Germano v. Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Germano
Defendant: Brett K. Haumann, Greg Behar, Mark D. McDade, Patrick G. Enright, Jayson D.A. Dallas, Stacey D. Seltzer, Kathryn E. Falberg, Mark T. Iwicki and Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv06733
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 9 Clerk's Notice,, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Proposed Order filed by Steven Germano. (Bower, David) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Class Complaint and CMC order served on Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc. on 10/21/2020, filed by Steven Germano. (Bower, David) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE-SETTING DATE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2020 is CONTINUED to MONDAY, 1/11/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/ (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc., Greg Behar, Jayson D.A. Dallas, Patrick G. Enright, Kathryn E. Falberg, Brett K. Haumann, Mark T. Iwicki, Mark D. McDade, Stacey D. Seltzer. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Bower, David) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Bret Haumann, #2 Summons Summons Greg Behar, #3 Summons Summons Jayson Dallas, #4 Summons Summons Kathryn Falberg, #5 Summons Summons Mark Iwicki, #6 Summons Summons Mark McDade, #7 Summons Summons Patrick Enright, #8 Summons Summons Stacey Seltzer)(Bower, David) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Only ONE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: #6 Proposed Summons, filed by Steven German o (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Docketed in Error. Please Disregard. See Docket Entry 4 Case assigned Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/26/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Steven Germano re #1 Complaint, (Bower, David) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14990444.). Filed bySteven Germano. (Attachments: #1 Declaration PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Bower, David) (Filed on 9/25/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Germano v. Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett K. Haumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick G. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayson D.A. Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey D. Seltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn E. Falberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Iwicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Germano
Represented By: David Eldridge Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?