Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: University of Utah, Stanford University, Cornell University, University of Rochester, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, California Institute of Technology, American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment, National Retail Federation, Bay Area Council, National Association of Manufacturers, ARUP Laboratories, Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America and University of Southern California
Defendant: Secretary of Labor Eugene Scalia, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Labor and Sec. Homeland Secty Chad F. Wolf
Amicus Curiae: American Immigration Council, 46 Leading U.S. Companies, U.S. Tech Workers and American Council on Education and 23 Other Higher Education Organizations
Interested Party: Syed Nazim Ali and Colleges and Universities
Case Number: 4:2020cv07331
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RULE 54(b) PARTIAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 1, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #31 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and DENYING #54 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey S. White: Motion Hearing re: #31 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment held on 11/23/2020. Total Time in Court: 60 minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/23/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying #64 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/17/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO SYED NAZIM ALIS MOTION TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF by ARUP Laboratories, American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment, Bay Area Council, California Institute of Technology, Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, Cornell University, National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Stanford University, University of Rochester, University of Southern California, University of Utah re #64 MOTION for Leave to File (Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 11/13/2020) Modified on 11/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY (re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byARUP Laboratories, American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment, Bay Area Council, California Institute of Technology, Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, Cornell University, National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Stanford University, University of Rochester, University of Southern California, University of Utah. (Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting AS MODIFIED #66 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by U.S. Tech Workers. Responses due by 11/27/2020. Replies due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Memo of Law, #2 Proposed Order proposed order)(Joseph, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/13/2020) Modified on 11/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Refund Status re #60 Application for Refund Declined. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Elizabeth Espn Stern. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2020 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jeffrey S. White. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who w ish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than 12:00 pm 11-19-20.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #54 M OTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2020 10:00 AM via ZOOM before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Elizabeth Espn Stern (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-15179624) filed by 46 Leading U.S. Companies. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stern, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/11/2020) Modified on 11/12/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-15138463 by Colleges and Universities. (Rappaport, Lary) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Errata for Brief of Amici Curiae Leading Business Organizations and Companies in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Stay Agency Action or for Partial Summary Judgment by 46 Leading U.S. Companies. (Del Rey, Maximillian) (Filed on 11/9/2020) Modified on 11/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice RE Andrew J. Pincus. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew J. Pincus (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15167775) filed by 46 Leading U.S. Companies. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pincus, Andrew) (Filed on 11/9/2020) Modified on 11/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiffs Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Syed Nazim Ali. (Attachments: #1 Oppostion to Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Oppositon to Support Defendant Legal Standing to Impliment H-1 New Rules, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REGARDING #55 Opposition/Response to Motion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 6, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byEugene Scalia, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Labor, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to #31 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Eugene Scalia, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Labor, Chad F. Wolf. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2020 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Filed on 11/6/2020) Modified on 11/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Joseph C. O'Keefe. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Joseph C. O'Keefe for Amici Curiae New York University, Boston University, Brandeis University, Brown University, the Catholic University of America, Columbia University, Connecticut State Colleges and Universities, Dartmouth College, Emory University, the George Washington University, Grinnell College, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, the Mount Sinai Health System and Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, Northeastern University, the Pennsylvania State University, Princeton University, Rutgers, the State University of New Jersey, Syracuse University, Tufts University, the University of Chicago, University of Connecticut, University of Pennsylvania, Wellesley College, and Yale University ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15157907.) filed by Colleges and Universities. (O'Keefe, Joseph) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING #50 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule and Consolidation and staying deadline to respond to Complaint. Opposition due by 11/6/2020. Reply due by 4:00 p.m. 11/13/2020. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 4, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule and Consolidation filed by Eugene Scalia, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Labor, Chad F. Wolf, Chamer of Commerce of the United State of America, National Association of Manufacturers, national Retail Federation, Bay Area Council, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, and California Institute of Technology. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 11/4/2020) Modified on 11/5/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Archis Ashok Parasharami (Parasharami, Archis) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Council on Education and 23 Other Higher Education Organizations (Levitan, Steven) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. Sherwood. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. Sherwood for Amici Curiae New York University, Boston University, Brandeis University, Brown University, the Catholic University of America, Columbia University, Connecticut State Colleges and Universities, Dartmouth College, Emory University, the George Washington University, Grinnell College, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, the Mount Sinai Health System and Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, Northeastern University, the Pennsylvania State University, Princeton University, Rutgers, the State University of New Jersey, Syracuse University, Tufts University, the University of Chicago, University of Connecticut, University of Pennsylvania, Wellesley College, and Yale University ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15146696.) filed by Colleges and Universities. (Sherwood, Andrew) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #40 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by American Immigration Council. Responses due by 4:00 pm 11/13/2020. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed by 46 Leading U.S. Companies. Responses due by 4:00 pm 11/13/2020. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Leslie Dellon (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting as modified #37 Administrative Motion to File Amicus Brief by Colleges and Universities. Responses due by 11/13/2020. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by American Council. Responses due by 4:00 pm 11/13/2020. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety ONLY Re: #36 -1 Corporate Disclosu re Statement filed by Colleges and Universities MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed by American Council on Education and 23 Other Higher Education Organizations. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by American Immigration Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit : Brief of Amicus Curiae, #2 Proposed Order)(Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed by 46 Leading U.S. Companies. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew J. Pincus, #2 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, #3 Proposed Order)(Del Rey, Maximillian) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Lary Alan Rappaport on behalf of Proposed Amici Curiae Colleges and Universities (Rappaport, Lary) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Brief re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amici Curiae New York University, Boston University, Brandeis University, Brown University, the Catholic University of America, Columbia University, Connecticut State Colleges and Universities, Dartmouth College, Emory University, the George Washington University, Grinnell College, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, the Mount Sinai Health System and Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, Northeastern University, the Pennsylvania State University, Princeton University, Rutgers, the State University of New Jersey, Syracuse University, Tufts University, the University of Chicago, University of Connecticut, University of Pennsylvania, Wellesley College, and Yale University filed by Colleges and Universities. Responses due by 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Rappaport, Lary) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed by American Council on Education and 23 Other Higher Education Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement, #2 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, #3 Proposed Order)(Levitan, Steven) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Leslie Karen Dellon (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15138056) filed by American Immigration Council. (Dellon, Leslie) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ***WRONG EVENT, SEE RE-FILED DOCUMENT AT DOCKET ENTRY #40 *** Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Zachary Miller Nightingale on behalf of American Immigration Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Levitan (Levitan, Steven) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ARUP Laboratories, American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment, Bay Area Council, California Institute of Technology, Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, Cornell University, National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Stanford University, University of Rochester, University of Southern California, University of Utah. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2020 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/6/2020. Replies due by 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Baselice, #2 Declaration of Zane Brown, #3 Declaration of Katherine Carreau, #4 Declaration of Jack Chen, #5 Declaration of Shari Costantini, #6 Declaration of Patrick Duffy, #7 Declaration of Joseph Elias, #8 Declaration of Miriam Feldblum, #9 Declaration of David Gluck, #10 Declaration of Stephanie Hall, #11 Declaration of Marko Princevac, #12 Declaration of Edmund O. Schweitzer, III, #13 Declaration of Ravi Shankar, #14 Declaration of Ilana Smith, #15 Declaration of Wendy Wolford, #16 Declaration of Paul W. Hughes, #17 Exhibit 1, #18 Exhibit 2, #19 Exhibit 3, #20 Exhibit 4, #21 Exhibit 5, #22 Exhibit 6, #23 Exhibit 7, #24 Exhibit 8, #25 Exhibit 9, #26 Exhibit 10, #27 Exhibit 11, #28 Exhibit 12, #29 Exhibit 13, #30 Exhibit 14, #31 Exhibit 15, #32 Exhibit 16, #33 Exhibit 17, #34 Exhibit 18, #35 Exhibit 19, #36 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Rachel Saslaw (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #26 Administrative Motion for additional pages and instructions to parties regarding hearing and chambers copies. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi (Federighi, Carol) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation and Notice a Hearing filed by ARUP Laboratories, American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment, Bay Area Council, California Institute of Technology, Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, Cornell University, National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Stanford University, University of Rochester, University of Southern California, University of Utah. Responses due by 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul W. Hughes, #2 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 11:00 AM in Telephone Conference Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698#The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by ARUP Laboratories, American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment, Bay Area Council, California Institute of Technology, Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, Cornell University, National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Stanford University, University of Rochester, University of Southern California, University of Utah (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARUP Laboratories (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by University of Utah (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by University of Rochester (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by University of Southern California (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanford University (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cornell University (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by California Institute of Technology (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Retail Federation (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bay Area Council (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Association of Manufacturers (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Paul W. Hughes ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15088959.) filed by ARUP Laboratories, American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment, Bay Area Council, California Institute of Technology, Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, Cornell University, National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Stanford University, University of Rochester, University of Southern California, University of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 10/20/2020) Modified on 10/21/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Eugene Scalia, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Labor, Chad F. Wolf. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ARUP Laboratories, American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment, Bay Area Council, California Institute of Technology, Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, Cornell University, National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Stanford University, University of Rochester, University of Southern California, University of Utah.. (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William G. Gaede, III (Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/2/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15083007.). Filed byUniversity of Rochester, California Institute of Technology, National Association of Manufacturers, Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, ARUP Laboratories, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, National Retail Federation, Stanford University, University of Utah, Cornell University, Bay Area Council, University of Southern California, American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DHS Rule, #2 Exhibit 2 - DOL Rule, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaede, William) (Filed on 10/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Utah
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford University
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornell University
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Rochester
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Institute of Technology
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Retail Federation
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Council
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association of Manufacturers
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARUP Laboratories
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Southern California
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Labor Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Carol Federighi
Represented By: Alexandra Rachel Saslaw
Represented By: Laurel H. Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Carol Federighi
Represented By: Alexandra Rachel Saslaw
Represented By: Laurel H. Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Carol Federighi
Represented By: Alexandra Rachel Saslaw
Represented By: Laurel H. Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec. Homeland Secty Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Carol Federighi
Represented By: Alexandra Rachel Saslaw
Represented By: Laurel H. Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Immigration Council
Represented By: Zachary Miller Nightingale
Represented By: Leslie Karen Dellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 46 Leading U.S. Companies
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Elizabeth Espin Stern
Represented By: Maximillian Ling Del Rey
Represented By: Archis Ashok Parasharami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. Tech Workers
Represented By: Lawrence John Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Council on Education and 23 Other Higher Education Organizations
Represented By: Steven Mark Levitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Syed Nazim Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Colleges and Universities
Represented By: Andrew M. Sherwood
Represented By: Joseph C. O'Keefe
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?