The Cookie Department, Inc. v. The Hershey Company et al
Plaintiff: The Cookie Department, Inc.
Defendant: The Hershey Company and One Brands, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv09324
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by One Brands, LLC, The Hershey Company.. (Chin, May-tak) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Keyonn Pope.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer DePriest.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/11/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to The Complaint for Damages re #1 Complaint filed by One Brands, LLC, The Hershey Company, and The Cookie Department, Inc.. (Chin, May-tak) (Filed on 1/28/2021) Modified on 1/29/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by May-tak Chin (Chin, May-tak) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Keyonn Pope ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15500999.) filed by One Brands, LLC, The Hershey Company. (Pope, Keyonn) (Filed on 1/27/2021) Modified on 1/28/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer DePrist ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15500562.) filed by One Brands, LLC, The Hershey Company. (DePriest, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/27/2021) Modified on 1/28/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Cookie Department, Inc... (Indrajana, Michael) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/20/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding TOUGH COOKIE Trademark Reg. No. 6,077,548 Notice AO 120 Filed (cc: form mailed to register). (Indrajana, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The correct event is Patent/Trademark Report. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Othe r Filings > Other Documents> Patent/Trademark Report. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #6 Notice (Other) filed by The Cookie Department, Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD, REFILED AT DOC #7 *** NOTICE by The Cookie Department, Inc. of Filing Form AO 120 (Indrajana, Michael) (Filed on 12/29/2020) Modified on 12/30/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to One Brands, LLC, The Hershey Company. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: This is a trademark case. Counsel is advised to file an AO 120 form. [err102] Re: #1 Complaint filed by The Cookie Department, Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Indrajana, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15362080.). Filed byThe Cookie Department, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Indrajana, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2020) Modified on 12/28/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cookie Department, Inc. v. The Hershey Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hershey Company
Represented By: Jennifer DePriest
Represented By: Keyonn Lavar Pope
Represented By: May-tak Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Brands, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer DePriest
Represented By: Keyonn Lavar Pope
Represented By: May-tak Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cookie Department, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Budi Indrajana
Represented By: Sanjiv Nand Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?