Meador v. Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Gordon D. Meador
Defendant: Ralph Diaz, Warden of Salinas Valley State Prison and CDCR Departmental Review Board
Case Number: 4:2020cv08326
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 Status Update Letter from Gordon D. Meador. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Gordon D. Meador. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Letter Requesting Copies from Gordon Meador. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020) Modified on 11/25/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gordon D. Meador. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gordon D. Meador, CDCR # C57959.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CDCR Departmental Review Board, Ralph Diaz, Warden of Salinas Valley State Prison. Filed by Gordon D. Meador. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meador v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Salinas Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR Departmental Review Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon D. Meador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?