hearing set for 12/9/2020 01:00 PM - Videoconference Only, re Joint Letter Brief dated 12/2/2020, re validation protocol, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. On 12/8/2020, counsel will email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, with their appearances so that they may be promoted to Panelist, so they may participate in the hearing on 12/9/2020 at 1:00 PM. Courtroom Deputy email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Discovery Hearing by Zoom Video Conference set for 12/9/2020 01:00 PM, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (Rel ated documents(s) #170 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 170 Joint Discovery Letter Brief("Joint Letter Brief Regarding Validation Protocol") filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #159 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to J. Wesley Earnhardt. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials YGR immediately after the case number. Re: #168 MOTI ON for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15226565.) filed by Epic Games, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 168 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15226565.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hoff, Robert) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 167 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING VALIDATION OF DOCUMENT PRODUCTIONS by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc., and Donald R. Cameron (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 11/20/2020) Modified on 11/23/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2020 Filing 166 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15215284.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Diessel, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #113 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 164 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Rodd ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15211193.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Rodd, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 163 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nicole Castle ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15211140.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Castle, Nicole) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 162 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for John Calandra ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15211101.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Calandra, John) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 161 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Peter John Sacripanti ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15211069.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Sacripanti, Peter) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 159 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15200394.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Earnhardt, Joe) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 158 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING VALIDATION OF DOCUMENT PRODUCTIONS by Apple Inc., Epic Games, Inc., and Donald R. Cameron (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 11/13/2020) Modified on 11/16/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2020 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 10, 2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Lowery, Michelle) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 156 Transcript of Proceedings before Judge Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #155 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2021. (Related documents(s) #155 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 11, 2020 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 10, 2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 160 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held via Zoom Webinar and Submitted on 11/10/2020 re #113 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings("Counter-Defendant Epic Games, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings") filed by Epic Games, Inc. Total Time in Court: 17 minutes. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #151 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John I.Karin. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 153 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING VALIDATION OF DOCUMENT PRODUCTIONS by Apple Inc. and Epic Games, Inc. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 11/9/2020) Modified on 11/10/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #142 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Anna Casey. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 151 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15162150.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Karin, John) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle S Lowery for Defendant Apple Inc. (Lowery, Michelle) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Elena Zarabozo on behalf of Defendant and Counter-claimant Apple Inc. (Zarabozo, Elena) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A Schaeffer on behalf of Defendant and Counter-claimant Apple Inc. (Schaeffer, Scott) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan N Schlom on behalf of Defendant and Counter-claimant Apple Inc. (Schlom, Evan) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina Marie Robson on behalf of Defendant and Counter-claimant Apple Inc. (Robson, Katrina) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Tryon Pletcher on behalf of Defendant and Counter-claimant Apple Inc. (Pletcher, Anna) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Eberhart on behalf of Defendant and Counter-claimant Apple Inc. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION re (133 in 4:19-cv-03074-YGR) Notice (Other), filed by Donald R. Cameron, Barry Sermons, Apple Inc., Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc., (255 in 4:11-cv-06714-YGR) Notice (Other), filed by Stephen H. Schwartz, James Blackwell, Robert Pepper, Harry Bass, Crystal Boykin, Apple Inc., Edward Lawrence, Kevin Fahey, Edward W. Hayter, (141 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Notice (Other), filed by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/2/2020. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 142 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15142333.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Casey, Anna) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 141 FURTHER JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Order Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Apple Inc. and Epic Games, Inc. (Attachments: #1 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 10/28/2020) Modified on 10/29/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #133 Stipulation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/19/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 137 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #113 . Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2020 03:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinar (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #113 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ("Counter-Defendant Epic Games, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion fo r Judgment on the Pleadings"). Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Hearing set for 11/10/2020 03:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 136 JOINT Statement Regarding Order RE: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Apple Inc. and Epic Games, Inc (Attachments: #1 Draft ESI Order)(Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 10/26/2020) Modified on 10/28/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2020 Filing 135 REPLY (re #113 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ("Counter-Defendant Epic Games, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings") ) ("Reply Memorandum In Support Of Counter-Defendant Epic Games, Inc.'s Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/24/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 134 RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #135 *** REPLY (re #113 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ("Counter-Defendant Epic Games, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings") ) ("Reply Memorandum In Support Of Counter-Defendant Epic Games, Inc.'s Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/23/2020) Modified on 10/26/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2020 Filing 133 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Document Subpoenas to Non-Parties, Authenticity and Service filed by Epic Games, Inc. and Apple, Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/22/2020) Modified on 10/23/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas Hixson for Discovery purposes. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/21/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/19/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/19/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference.Total Time in Court: 1:26. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 130 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/19/2020, before Judge Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (126 in 4:20-cv-05640-YGR) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 129 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #113 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ("Counter-Defendant Epic Games, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings") ) (AMENDED) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Mark) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/19/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Donald R. Cameron, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/19/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 19, 2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 124 Proposed Order re #123 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Apple Inc.. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 123 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #113 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ("Counter-Defendant Epic Games, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings") ) filed byApple Inc.. (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 125 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE RELATED CASES 11-CV-6714-YGR; 19-CV-3074 AND 20-CV-5640-YGR FOR THE Further Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 10/19/2020 AT 09:30 AM by Zoom Webinar Videoconference. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr < /A
October 15, 2020 Filing 122 Joint Proposed Agenda for Case Management Conference by Epic Games, Inc. and Apple Inc. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/15/2020) Modified on 10/16/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2020 Filing 121 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 120 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Epic Games, Inc. and Apple, Inc.. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/12/2020) Modified on 10/14/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2020 Filing 119 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ; granting in part and denying in part #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 117 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CASE SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/15/2021. Opening Reports due by 2/15/2021. Rebuttal Reports due by 3/15/2021. Joint statement re compliance deadline is due by 3/26/2021. Bench Trial set for 5/3/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement filed by 4/9/2021. Pretrial Conference set for WEDNESDAY, 4/21/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance deadline re pretrial preparation is set for 4/2/2021 09:01 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint proposed agenda for the 10/19/20 CMC filed by 10/15/2020. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/6/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Epic Games, Inc.. Responses due by 10/16/2020. Replies due by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 10/2/2020) Modified on 10/5/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #110 Stipulation and Protective Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Apple Inc. and Epic Games, Inc.. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 10/1/2020) Modified on 10/2/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2020 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 106 ANSWER TO #66 COUNTERCLAIM by Epic Games, Inc.. (Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 9/29/2020) Modified on 9/30/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2020 Filing 105 Joint Statement Concerning Trial by Apple Inc. Epic Games, Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 9/29/2020) Modified on 9/30/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER RELATING TO CASE MANAGEMENT ISSUES. Case Management Conference set 10/19/2020 will be held at 9:30am PDT via Zoom.The 1:30pm time is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/29/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Donald R. Cameron, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 99 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/19/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing re #104 Order : Further Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 09:30 AM PDT via Zoom. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 9/28/2020 and submitted re #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Epic Games, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 * 01:30 PM * via Zoom.Total Time in Court: 2:31. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/24/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 9/28/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (napS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2020 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 28, 2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 92 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING AS TO THE Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/28/2020 09:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinar s (public hearings). I f you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666International numbers available: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/u/advFLxrTkxGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Preliminary Injunction Hearing #61 set for Monday 9/28/2020 09:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 91 JOINT Statement re #85 Order, Set Deadlines by Epic Games, Inc. and Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/24/2020) Modified on 9/25/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Filing 90 REPLY (re #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) ("Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc.'s Motion for a Preliminary Injunction") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 89 Declaration of M. Brent Byars in Support of #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ("Declaration of M. Brent Byars in Further Support of Plaintiff Epic Games Inc.'s Motion for a Preliminary Injunction") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #61 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 88 Declaration of Dr. David S. Evans in Support of #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ("Second Declaration of Dr. David S. Evans") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Related document(s) #61 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 87 Declaration of Andrew Grant in Support of #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ("Declaration of Andrew Grant in Further Support of Plaintiff Epic Games Inc.'s Motion for a Preliminary Injunction") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #61 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 86 Declaration of Timothy Sweeney in Support of #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ("Declaration of Timothy Sweeney in Further Support of Plaintiff Epic Games Inc.'s Motion for a Preliminary Injunction") filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #61 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE DEADLINE RE: SCHEDULE. Joint Statement filed by 4:00 PM (PDT) on Thursday, 9/24/2020. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/18/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 84 ASSOCIATION of Counsel E. Joshua Rosenkranz and William F. Stute by Apple Inc.. (Stute, William) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William F. Stute. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to E. Joshua Rosenkranz. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 81 Proposed Order re #73 Opposition/Response to Motion, #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Apple Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 80 DECLARATION of Jay P. Srinivasan in Opposition to #73 Opposition/Response to Motion, #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #73 , #61 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Mike Schmid in Opposition to #73 Opposition/Response to Motion, #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #73 , #61 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Richard Schmalensee in Opposition to #73 Opposition/Response to Motion, #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #73 , #61 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Lorin M. Hitt in Opposition to #73 Opposition/Response to Motion, #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #73 , #61 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Mark Grimm in Opposition to #73 Opposition/Response to Motion, #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #73 , #61 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Mark G. Graff in Opposition to #73 Opposition/Response to Motion, #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #73 , #61 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Phillip W. Schiller in Opposition to #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #73 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #61 , #73 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 73 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byApple Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 72 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14933618.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/12/2020 filed by Apple Inc.. (Stute, William) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 71 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14933073.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/11/2020 filed by Apple Inc.. (Rosenkranz, E. Joshua) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Perry (Perry, Mark) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 12, 2020 Filing 69 RE-FILED AT DKT. NO. 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14933618.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Stute, William) (Filed on 9/12/2020) Modified on 9/16/2020 (fs, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2020 Filing 68 RE-FILED AT DKT. NO. 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14933073.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Rosenkranz, E. Joshua) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/16/2020 (fs, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2020 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/24/20 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint with Trial by jury on all issues so triable , COUNTERCLAIM against Epic Games, Inc. byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers to be held via Zoom. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 65 Declaration of Timothy Sweeney in Support of #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #61 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 64 Declaration of Nicholas Penwarden in Support of #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Related document(s) #61 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 63 Declaration of Andrew Grant in Support of #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #61 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 62 Declaration of David S. Evans in Support of #61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Related document(s) #61 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Epic Games, Inc.. Responses due by 9/18/2020. Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Brent Byars, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Proposed Order)(Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren A. Moskowitz. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14896973.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (NY))(Moskowitz, Lauren) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #56 Stipulation re Briefing Page Limits. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 57 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Cases 20-cv-5792-EMC; 20-cv-5671-JD; 19-cv-3074-YGR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Page Limits on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Epic Games, Inc. and Apple Inc. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2020 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/24/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Epic Games, Inc. Of Summons, Complaint, And Supplementary Material On Apple Inc. (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/24/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/24/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 50 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 24, 2020, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #45 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2020. (Related documents(s) #45 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/24/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held via Zoom and submitted on 8/24/2020 re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Epic Games, Inc. Total Time in Court: 1:26. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/24/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/26/2020 (napS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/24/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/26/2020 (napS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Filing 44 Joint Submission of Schedule 2 to Apple Development Program License Agreement by Epic Games, Inc., Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule 2 Exhibit)(Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/25/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY (re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/23/2020) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2020 Filing 42 Declaration of Nicholas Penwarden in Support of #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/23/2020)
August 23, 2020 Filing 41 Declaration of M. Brent Byars in Support of #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/23/2020)
August 23, 2020 Filing 40 Declaration of Kevin Gammill in Support of #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/23/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 39 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for Monday, 8/24/2020 03:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinars (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will j oin as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666 International numbers available: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/u/advFLxrTkx General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 8/24/2020 03:00 PM. (Related documents(s) #17 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER PERMITTING LIMITED REPLY BRIEF FROM PLAINTIFF EPIC GAMES, INC. Reply filed on or before 9:00 AM PDT on Sunday, 8/23/2020 and limited to ten (10) pages or less. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/21/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 37 DECLARATION (re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof ) Declaration of Philip W. Schiller in Support of Apple's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #9 Declaration)(Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 8/21/2020) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2020 Filing 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed by Apple Inc. (Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 8/21/2020) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Veronica S. Lewis. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cynthia E. Richman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Veronica S. Lewis ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14841573.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Lewis, Veronica) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Cynthia E. Richman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14841513.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Richman, Cynthia) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/19/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/19/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 8/20/2020) Modified on 8/20/2020 (napS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Status Conference held on 8/19/2020 via Zoom platform. Defendant Apple's Responses due by noon on Friday, 8/21/2020. Motion for TRO Hearing set for Monday, 8/24/2020 03:00 PM via Zoom platform before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Total Time in Court: 28 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 19. 2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/20/2020 (napS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 Renotice motion hearing re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RELATING CASES 4:19-cv-3074-YGR and 3:20-cv-5640-EMC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/19/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE. Per the Court's discussion with the parties, Defendant shall have until Friday, August 21, 2020, to file an opposition to #17 Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order. The hearing on the motion is temporarily vacated. Should the instant case be transferred to Judge Gonzalez-Rogers, briefing and/or hearing dates may be subject to change. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jagannathan P Srinivasan (Srinivasan, Jagannathan) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Glen Swanson (Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Joseph Doren (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING FOR #17 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Hearing re: #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof set for 8/24/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Opposition due by 8/19/2020, 12:00 noon. No replies. Hearing to be conducted by Zoom Webinar. Information to follow. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #2 Exhibit A to Paul Riehle Declaration In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #3 Exhibit B to Paul Riehle Declaration In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #4 Exhibit C to Paul Riehle Declaration In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #5 Declaration of Andrew Grant In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #6 Exhibit A to Andrew Grant Declaration In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #7 Declaration of Nicholas Penwarden In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #8 Declaration of Timothy Sweeney In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #9 Exhibit A to Timothy Sweeney Declaration In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #10 Exhibit B to Timothy Sweeney Declaration In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #11 Proposed Order [Proposed] Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #12 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14812272.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Varney, Christine) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14811968.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Byars, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14811945.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14811915.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Forrest, Katherine) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14811813.) filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bornstein, Gary) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Epic Games, Inc... (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Epic Games, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14811219.). Filed byEpic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riehle, Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Games, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Richman
Represented By: Veronica Smith Lewis
Represented By: William F Stute
Represented By: Daniel Glen Swanson
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Mark A. Perry
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doren
Represented By: E. Joshua Rosenkranz
Represented By: Jagannathan P Srinivasan
Represented By: Jessica E Phillips
Represented By: Hannah Cannom
Represented By: Evan R Kreiner
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Michelle S Lowery
Represented By: Scott A Schaeffer
Represented By: Bethany Marvin Stevens
Represented By: David R. Eberhart
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Betty X Yang
Represented By: Jason C Lo
Represented By: John J. Calandra
Represented By: Harry Phillips
Represented By: Anna Tryon Pletcher
Represented By: Veronica Smith Moye
Represented By: Peter John Sacripanti
Represented By: Elizabeth Andrea Rodd
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Katrina Marie Robson
Represented By: Karen Leah Dunn
Represented By: Nicole Lauren Castle
Represented By: Meredith Richardson Dearborn
Represented By: Elena Zarabozo
Represented By: Evan N Schlom
Represented By: Arpine Lawyer
Represented By: Michael R Huttenlocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brent Byars
Represented By: Christine A Varney
Represented By: Katherine B. Forrest
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Riehle
Represented By: Yonatan Even
Represented By: Gary Andrew Bornstein
Represented By: Lauren Ann Moskowitz
Represented By: Nathan E Denning
Represented By: Justin C Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Donald R. Cameron
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kabam, Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Judith Bond Jennison
Represented By: David P. Chiappetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Valve Corporation
Represented By: Gavin W. Skok
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PayPal, Inc.
Represented By: Yi Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Visa Inc.
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Gearbox Entertainment
Represented By: Eric J. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Roblox, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Maben Hammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Spotify USA Inc.
Represented By: Shane Michael Palmer
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Brendan P. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Yoga Buddhi Co.
Represented By: Brandon Kressin
Represented By: Douglas James Dixon
Represented By: Jonathan Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Victoria F. Maroulis
Represented By: Kyle Kenneth Batter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Match Group, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas James Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Shelley Gould
Represented By: Karl C. Huth
Represented By: Matthew John Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A Macdonald
Represented By: Lauren M. Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Google LLC
Represented By: Asim M. Bhansali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew G Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
Represented By: Kyle Kenneth Batter
Represented By: Victoria F. Maroulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NVIDIA Corporation
Represented By: Marc David Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Claire Curran-Huberty
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring
Represented By: Justin Paul Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 18 Media Organizations
Represented By: Katie Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: App Annie Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Molly Newland Tullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Ellen London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert Pepper
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Represented By: Brittany Nicole DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Edward W. Hayter
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Represented By: Brittany Nicole DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stephen H. Schwartz
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Represented By: Brittany Nicole DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Edward Lawrence
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Represented By: Brittany Nicole DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [