Cruz v. Robinson
Plaintiff: Leila Cruz
Defendant: Corey Patrick Robinson
Case Number: 4:2020cv06239
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION #2 ; SCREENING ORDER REVIEWING PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Mail sent to Leila Cruz returned as undeliverable re #1 Complaint, re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, re #3 Proposed Summons, re #4 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS, re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020) Modified on 10/1/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2020 01:30 PM. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Leila Cruz. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Corey Patrick Robinson. Filed by Leila Cruz. Consent/Declination due by 9/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Patrick Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?