Snyder v. Does 1 through 50, Inclusive et al
Plaintiff: Larry Snyder
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company, Monsanto Company, PBI-Gordon Corporation and Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Case Number: 4:2020cv08419
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants. Filed by Larry Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Zeccola, Frank) (Filed on 1/19/2021) Modified on 1/20/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2021 Filing 18 Refund Status re #16 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #5 Stipulation, Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Specially Appearing Defendants Monsanto Company, PBI-Gordon Corporation, and The Dow Chemical Company to Respond to Plaintiff's Operative Complaint filed by Monsanto Company, Larry Synder, PBI Gordon Corporation and The Dow Chemical Company . (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 1/6/2021) Modified on 1/7/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2020 Filing 16 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal, Receipt Number 0971-15252323 (Duplicate Charge) by Monsanto Company. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 12/22/2020) Modified on 12/23/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PBI-Gordon Corporation.. (Nugent, Matthew) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 Refund Status re #13 Application for Refund Declined. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-15252468 by Monsanto Company. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Dow Chemical Company.. (Ferguson, Pamela) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Monsanto Company. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 12/14/2020) Modified on 12/15/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Larry Snyder.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Zeccola, Frank) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by PBI-Gordon Corporation identifying Corporate Parent PBI-Gordon Corporation for PBI-Gordon Corporation. (Nugent, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by PBI-Gordon Corporation identifying Corporate Parent PBI-Gordon Companies, Inc. for PBI-Gordon Corporation. (Nugent, Matthew) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Dow Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent Dow, Inc. for The Dow Chemical Company. (Ferguson, Pamela) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS MONSANTO COMPANY, PBI-GORDON CORPORATION, THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY and Larry Snyder. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Monsanto Company, PBI-Gordon Corporation, The Dow Chemical Company. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 12/7/2020) Modified on 12/7/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG20064807. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15252468). Filed byPBI-Gordon Corporation, Monsanto Company, The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit A-9, #11 Exhibit A-10, #12 Exhibit A-11, #13 Exhibit A-12, #14Civil Cover Shhet Exhibit B)(Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 11/30/2020) Modified on 11/30/2020 (asS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/7/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Does 1 through 50, Inclusive et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Pamela Madeliene Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Bruce John Zabarauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBI-Gordon Corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Tobin
Represented By: Matthew Paul Nugent
Represented By: Paul Gerhardt Zacher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Snyder
Represented By: Alvin Mark Gomez
Represented By: Frank Joseph Zeccola
Represented By: Boris Smyslov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?