THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK et al v. YouTube LLC et al
Plaintiff: DEL BIGTREE and THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK
Defendant: Facebook Inc. and YouTube LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv09456
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 29 STIPULATION Enlarging Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by YouTube LLC, The Informed Consent Action Network and Del Bigtree. (White, Lauren) (Filed on 1/28/2021) Modified on 1/29/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2021 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YouTube LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Google LLC for YouTube LLC. (White, Lauren) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Gallo White for Defendant YouTube, LLC (White, Lauren) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 21, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:20-cv-09456 JST. Re: #26 Affidavit of Service,, Summons Returned Executed, filed by DEL BIGTREE, THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Other Case Initiating Documents served on Susie Veng on 01/15/2021, filed by THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK, DEL BIGTREE., SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK, DEL BIGTREE. YouTube LLC served on 1/15/2021, answer due 2/5/2021. (Siri, Aaron) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint (Correction of Dkt. No. 21) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal N. Mehta (Correction of Dkt. No. 20) (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 14, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Sonal N. Mehta. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 20 Notice of Appearance fi led by Facebook Inc.). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Facebook Inc., The Informed Consent Action Network and Del Bigtree. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/14/2021) Modified on 1/15/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal N. Mehta (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 19 Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar.. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Magistrate Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 18 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by DEL BIGTREE, THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK.. (Siri, Aaron) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth A. Brehm. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/6/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron Siri. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/6/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Elizabeth Brehm ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15404524.) filed by DEL BIGTREE, THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Brehm, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Aaron Siri ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15404511.) filed by DEL BIGTREE, THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Siri, Aaron) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sam M Muriella for Aaron Siri and Elizabeth Brehm of Siri & Glimstad LLP (Muriella, Sam) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to YouTube LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Muriella, Sam) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Muriella, Sam) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 3, 2021 Filing 6 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit B to Complaint filed by DEL BIGTREE, THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Muriella, Sam) (Filed on 1/3/2021) Modified on 1/4/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to YouTube LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/14/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Muriella, Sam) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc., YouTube LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15383888.). Filed byTHE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK, DEL BIGTREE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muriella, Sam) (Filed on 12/30/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK et al v. YouTube LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEL BIGTREE
Represented By: Sam M Muriella
Represented By: Elizabeth A Brehm
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Sam M Muriella
Represented By: Elizabeth A Brehm
Represented By: Aaron Siri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?