Pure Natures Design v. Boswell et al
Plaintiff: Pure Natures Design, Inc. and Pure Natures Design
Defendant: Greg Sarlo and Joseph Boswell
Counter Defendant: Michael Babcock and Xtreme Healthy Life Styles
Case Number: 4:2020cv05802
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/21/20. ***Civil Case Terminated. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Joseph Boswell . (Ryan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AND STAYING FURTHER ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/16/20. Show Cause Response due by 9/23/2020. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Xtreme Healthy Life Styles. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 23 Proposed Summons. (Ryan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 22 Joseph Boswell & Greg Sarlo's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Pure Natures Design byJoseph Boswell. (Ryan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pure Natures Design (Wellman, Christopher) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joseph Boswell. (Ryan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying #2 Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING ON #7 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY (re #2 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byPure Natures Design. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Wellman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Michael Babcock, #5 Exhibit A)(Wellman, Christopher) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORRECTED ORDER Re Request for Extension.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar for Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 25, 2020, nunc pro tunc to August 24, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #14 Order filed by Pure Natures Design, Joseph Boswell, Greg Sarlo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wellman, Christopher) (Filed on 8/25/2020) Modified on 8/26/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re [12-5] Request for Extension to File Opposition to #2 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Opposition to Request for Extension due by 12:00 p.m. 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar for Jeffrey S. White on August 24, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pure Natures Design (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wellman, Christopher) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byJoseph Boswell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Boswell, #2 Exhibit A to Boswell Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Boswell Decl., #4 Declaration of Greg Sarlo, #5 Declaration of Jeffrey Ryan, #6 Exhibit A to Ryan Decl.)(Ryan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey F. Ryan (Ryan, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/20/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Joseph Boswell, Greg Sarlo. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON #2 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Responses due by 3:00 p.m. 8/24/2020. Replies due by 3:00 p.m. 8/26/2020. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 19, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA re #2 Ex Parte Application by Pure Natures Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Downs)(Wellman, Christopher) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Pure Natures Design. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Exhibit TRO, #5 Declaration Chris Wellman, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Declaration Babcock, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Declaration Downs, #13 Exhibit A, #14 Declaration Riddle, #15 Declaration Mansfield, #16 Declaration Fornter)(Wellman, Christopher) (Filed on 8/18/2020) Modified on 8/19/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14828973.). Filed byPure Natures Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wellman, Christopher) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Natures Design v. Boswell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Natures Design, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Natures Design
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Wellman
Represented By: Scott Wade Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Sarlo
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Boswell
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Michael Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Xtreme Healthy Life Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?