Amin et al v. Subway Restaurants, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karen Dhanowa and Nilima Amin
Defendant: Subway Restaurants, Inc., Franchise world headquarters LLC and subway franchisee advertising trust fund ltd.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00498
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part #57 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2022.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2022)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Subway Franchisee Advertising Trust Fund LTD., Franchise World Headquarters LLC, Subway Restaurants, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 24, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2022)
December 29, 2021 Filing 60 REPLY (re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byFranchise World Headquarters LLC, Subway Franchisee Advertising Trust Fund LTD., Subway Restaurants, Inc.. (Goodman, Mark) (Filed on 12/29/2021)
December 22, 2021 Filing 59 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE: Plaintiff''s Opposition and Objections to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice (re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byNilima Amin. (Pincin, Emily) (Filed on 12/22/2021) Modified on 12/22/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2021 Filing 58 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byNilima Amin. (Pincin, Emily) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 8, 2021 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Franchise World Headquarters LLC, Subway Franchisee Advertising Trust Fund LTD., Subway Restaurants, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/22/2021. Replies due by 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Myers in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A to Myers Declaration - RJN, #4 Exhibit B to Myers Declaration - RJN, #5 Exhibit C to Myers Declaration - RJN, #6 Exhibit D to Myers Declaration - RJN, #7 Exhibit E to Myers Declaration - RJN, #8 Exhibit F to Myers Declaration - RJN, #9 Exhibit G to Myers Declaration - RJN, #10 Declaration of Anne Kelts Assayag in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit H to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #12 Exhibit I to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #13 Exhibit J to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #14 Exhibit K to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #15 Exhibit L to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #16 Exhibit M to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #17 Exhibit N to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #18 Exhibit O to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #19 Exhibit P to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #20 Exhibit Q to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #21 Exhibit R to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #22 Exhibit S to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #23 Exhibit T to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #24 Exhibit U to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #25 Exhibit V to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #26 Exhibit W to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #27 Exhibit X to Assayag Declaration - RJN, #28 Proposed Order)(Goodman, Mark) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
November 30, 2021 Filing 56 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 7, 2021, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #55 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 12/21/2021. (Related document(s) #55 ) (Mercado, Raynee) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byNilima Amin, Karen Dhanowa. (Dogra, Shalini) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
January 21, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet with Nature of Suit. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Ev ents > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #5 Complaint filed by Nilima Amin (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amin et al v. Subway Restaurants, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Craig Goodman
Represented By: Anne Kelts Assayag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franchise world headquarters LLC
Represented By: Mark Craig Goodman
Represented By: Anne Kelts Assayag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: subway franchisee advertising trust fund ltd.
Represented By: Mark Craig Goodman
Represented By: Anne Kelts Assayag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Dhanowa
Represented By: Shalini Dogra
Represented By: Emily Rose Pincin
Represented By: Patrick McNicholas,
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilima Amin
Represented By: Shalini Dogra
Represented By: Emily Rose Pincin
Represented By: Patrick McNicholas,
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?