Marshall v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Plaintiff: Denise Marshall
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Case Number: 4:2020cv09360
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 31 FOURTH CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Plaintiff's Counsel also notified via email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/4/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 30 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Railroad Passenger Corp... (Flesher, Jacob) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy James Schroeder (Schroeder, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Wendall Schaff (Schaff, Jason) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Daniel Flesher (Flesher, Jacob) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 26 THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Plaintiff's and Defendant's Counsel were also notified via email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/11/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 25 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
December 29, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/12/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 23 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from District of Columbia, 1:19cv03432-KBJ. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020) Modified on 12/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2020 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-03432. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 12/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/15/2020. (lcnj)
December 15, 2020 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Status Conference held on 12/15/2020. Order forthcoming transferring case. (Court Reporter Nancy Meyer) (zgdf)
December 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 12/25/2020. (zgdf)
November 22, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #19 Response to Document; emailed to fmcgrath@bonnerkiernan.com, cc'd 13 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. DO NOT REFILE - Signature must match login/password on pleading(s) for any future filing(s) (zjf, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #18 Status Report filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3.)(McGrath, Felicity)
November 12, 2020 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT by DENISE MARSHALL. (Wietzke, Marc)
November 8, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #17 Status Report was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading in proper format. (Counsel should review LCvR5.1 (a) CORRESPONDENCE WITH THE COURT) (zjf)
November 6, 2020 Filing 17 ENTERED IN ERROR.....STATUS REPORT by DENISE MARSHALL. (Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 11/8/2020 (zjf).
September 22, 2020 Minute Entry for Telephone Status Conference proceedings held on 9/22/2020 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Scheduling Order forthcoming via Chambers. (Court Reporter Nancy Meyer) (zgdf)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER. On September 22, 2020, the parties appeared before the Court for a telephonic status conference. In light of the parties' representations during that conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial limited discovery period (see Scheduling Order, ECF No. 14) is extended through December 14, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a Telephonic Status Conference is set for December 15, 2020, at 10:30 AM before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. By that time, the limited discovery shall be completed and the parties shall be prepared to discuss the likelihood of settlement and whether this case should be litigated elsewhere. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/22/2020. (lcnj)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Status Conference currently set for 9/29/2020 is VACATED and RESET as a Telephonic Status Conference on 9/22/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/15/2020. (lcnj)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion to Continue Status Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the Status Conference currently set for 9/8/2020 is VACATED and RESET as a Telephonic Status Conference on 9/29/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/2/2020. (jag)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Continue conference by DENISE MARSHALL (Wietzke, Marc)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Status Conference currently set for 9/10/2020 is VACATED and RESET for 9/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/7/2020. (jag)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On June 5, 2020, the parties appeared before the Court for a telephonic status conference. In light of the parties' representations during that conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial limited discovery period (see Scheduling Order, ECF No. 14) is extended through September 4, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set for September 10, 2020, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/05/2020. (lckbj3, )
June 5, 2020 Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/5/2020. Discovery extended to 9/4/2020. Status Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (Court Reporter Nancy Meyer) (zgdf)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and the limitations on access to the courthouse, it is hereby ORDERED that status conference currently set for 6/5/2020 at 11:00 AM will be conducted by telephone conference. Dial-in information will be provided to counsel by e-mail; information on public access to this hearing can be found on the Court's website. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/26/2020. (jag) Modified on 5/26/2020, to correct an error. (zgdf).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. As set forth in the accompanying order, the following deadline is set: Initial limited discovery due by 5/26/2020. A status conference is set for 6/5/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 02/27/2020. (lckbj3, )
February 26, 2020 Minute Entry for Scheduling Conference proceedings held on 2/26/2020 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Status Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook) (zgdf)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP..(Ezeigbo, Ifeanyi)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Ezeigbo, Ifeanyi)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/27/2020 is VACATED and RESET for 2/26/2020 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/11/2020. (jag)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ifeanyi Olusegun Ezeigbo on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. (Ezeigbo, Ifeanyi)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. (McGrath, Felicity)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for 2/27/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/16/2020. (jag)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP..(znmw)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Leave to File Answer Nunc Pro Tunc. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/6/2020. (jag)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer Nunc Pro Tunc by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A.)(McGrath, Felicity)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019 (Wietzke, Marc)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/3/2019. (jag) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/20/2019) (zgdf).
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by DENISE MARSHALL #1 Complaint filed by DENISE MARSHALL. (Wietzke, Marc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA by DENISE MARSHALL #1 Complaint filed by DENISE MARSHALL. (Wietzke, Marc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6562699) filed by DENISE MARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Marshall
Represented By: Marc T. Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Represented By: Ifeanyi Olusegun Ezeigbo
Represented By: Felicity Ann McGrath
Represented By: Jeremy James Schroeder
Represented By: Jason Wendall Schaff
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Flesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?