Meeks v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak
Plaintiff: Dana Meeks
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak and National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 4:2020cv09120
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dana Meeks.. (Esparza, Noemi) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/12/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Railroad Passenger Corporation identifying Other Affiliate American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Other Affiliate Burlington Northern and Santa Fe LLC, Other Affiliate U.S. Secretary of Transportation, Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway, Other Affiliate Canadian Pacific Railway, Other Affiliate American Financial Group Inc., Other Affiliate PASSENGER RAILROAD INSURANCE LIMITED (PRIL), Other Affiliate WASHINGTON TERMINAL COMPANY (WTC) for National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Offill-Klein, Alexei) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.. (Offill-Klein, Alexei) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 17, 2020 #1 Answer to Removal Complaint by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20076335. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15333644). Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Castillo, Vincent) (Filed on 12/17/2020) Modified on 12/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeks v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation dba Amtrak
Represented By: Vincent Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Vincent Castillo
Represented By: Alexei Nathan Offill-Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Meeks
Represented By: Noemi Esparza
Represented By: Noemi Nunez Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?