Friends of Gualala River et al v. Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC
Plaintiff: Friends of Gualala River and Center For Biological Diversity
Defendant: Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv06453
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Corrected filed by Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 11/27/2020. Replies due by 12/4/2020. (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of John Bennett in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byGualala Redwood Timber, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in Support of Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit in Support of Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit in Support of Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit in Support of Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit in Support of Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC's Motion to Dismiss)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 17 Declaration of Christopher J. Carr in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byGualala Redwood Timber, LLC. (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Judicial Notice re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byGualala Redwood Timber, LLC. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 11/27/2020. Replies due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Gualala Redwood Timber LLC's Motion to Dismiss)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Carr (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Navtej Singh Dhillon (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE re denial of Motion to Relate Cases 17-cv-376-VC, California River Watch v. Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC, and 20-cv-6453-SBA, Friends of Gualala River et al v. Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Friends of Gualala River, Center For Biological Diversity. Service waived by Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC waiver sent on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by George Alexander Croton (Croton, George) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 02:30 PM in Oakland, Chambers. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 10/01/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center For Biological Diversity, Friends of Gualala River.. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2020 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14941144.). Filed byFriends of Gualala River, Center For Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 9/15/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Gualala River et al v. Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gualala Redwood Timber, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Represented By: Navtej Singh Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Gualala River
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: George Alexander Croton
Represented By: Timothy Sward Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: George Alexander Croton
Represented By: Timothy Sward Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?