Brown v. Viking Services Corporation
Plaintiff: Bruce E Brown
Defendant: Viking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management and Viking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv07776
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect case number. Please ensure that all documents filed have the case number 4:20-cv-07776-KAW. No further action is necessary . Re: #11 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Bruce E Brown (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Names of interested entities or person MUST be entered at the prompt. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entire ty Re: #11 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Bruce E Brown (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 27, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bruce E Brown (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Young, Eric) (Filed on 12/27/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Viking Services Corporation. (Laurenson, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
November 19, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect case number. Please ensure that all documents filed have the case number 4:20-cv-07776-KAW. No further action is nece ssary. Re: #8 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Bruce E Brown (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Viking Services Corporation.. (Grover, Margaret) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bruce E Brown. (Young, Eric) (Filed on 11/18/2020) Modified on 11/19/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2021 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Viking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management Notice of Assignment to Judge Westmore and Service of Standing Orders and Civil Cover Sheet (Grover, Margaret J.) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/19/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Viking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management . (Grover, Margaret J.) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Viking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Viking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management identifying Corporate Parent Viking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management, Corporate Parent Baylin Family Trust for Viking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management. (Grover, Margaret J.) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior. Their case number is SCV 266999. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15151304). Filed byViking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management. (Grover, Margaret J.) (Filed on 11/3/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Viking Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E Brown
Represented By: Eric Gene Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management
Represented By: Margaret J. J. Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Services Corporation doing business as West Coast Property Management LLC
Represented By: Margaret J. Grover
Represented By: Michael Alan Laurenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?