Paul Clisham Painting & Decorating, Inc. v. Sherwin-Williams Company, The
Plaintiff: Paul Clisham Painting & Decorating, Inc.
Defendant: Sherwin-Williams Company, The
Case Number: 4:2020cv09406
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 18 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages against Sherwin-Williams Company, The. Filed by Paul Clisham Painting & Decorating, Inc. (Huet-Cox, Carlos) (Filed on 2/19/2021) Modified on 2/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paul Clisham Painting & Decorating, Inc... (Huet-Cox, Carlos) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 16 THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Plaintiff's Counsel were also notified via email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/2/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #14 Stipulation: Plaintiff shall not be required to file the proposed First Amended Complaint, but instead shall file the Second Amended Complaint within 10 days of the signing of this Order. Defendant shall have 21 days from the service date of the Second Amended Complaint to file a responsive pleading. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Paul Clisham Painting & Decorating, Inc. and The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Huet-Cox, Carlos) (Filed on 2/11/2021) Modified on 2/12/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Solomon Pantuch for DEFENDANT THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY (Pantuch, Solomon) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/12/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation Re: Filing First Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Plaintiff is granted leave to file a First Amended Complaint within 14 days. Defendant shall have 21 days from service of the First Amended Complaint to file a responsive pleading. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/29/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel and Proposed Order by Carlos Mitchell Huet-Cox (Huet-Cox, Carlos) (Filed on 1/28/2021) Modified on 1/29/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sherwin-Williams Company, The.. (Branham, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/28/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Sherwin-Williams Company, The, Paul Clisham Painting & Decorating, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Branham, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/5/2021) Modified on 1/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sherwin-Williams Company, The (Branham, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Branham for DEFENDANT THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY (Branham, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTIONS 1332(A) AND 1446 from Marin. Their case number is CIV2002781. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15377855). Filed bySherwin-Williams Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Branham, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Clisham Painting & Decorating, Inc. v. Sherwin-Williams Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Clisham Painting & Decorating, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Robert Shaughnessy
Represented By: Carlos Mitchell Huet-Cox
Represented By: Sloan C. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwin-Williams Company, The
Represented By: Elizabeth Branham
Represented By: Barry Raymond Schirm
Represented By: Bill D. Fountain
Represented By: Solomon Pantuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?