Harris v. Premiere Credit of North America LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Hugh Harris
Defendant: Premiere Credit of North America LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00391
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 26 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Song, Kevin) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 12, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Case division and case location information are incorrect. In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as Oakland Division and the case number should be 4:21-cv-00391 HSG. [err102] Re: #24 Answer to Complaint filed by Premiere Credit of North America LLC, #25 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Premiere Credit of North America LLC (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Premiere Credit of North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Performant Financial Corporation for Premiere Credit of North America LLC. (Goodman, Brett) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint byPremiere Credit of North America LLC. (Goodman, Brett) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 2, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Incorrect Event Used. For future filings like this, the correct event is Certificate/Proof of Service. Correct event is found un der Civil Events > Initial Pleadings and Service > Service of Process. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #23 Notice (Other) filed by David Hugh Harris (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Service filed by David Hugh Harris (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 3/1/2021) Modified on 3/2/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2021 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for April 20, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by April 13th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-00391-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 2/23/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Premiere Credit of North America LLC.. (Goodman, Brett) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING re #16 Stipulation to Extend Time filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/12/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Experian Information Solutions shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Song, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Song, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Siguo Song for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Song, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING re #11 Stipulation to Extend Time filed by Premiere Credit of North America LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/9/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Premiere Credit of North America shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT PREMIERE CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Premiere Credit of North America LLC. (Goodman, Brett) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Hugh Harris. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Hugh Harris. Premiere Credit of North America LLC served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is Certificate of Interested Entities. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is nec essary. Re: #7 Notice (Other) filed by David Hugh Harris. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 18, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Hugh Harris.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/18/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by David Hugh Harris. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded that parties' names should not be entered in capitalized letters. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by David Hugh Harris. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Premiere Credit of North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Premiere Credit of North America LLC)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/29/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., PREMIERE CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15449829). Filed by David Hugh Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/15/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Premiere Credit of North America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premiere Credit of North America LLC
Represented By: Brett B Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Siguo Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hugh Harris
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?