Vangala et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Akhilesh R. Vangala, Kenney M. Castaneda Penate and I.S.A.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 4:2020cv08143
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #30 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 14, 2021 Case Stayed until February 15, 2021, See Docket No. #31 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Akhilesh R. Vangala, I.S.A., and Kenney M. Castaneda Penate. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/13/2021) Modified on 1/14/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan for Defendants (Kurlan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 29, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the #4 motion for class certification, previously set for February 4, 2021, is continued to March 4, 2021 before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aaron Korthuis. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margot Adams. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matt Adams. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kenney, Mary. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany Lieu. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, I.S.A., Akhilesh R. Vangala re #14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15226722.), #8 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Notice of Appearance, #13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany Lieu ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15223168.), #10 Order,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, #1 Complaint, 5 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Proceed under a Pseudonym , #11 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, 15 Order, #4 MOTION to Certify Class , #12 Summons Issued (Beasley, Helen) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #20 Stipulation.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Reset/Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #4 MOTION to Certify Class, See Docket No. #21 : Responses due by 1/14/2021; Replies due by 1/21/2021; Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Akhilesh R. Vangala, I.S.A., and Kenny M. Castaneda Penate. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 12/2/2020) Modified on 12/3/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2020 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #3 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Proceed under a Pseudonym ) NONOPPOSITION filed byU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Case division and case location information are incorrect. In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as Oakland Division and the case number should be 4:20-cv-08143 HSG. [err102] Re: #16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matt Adams ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15236881.) filed by I.S.A., Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, Akhilesh R. Vangala, #18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aaron Korthuis ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15236934.) filed by I.S.A., Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, Akhilesh R. Vangala, #17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margot Adams ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15236911.) filed by I.S.A., Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, Akhilesh R. Vangala (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aaron Korthuis ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15236934.) filed by Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, I.S.A., Akhilesh R. Vangala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Adams, Matthew) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margot Adams ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15236911.) filed by Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, I.S.A., Akhilesh R. Vangala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Adams, Matthew) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matt Adams ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15236881.) filed by Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, I.S.A., Akhilesh R. Vangala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Adams, Matthew) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. Re: #14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15226722.) filed by I.S.A., Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, Akhilesh R. Vangala (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DIRECTING Defendants to file by Monday, November 30, 2020 an Opposition or a Notice of Non-Opposition in response to Dkt. No. #3 Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15226722.) filed by Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, I.S.A., Akhilesh R. Vangala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kenney, Mary) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany Lieu ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15223168.) filed by Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, I.S.A., Akhilesh R. Vangala. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - WA State, #2 Certificate of Admission - S.D. Texas)(Lieu, Tiffany) (Filed on 11/20/2020) Modified on 11/23/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Office of the United States Attorney & United States Attorney General. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER (IMMIGRATION MANDAMUS CASE). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/20/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, I.S.A., Akhilesh R. Vangala.. (Beasley, Helen) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Miller Nightingale for Plaintiffs (Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Elizabeth Beasley for Plaintiffs (Beasley, Helen) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, I.S.A., Akhilesh R. Vangala. Responses due by 12/3/2020. Replies due by 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Realmuto (Authenticating), #2 Declaration Dandelet, #3 Declaration Pavri, #4 Declaration Dalal-Dheini, #5 Declaration Engen, #6 Declaration Ziegeweid, #7 Declaration Joyner, #8 Declaration Limb, #9 Declaration Odom, #10 Declaration Levin, #11 Declaration Koop, #12 Declaration Adams, #13 Declaration Kenney, #14 Declaration Realmuto, #15 Declaration Nightingale, #16 [Proposed] Order)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Proceed under a Pseudonym filed by I.S.A.. Responses due by 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-15213281). Filed by Akhilesh R. Vangala, Kenney M. Castaneda Penate, I.S.A.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 11/19/2020) Modified on 11/20/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vangala et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akhilesh R. Vangala
Represented By: Trina Ann Realmuto
Represented By: Zachary Miller Nightingale
Represented By: Helen Elizabeth Beasley
Represented By: Tiffany Lieu
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Margot M Adams,
Represented By: Matthew Hyrum Adams
Represented By: Mary A Kenney
Represented By: Aaron L Korthuis,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenney M. Castaneda Penate
Represented By: Trina Ann Realmuto
Represented By: Zachary Miller Nightingale
Represented By: Helen Elizabeth Beasley
Represented By: Tiffany Lieu
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Margot M Adams,
Represented By: Matthew Hyrum Adams
Represented By: Mary A Kenney
Represented By: Aaron L Korthuis,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.S.A.
Represented By: Trina Ann Realmuto
Represented By: Zachary Miller Nightingale
Represented By: Helen Elizabeth Beasley
Represented By: Tiffany Lieu
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Margot M Adams,
Represented By: Matthew Hyrum Adams
Represented By: Mary A Kenney
Represented By: Aaron L Korthuis,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?