National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc. et al v. Carson et al
Plaintiff: National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc., BLDS, LTD doing business as BLDS, LLC and Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California
Defendant: Ben Carson and U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 4:2020cv07388
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #44 Stipulated Request For Order Changing Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/18/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2021 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698#The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME filed by Ben Carson, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Filed on 12/18/2020) Modified on 12/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Vinita Andrapalliyal (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Attorney Must Update ECF Profile with Current Contact Information. [err102] Re: #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Morgan Williams. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) ( Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Morgan Williams. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Morgan Williams ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15204951.) filed by National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 11/17/2020) Modified on 11/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2020 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc. (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc., BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California. Ben Carson served on 11/2/2020, answer due 1/4/2021; U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development served on 11/2/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/2/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 11:00 AM in Telephone Conference Only.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698#The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/30/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 35 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc... (Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Ben Carson, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 33 Proposed Summons. (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 32 Proposed Summons. (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Ben Carson, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 30 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Samberg-Champion for Zachary Best (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Samberg-Champion for John Relman (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Samberg-Champion for Stephen Hayes (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Samberg-Champion for Ajmel Quereshi (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Samberg-Champion for Allison Zieve (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Samberg-Champion for Reed Colfax (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Samberg-Champion for Sara Pratt (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Samberg-Champion for Sasha Samberg-Champion (Samberg-Champion, Sasha) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 Proposed Summons. (Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Summons. (Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, signed 10/23/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Best. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, signed 10/23/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Relman. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, signed 10/23/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Hayes. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, signed 10/23/2020, by Chief Judge Magistrate Joseph C. Spero granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Quereshi. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order, signed 10/23/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Zieve.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order, signed 10/23/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Colfax.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Schlactus for Coty Montag (Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order, signed 10/23/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Pratt.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, signed 10/23/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Champion. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Zachary Best ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15100134.) filed by BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for John Relman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15100089.) filed by BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Stephen Hayes ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15099279.) filed by BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ajmel Quereshi ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15099163.) filed by BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Allison Zieve ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15099122.) filed by BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Reed Colfax ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15098917.) filed by BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Sara Pratt ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15098909.) filed by BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Sasha Samberg-Champion ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15098847.) filed by BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15097518.). Filed byNational Fair Housing Alliance, Inc., BLDS, LTD, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A is a true and correct copy of the declaration of Jeffrey B. Jaffee, executed on October 19, 2020, #2 Exhibit B is a true and correct copy of the declaration of Lisa Rice, executed on October 21, 2020, #3 Exhibit C is a true and correct copy of the declaration of Caroline Peattie, executed on October 21, 2020, #4 Exhibit D is a true and correct copy of the declaration of Bernard Siskin, executed on October 16, 2020, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 10/22/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc. et al v. Carson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Carson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Morgan Whitney Williams
Represented By: Sasha Samberg-Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLDS, LTD doing business as BLDS, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Sasha Samberg-Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Sasha Samberg-Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?