Immigrant Legal Resource Center et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: OneAmerica, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, International Rescue Committee and Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Chad F. Wolf
Amicus Curiae: State of Hawaii, State of New York, State of Oregon, Cato Institute, State of Nevada, Constitutional Accountability Center, State of Maryland, State of Delaware, State of Vermont, State of Rhode Island, State of Connecticut, State of Washington, State of California, State of New Jersey, Amicus Curiae 21 Counties, Cities, and Municipalities, NONPROFIT IMMIGRATION ADVOCATES AND LEGAL AND SOCIAL SERVICE PROVIDERS, Reclaim the Records, Alliance of Business Immigration Lawyers, Inc., State of Illinois, State of Michigan, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of Pennsylvania, Immigration Reform Law Institute, District of Columbia and State of Minnesota
Case Number: 4:2020cv05883
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 101 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica re #22 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint,, (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/25/2020 before Judge Jeffrey S. White by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica re #22 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint,, (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 29, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 97 Administrative Record on a Digital Storage Drive re #92 Notice of Manual Filing, filed by Chad F. Wolf. (Related document(s) #92 ) (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 96 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/25/2020, before Judge White. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #94 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 10/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2020. (Related documents(s) #94 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 95 Plaintiffs' Response to Request from the Court During September 25, 2020 Hearing filed by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica. (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2020 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/25/2020 before Judge Jeffrey S. White by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Roberts, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Supplemental Citations by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Roberts, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of Manual Filing of the Administrative Record by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Roberts, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Filing of the Administrative Record Certification and Index by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Certification of the Administrative Record, #2 Certified List of Contents of the Administrative Record)(Roberts, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2020 Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey S. White: Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2020. Total Time in Court: 3 hours 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. Plaintiff Attorney: Samina M. Bharmal. Defendant Attorney: Julie Straus Harris and Bradley Craigmyle. Attachment: Minute Order. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #84 STIPULATION to Manually File Drive Containing Electronic Copy of Administrative Record. Chambers Copies to be provided per Docket No. 76. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 25, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL QUESTIONS FOR HEARING re #27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/24/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E.T. Roberts on behalf of Defendants. (Roberts, Charles) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 86 DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING NOTICE OF RATIFICATION, ECF NO. 80 re #83 Order, #27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, And Petition For Review and Request for Stay, #80 Notice (Other), filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Related document(s) #83 , #27 , #80 ) (Straus Harris, Julie) (Filed on 9/23/2020) Modified on 9/23/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2020 Filing 85 PLAINTIFFS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re #83 Order, #27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, And Petition For Review and Request for Stay, #80 Notice (Other), filed by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica. (Related document(s) #83 , #27 , #80 ) (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 9/23/2020) Modified on 9/23/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2020 Filing 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Manually File Drive Containing Electronic Copy of Administrative Record filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie Straus Harris)(Straus Harris, Julie) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER PERMTTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON #80 Notice of Additional Authority. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 21, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 82 DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FILING, ECF NO. #77 by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Filed on 9/21/2020) Modified on 9/22/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2020 Filing 81 Supplemental Brief re #27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, And Petition For Review and Request for Stay, #78 Order Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byAsian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica. (Related document(s) #27 , #78 ) (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Ratification and Legal Authority Not Cited in Defendants' Briefs by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf re #79 Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bradley Craigmyle, #2 Exhibit CFPB v. Gordon, 819 F.3d 1179 (9th Cir. 2016))(Craigmyle, Bradley) (Filed on 9/18/2020) Modified on 9/21/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING re #27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/18/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING #77 Request for Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/19/20. Plaintiffs and Defendants Supplemental Briefs due by 12:00 PM 9/21/2020 and Shall not exceed 5 pages. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Relevant Documents and Request for Supplemental Briefing (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jesse Bless, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REQUIRING FED EX COPIES OF #75 Response to Amicus. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 15, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 75 DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO THE BRIEFS OF AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re #50 Order on Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief, #68 Order on Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief, #48 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #41 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #61 Notice of Appearance, #39 Amicus Curiae Appearance, #55 Brief by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bradley Craigmyle, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Craigmyle Declaration)(Straus Harris, Julie) (Filed on 9/15/2020) Modified on 9/16/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2020 Filing 74 REPLY (re #27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, And Petition For Review and Request for Stay ) filed byAsian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 35, #3 Exhibit 36, #4 Exhibit 37, #5 Exhibit 38, #6 Exhibit 39, #7 Exhibit 40, #8 Exhibit 41, #9 Exhibit 42, #10 Exhibit 43)(Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 73 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/25/2020 09:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an app earance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 9/21/20 by 12:00 PM PDT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjoS, COURT S TAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #71 Motion for LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZE REPLY AND INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian J. Stretch in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Excess Pages, #2 Proposed Order)(Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER AMENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMICUS BRIEF FROM RECLAIM THE RECORDS AND GIVING DEFENDANTS EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND re #68 Order on Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/13/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 69 DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS RELEVANT TO PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS UNDER THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT ALLEGING VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL VACANCIES REFORM ACT, THE HOMELAND SECURITY ACT, AND THE APPOINTMENTS CLAUSE by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Designation of an Order of Succession for the Secretary (Apr. 9, 2019), #2 Exhibit DHS Orders of Succession and Delegations of Authorities for Named Positions, DHS Delegation No. 00106, Revision No. 08.5 (Apr. 10, 2019))(Craigmyle, Bradley) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #65 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Reclaim the Records. Responses due by 12:30 pm 9/17/2020. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 67 DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO #65 RECLAIM THE RECORDS REQUEST TO FILE AMICUS Re: #66 Order by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO REQUEST TO FILE AMICUS FROM RECLAIM THE RECORDS re: #65 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Reclaim the Records. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/10/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Reclaim the Records. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Petition for Review and Request for Stay, #2 Proposed Order)(Strugar, Matthew) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Daniel Strugar for Amicus Curiae Reclaim the Records (Strugar, Matthew) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Keren Zwick. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Keren Z wick (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14923115) filed by NONPROFIT IMMIGRATION ADVOCATES AND LEGAL AND SOCIAL SERVICE PROVIDERS. (Zwick, Keren) (Filed on 9/10/2020) Modified on 9/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelo A. Paparelli (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Filing and Service)(Paparelli, Angelo) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Xiaonan April Hu. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Scott Shuchart. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REQUIRING FEDEX DELIVERY OF TWO SETS OF CHAMBERS COPIES OF DEFENDANTS BRIEF AND ADDITIONAL MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Xiaonan April Hu (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14920094.) filed by NONPROFIT IMMIGRATION ADVOCATES AND LEGAL AND SOCIAL SERVICE PROVIDERS. (Hu, Xiaonan) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re; Scott Shuchart (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14920024.) filed by NONPROFIT IMMIGRATION ADVOCATES AND LEGAL AND SOCIAL SERVICE PROVIDERS. (Shuchart, Scott) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Filing 55 Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, District of Columbia, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington. (Downer, William) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Filing 54 Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Amicus Curiae 21 Counties, Cities, and Municipalities. (Spiegel, Julia) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #40 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by State of California. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 52 Proposed Order re #49 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 51 Brief of Amicus Curiae Immigration Reform Law Institute in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Stay re #46 Order on Motion to File by Immigration Reform Law Institute. (Joseph, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #47 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief by IMMIGRATION ADVOCATES AND LEGAL AND SOCIAL SERVICE PROVIDERS. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 49 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, And Petition For Review and Request for Stay ) filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #43 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae 21 Counties, Cities, and Municipalities. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by NONPROFIT IMMIGRATION ADVOCATES AND LEGAL AND SOCIAL SERVICE PROVIDERS. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, Joseph) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #42 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED - PLEASE DISREGARD AND SEE DOCUMENT 53ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #40 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by State of California. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Craigmyle (Craigmyle, Bradley) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae 21 Counties, Cities, and Municipalities. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spiegel, Julia) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants as Amicus Curiae filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute. Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Memo of Law, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joseph, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting AS MODIFIED #38 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center.. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by State of California. Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief of the States of California, Connecticut, District of Columbia, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, New York, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, and Washington in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Downer, William) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 39 BRIEF FOR AMICUS CURIAE CATO INSTITUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS by Allison Ann Davis on behalf of Cato Institute. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Wydra, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #36 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief with Amicus Curaie Brief attached filed by Alliance of Business Immigration Lawyers, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 9/22/2020. Replies due by 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order granting leave, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service on Parties)(Malm, Steven) (Filed on 9/8/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #34 Motion for Leave to File as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs; Motion for Request for Excess Pages. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs; Motion for Request for Excess Pages filed by Cato Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogge, Mark) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Constitutional Accountability Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Wydra, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #30 Joint Motion to Modify Schedule on #27 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Opposition to Motion due by 12:00 p.m. 9/9/2020. Amicus Briefs due by 9/9/2020 at 12:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 9/15/2020 at 12:00 p.m. Defendants' Reply to Amicus Briefs due by 9/15/2020 at 12:00 p.m. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/25/2020 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 28, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule filed by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian J. Stretch, #2 Proposed Order)(Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/27/2020) Modified on 8/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CHELSEA DAVIS AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica. (Davis, Chelsea) (Filed on 8/27/2020) Modified on 8/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Requiring Delivery of Chambers Copies of #27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, And Petition For Review and Request for Stay and #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 26, 2020. (jswlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, And Petition For Review and Request for Stay filed by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 9/8/2020. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Brian J. Stretch, #2 Exhibit 1-12 to Brian J. Strech Declaration, #3 Exhibit 13-34 to Brian J. Stretch Declaration, #4 Declaration Lawrence Benito, #5 Declaration Olga Byrne, #6 Declaration Michael Byun, #7 Declaration Jeff Chenoweth, #8 Declaration Douglas B. Rand, #9 Declaration Duncan Lawrence, PhD., #10 Declaration Michael Smith, #11 Declaration Manuel Pastor Jr., #12 Declaration Melissa Rodgers, #13 Declaration Angelica Salas, #14 Declaration Rich Stolz, #15 Proposed Order)(Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica re #1 Complaint,, (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/25/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2020 11:00 AM. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Straus Harris (Straus Harris, Julie) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Chad Wolf. (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 Proposed Summons. (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #16 Jesse Bless's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Jesse Bless (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-14850768) filed by East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica. (Bless, Jesse) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/25/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, International Rescue Committee, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, OneAmerica, Asian Counseling and Referral Service (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #5 Samina M. Bharmal's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Immigrant Legal Resource Center and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OneAmerica and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Rescue Committee and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by East Bay Sanctuary Covenant and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asian Counseling and Referral Service and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Samina Bharmal ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14843684.) filed by Asian Counseling and Referral Service, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee, OneAmerica. (Bharmal, Samina) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea B. Davis (Davis, Chelsea) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Naomi Ariel Igra (Igra, Naomi) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief and Administrative Procedure Case against All Defendants with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14843547.). Filed by OneAmerica, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Asian Counseling and Referral Service, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Rescue Committee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stretch, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2020) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immigrant Legal Resource Center et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OneAmerica
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Samina M Bharmal
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stretch
Represented By: Chelsea B. Davis
Represented By: Jesse Matthew Bless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Samina M Bharmal
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stretch
Represented By: Chelsea B. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Samina M Bharmal
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stretch
Represented By: Chelsea B. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian Counseling and Referral Service
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Samina M Bharmal
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stretch
Represented By: Chelsea B. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immigrant Legal Resource Center
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Samina M Bharmal
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stretch
Represented By: Chelsea B. Davis
Represented By: Jesse Matthew Bless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay Sanctuary Covenant
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Samina M Bharmal
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stretch
Represented By: Chelsea B. Davis
Represented By: Jesse Matthew Bless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Rescue Committee
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Samina M Bharmal
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stretch
Represented By: Chelsea B. Davis
Represented By: Jesse Matthew Bless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights
Represented By: Naomi Ariel Igra
Represented By: Samina M Bharmal
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stretch
Represented By: Chelsea B. Davis
Represented By: Jesse Matthew Bless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: Bradley Craigmyle
Represented By: Charles E.T. Roberts
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Bradley Craigmyle
Represented By: Charles E.T. Roberts
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Bradley Craigmyle
Represented By: Charles E.T. Roberts
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Bradley Craigmyle
Represented By: Charles E.T. Roberts
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cato Institute
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Represented By: Mark Howard Rogge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Constitutional Accountability Center
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of California
Represented By: William Hawthorne Downer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amicus Curiae 21 Counties, Cities, and Municipalities
Represented By: Julia Blau Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NONPROFIT IMMIGRATION ADVOCATES AND LEGAL AND SOCIAL SERVICE PROVIDERS
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Lee
Represented By: Xiaonan April Hu
Represented By: Scott Shuchart
Represented By: Keren Hart Zwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Reclaim the Records
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alliance of Business Immigration Lawyers, Inc.
Represented By: Angelo A. Paparelli
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Malm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By: Lawrence John Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: District of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?