Nix et al v. Alfa Laval, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mae Nix and Donald Patrick Nix
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Alfa Laval, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, William Powell Company, Crane Co., Sterling Fluid System (USA) LLC, General Electric Company, Velan Valve Corp., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, CLA-VAL Co., Elliott Company f/k/a and d/b/a Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Armstrong International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., John Crane, Inc., Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc., J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., Flowserve US, Inc., Viad Corp, ITT Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, ViacomCBS Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company d/b/a Fulton Sylphon Valves, IMO Industries, Inc. and Goulds Pumps LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv07823
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 105 Certificate of Interested Entities by Occidental Chemical Corporation (Lewis, Stephen) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Occidental Chemical Corporation (Lewis, Stephen) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hopeman Brothers Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(A)(1) (Cross, Reno) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 102 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Cross, Reno) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Reno Cross (Cross, Reno) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 16, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials JSW immediately after the case number.Re: #100 Answer to Complaint filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 100 Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation's Notice of Re-Filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint byOccidental Chemical Corporation. (Lewis, Stephen) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 99 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc... (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #97 Consent/Declination t o Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 98 Certificate of Interested Entities by Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric SE, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries SAS for Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc.. (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 97 ***INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED, DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED*** CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc. (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/14/2020) Modified on 12/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2020 Filing 96 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc.. (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance for Schneider Electric USA, Inc. by David Scott Shaffer. (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/14/2020) Modified on 12/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2020 Filing 94 ANSWER to Complaint bySchneider Electric Systems USA, Inc.. (Shaffer, David) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilliam Fipp Stewart (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 92 Certificate of Interested Entities by Armstrong International, Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 91 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Armstrong International, Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 12/10/2020) Modified on 12/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2020 Filing 90 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Velan Valve Corp... (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by Velan Valve Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 88 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Velan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton for Velan Valve Corp. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 86 ANSWER to Complaint byVelan Valve Corp.. (Barton, Arlene) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 85 Disclosure and Certificate of Interested Entities by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Warren Pumps, LLC, Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries for Warren Pumps, LLC. (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 12/9/2020) Modified on 12/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 12/9/2020) Modified on 12/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2020 Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by CLA-VAL Co. identifying Corporate Parent CLA-VAL Co., Other Affiliate Griswold Industries for CLA-VAL Co.. re #82 Answer to Complaint (Lister, John) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCLA-VAL Co.. (Lister, John) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Cormier, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/3/2020) Modified on 12/3/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2020 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Cormier, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Anne Cormier and Kristi L. K. Young (Cormier, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #77 Stipulation Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claims against Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. without prejudice. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 1, 2020 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claims against Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. without prejudice filed by Donald Patrick Nix, Mae Nix, Alfa Laval, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reid, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2020) Modified on 12/2/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2020 Filing 76 Certificate of Interested Entities by Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Coffin Turbo Pump HoldCo., Inc. for Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc.. pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 7.1, and Local Civil Rule 3-15 (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted i.e. Coffin Turbo Pump HoldCo, Inc.. Please Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents re #75 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 75 Certificate of Interested Entities by Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc. pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 7.1 and Local Civil Rule 3-15 (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 74 Answer to Removal Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos; and Jury Demand byCoffin Turbo Pump, Inc.. (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Terra Millennium Corporation, Other Affiliate Resolute Management Inc., Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Co./AllianzEnstar, Other Affiliate RiverStone for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Wood, Christopher) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 72 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sterling Fluid System (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent SFS (USA) Holding Inc, Corporate Parent Grundfos Americas Corporation for Sterling Fluid System (USA) LLC. (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents (i.e. Grundfos Americas Corporation). Re: #71 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Sterling Fluid System (USA) LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 71 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sterling Fluid System (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent SFS (USA) Holding Inc for Sterling Fluid System (USA) LLC. (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #64 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Sterling Fluid System (USA) LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leigh Burch for Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leigh Burch for Defendant Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc. (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leigh Burch for Defendant FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Peerless Pump and Northern Pump businesses (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond for Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond for Defendant Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc. (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond for Defendant FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Peerless Pump and Northern Pump businesses (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. In accordance with FRCP 5(d), discovery material is not filed with the Court. [err101] Re: #62 Initial Disclosures filed by J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. ( cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #59 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sterling Fluid System (USA) LLC (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) bySterling Fluid System (USA) LLC. (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 62 Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) by J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. (Wood, Christopher) (Filed on 11/24/2020) Modified on 11/25/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2020 Filing 61 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc... (Wood, Christopher) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 60 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Wood, Christopher) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 59 Certificate of Interested Entities by J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Terra Millennium Corporation for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Wood, Christopher) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Wetherill Wood for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. (Wood, Christopher) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint byJ.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Wood, Christopher) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by FMC Corporation (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial by FMC Corporation. (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/24/2020) Modified on 11/24/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re: [ 53] Certificate of Interested Entities, #52 Answer to Complaint, #54 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Crane Co. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crane Co. identifying Other Affiliate Hartford, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transamerica Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Continental, Other Affiliate Crane Co., Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Other Affiliate INA, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate Aetna, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate The Employers Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau for Crane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 53 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Crane Co. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 52 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCrane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 51 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donald Patrick Nix, Mae Nix.. (Reid, Michael) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Reid on behalf of Plaintiffs (Reid, Michael) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Carter Pieper for Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Pieper, Timothy) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Carter Pieper FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Peerless Pump and Northern Pump businesses (Pieper, Timothy) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Carter Pieper for Defendant Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc. (Pieper, Timothy) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Seana Azad for Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Seana Azad for Defendant FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Peerless Pump and Northern Pump businesses (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Seana Azad for Defendant Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc. (Azad, Seana) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Damages by SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 11/16/2020) Modified on 11/16/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2020 Filing 39 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ITT Inc... (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by ITT Inc. identifying Other Affiliate ITT LLC for ITT Inc.. re #35 Answer to Complaint (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by ITT Inc. identifying Other Affiliate ITT LLC for ITT Inc. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/12/2020) Modified on 11/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance of Joseph Duffy and Amy J. Talarico by Marisa Renee Chaves. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/12/2020) Modified on 11/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos; Demand for Jury Trial byITT Inc.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 34 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Goulds Pumps LLC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC. re #30 Answer to Complaint (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/12/2020) Modified on 11/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance of Joseph Duffy and Amy J. Talarico by Marisa Renee Chaves. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/12/2020) Modified on 11/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos; Demand for Jury Trial byGoulds Pumps LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 29 Renotice motion hearing re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL INC. S RE-NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed byAlfa Laval, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL INC. S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Branham, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines because COUNSEL SELECTED INCORRECT TIME FOR HEARING AT FILING as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 11, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alfa Laval, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2021 09:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/25/2020. Replies due by 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Branham, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/11/2020) Modified on 11/12/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2020 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alfa Laval, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval Inc., Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval, Inc. (Branham, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/10/2020) Modified on 11/12/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL INC. by Elizabeth Branham. (Branham, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/10/2020) Modified on 11/12/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Viad Corp re #23 Order Setting Case Management Conference (Langbord, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byViad Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Langbord, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/9/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698#The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/9/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 21 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation of re #15 Notice of Appearance, re #18 Certificate of Interested Entities, re #16 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, re #19 Answer to Complaint, re #17 Joinder (Park, Charles) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1; NDCA L.R. 3-15) filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 17 Joinder to re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park (Park, Charles) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Viad Corp.. (Langbord, Peter) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Viad Corp (Langbord, Peter) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Viad Corp (Langbord, Peter) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bennett Langbord for Defendant Viad Corp (Langbord, Peter) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 Joinder to re #1 Notice of Removal to Federal Court by Defendant Viad Corp; Demand for Jury Trial; Declaration of Kevin D. Jamison filed by ViacomCBS Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by ViacomCBS Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ViacomCBS Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusement, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by ViacomCBS Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 Joinder to re #1 Notice of Removal - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL INC. S JOINDER TO DEFENDANT VIAD CORPS NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTIONS 1442(A)(1) AND 1446(A) filed by Alfa Laval, Inc.. (Branham, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Joinder to re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 5, 2020 Answer to Removal Complaint (Refer to Docket #(1-4), Exhibit D, Page 1 of 14) by Viad Corp. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/19/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court for the County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20074629, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-15158121). Filed by Viad Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langbord, Peter) (Filed on 11/5/2020) Modified on 11/6/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nix et al v. Alfa Laval, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Ana Teresa Reeg
Represented By: Elizabeth Branham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Crawford Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid System (USA) LLC
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Seana Azad
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Timothy Carter Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Kristi L.K. Young
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL Co.
Represented By: John Russell Lister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company f/k/a and d/b/a Elliott Turbomachinery Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Dianne Calareso
Represented By: W. Joseph Gunter
Represented By: Gilliam Fipp Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Eric Meislin
Represented By: Robert Stanley Kraft
Represented By: Reno Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric Systems USA, Inc.
Represented By: David Scott Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Wetherill Wood
Represented By: Arlene Carol-Mendoza Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp
Represented By: Peter Bennett Langbord
Represented By: Elizabeth J Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Inc.
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Paul David Smith,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Seana Azad
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Timothy Carter Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Seana Azad
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Timothy Carter Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Company d/b/a Fulton Sylphon Valves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Nix
Represented By: Stuart James Purdy
Represented By: Michael Thomas Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Patrick Nix
Represented By: Stuart James Purdy
Represented By: Michael Thomas Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?