Cheng et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terell Sterling and Shane Cheng
Defendant: Square Inc., Freetrade, Ltd., Trading 212 Ltd., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Securities, LLC, E*Trade Securities LLC, Stash Financial, Inc., Fumi Holdings, Inc., WeBull Financial LLC, Ally Financial Inc., Melvin Capital Management LP, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Cash App Investing LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc., Interactive Brokers LLC, Dough LLC, Barclays Bank PLC, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, E*Trade Financial Holdings, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, Alpaca Securities LLC, Tastyworks, Inc., Apex Clearing Corporation, IG Group Holdings PLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., M1 Finance, LLC, Trading 212 UK Ltd., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., E*Trade Financial Corporation, eToro USA Securities, Inc. and FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00781
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 154 Refund Status re #153 Application for Refund Declined. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 153 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-15624305 by Ally Financial Inc.. (Paris, Adam) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Korinna Stefel Anderson (Anderson, Korinna) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 151 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 18, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by May 11th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 to remove location(ndrS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2021 Filing 150 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kelly Hope Yin on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. (Yin, Kelly) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Lev for Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC and Citadel Securities LLC (Lev, Marina) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 03/10/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 147 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 8, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case. Related Case. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER RELATING CASES. The parties agree that the cases should be related. (ECF Nos. 9, 14.) The cases are related because they concern substantially the same parties, property, transaction or event, and it appears likely that there will be an unduly burdensome duplication of labor and expense or conflicting results if the cases are conducted before different judges. Civ. L. R. 3-12(a). The attached order relates the cases. There is also the issue of consent: the court needs consent from all parties before it can address the cases on their merits. Williams v. King, 875 F.3d 500, 50305 (9th Cir. 2017). There have been declinations in some of the related cases, and they have been reassigned to district judges. The defendants in those cases have the option of consenting to the magistrate jurisdiction. N.D. Cal. Gen. Order 44(E)(4); N.D. Cal. Local R. 73-1(b). The plaintiff here has not consented either. The court asks the parties to confer on the issue of consent in three business days. Any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The effect of this related-case order will be that the case will be reassigned absent consent of the parties to the undersigneds jurisdiction. The court also apologizes for the late response to the motion: it did not hit the court's radar until relatively recently, and it took some time to look at the related cases. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/05/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 145 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Founders Fund Growth Principals Fund, LP, Corporate Parent The Founders Fund Growth, LP for FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC. (Llewellyn, Paul) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 144 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apex Clearing Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Apex Clearing Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent PEAK6 Investments LLC for Apex Clearing Corporation. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 143 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apex Clearing Corporation identifying Corporate Parent APEX CLEARING HOLDINGS LLC, Corporate Parent PEAK6 Investments LLC for Apex Clearing Corporation. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Gregory M. Boyle is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 3, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Robin Nunn is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 3, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 140 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15650228.) filed by The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boyle, Gregory) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 139 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15643807.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/02/2021 filed by Stash Financial, Inc.. (Nunn, Robin) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 138 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stash Financial, Inc. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Floren on behalf of Defendant Stash Financial, Inc. (Floren, Joseph) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 136 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citadel GP LLC for Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC; Corporate Parent Citadel Securities GP LLC for Citadel Securities LLC. (Hoeflich, Adam) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents .This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #130 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 135 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ally Financial Inc. (De Leeuw, Marc) (Filed on 3/2/2021) Modified on 3/2/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Janet Jones-Duffey is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 1, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Gina Cora is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 1, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Brian Weinstein is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 1, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 131 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC (Hoeflich, Adam) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 130 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC (Hoeflich, Adam) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shane Cheng, Terell Sterling re #102 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 128 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Dough LLC to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by Shane Cheng, Terell Sterling. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 127 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tastyworks, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tastytrade, Inc. for Tastyworks, Inc.. (Haskins, Thomas) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 126 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15632297.) filed by ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Jones-Duffey, Janet) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 125 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15632281.) filed by ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Cora, Gina) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 124 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15632268.) filed by ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Weinstein, Brian) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 123 Certificate of Interested Entities by ETrade Financial Corporation, identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate E*TRADE Financial Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate E*TRADE Financial, LLC for ETrade Financial Corporation. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 122 Certificate of Interested Entities by ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc. for ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 121 Certificate of Interested Entities by ETrade Securities LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate ETCM Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate E*TRADE Financial Holdings, LLC for ETrade Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 120 Certificate of Interested Entities by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc. for Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 119 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ETrade Financial Corporation, identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate E*Trade Financial, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate E*TRADE Financial Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for ETrade Financial Corporation. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 118 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 117 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ETrade Securities LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate ETCM Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate E*TRADE Financial Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for ETrade Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 116 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 2/26/2021) Modified on 3/1/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Allen Niemi on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. (Niemi, Kyle) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Marc De Leeuw is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 112 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15624643.) filed by Ally Financial Inc.. (Paris, Adam) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Monek Anderson (Monek Anderson, Eric) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 110 Certificate of Interested Entities by Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Index Ventures, Other Affiliate Baiju Bhatt, Other Affiliate Vladimir Tenev for Robinhood Markets, Inc. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 2/25/2021) Modified on 2/26/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2021 Filing 109 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Dough LLC served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Allison Gerard is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Thomas G. Haskins, Jr. is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Brandon Wisoff (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Paul Olszowka is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Seth Paris on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. (Paris, Adam) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Hope Yin on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. (Yin, Kelly) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/25/2021. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15621220.) filed by Tastyworks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gerard, Allison) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15620895.) filed by Tastyworks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing)(Haskins, Thomas) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 99 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15621027.) filed by Tastyworks, Inc.. (Olszowka, Paul) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Dale Rising (Rising, Kevin) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Hauck on behalf of Defendant The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 96 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Open to the Public Investing, Inc. to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by Shane Cheng, Terell Sterling. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Jane Brewer (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 94 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sequoia Capital Operations LLC (Olivar, Harry) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sequoia Capital Operations LLC (Olivar, Harry) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Service waived by Open to the Public Investing, Inc. waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 91 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by Shane Cheng, Terell Sterling. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr (Olivar, Harry) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by Melvin Capital Management LP identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Melvin Capital Management LP. and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Grange, Kevin) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 88 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cash App Investing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Square, Inc., Corporate Parent Third Party Technologies Inc. for Cash App Investing LLC. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cash App Investing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Square, Inc., Corporate Parent Third Party Technologies Inc. for Cash App Investing LLC. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 86 Certificate of Interested Entities by Square Inc. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Square Inc. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred Carroll Pfeiffer, Jr on behalf of Square, Inc. and Cash App Investing LLC (Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda S Lee on behalf of Square, Inc. and Cash App Investing LLC (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Richard D. Owens is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Lilia B. Vazova is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2021.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Lawrence E. Buterman is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard D. Owens ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15606775.) filed by Barclays Bank PLC. (Heyler, Colleen) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Lilia B. Vazova ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15606770.) filed by Barclays Bank PLC. (Heyler, Colleen) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Lawrence E. Buterman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15606763.) filed by Barclays Bank PLC. (Heyler, Colleen) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 76 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barclays Bank PLC identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Bank PLC. (FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and L.R.3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons) (Heyler, Colleen) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Elise Heyler (Heyler, Colleen) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 74 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by Shane Cheng, Terell Sterling. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 73 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant WeBull Financial LLC to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by Shane Cheng, Terell Sterling. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Brendan J. Coffman is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 22, 2021. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15603819.) filed by Open to the Public Investing, Inc.. (Coffman, Brendan) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 70 Certificate of Interested Entities by Open to the Public Investing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Public Holdings, Inc. for Open to the Public Investing, Inc.. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Justina Kahn Sessions on behalf of Defendant Open to the Public Investing, Inc. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Ryan O'Rourke on behalf of Defendant Open to the Public Investing, Inc. (O'Rourke, Kenneth) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/22/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 66 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Melvin Capital Management LP.. (Redburn, Thomas) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 64 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC.. (Broome, Stephen) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/5/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Ally Financial Inc. served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. ETrade Securities LLC served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Adam L. Hoeflich. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 59 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shane Cheng, Terell Sterling.. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Terell Sterling (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 57 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shane Cheng (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15581667.) filed by Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hoeflich, Adam) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. WeBull Financial LLC served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Tastyworks, Inc. served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Stash Financial, Inc. served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Robinhood Financial, LLC served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Melvin Capital Management LP served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Fumi Holdings, Inc. served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. eToro USA Securities, Inc. served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Citadel Securities LLC served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Cash App Investing LLC served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Steig D. Olson. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15572142.) filed by Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Olson, Steig) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Maya Ginsburg. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas Redburn. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Zarema Jaramillo. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher D. Kercher. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William A. Burck. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15567464.) filed by Melvin Capital Management LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ginsburg, Maya) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15567436.) filed by Melvin Capital Management LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Redburn, Thomas) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15567397.) filed by Melvin Capital Management LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Jaramillo, Zarema) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Oliver Grange on behalf of Melvin Capital Management LP (Grange, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15565405.) filed by Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kercher, Christopher) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15565072.) filed by Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burck, William) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Thomas Reinheimer for Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC and Citadel Securities LLC (Reinheimer, Justin) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 11, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Andrew Broome for Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC and Citadel Securities LLC (Broome, Stephen) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 10, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. M1 Finance, LLC served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 10, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Robinhood Markets, Inc. served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 10, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Robinhood Securities, LLC served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 10, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. TD Ameritrade, Inc. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bryan Daniel Gant. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jack Edward Pace. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to J. Mark Gidley. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Bryan Daniel Gant ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15555741.) filed by Apex Clearing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Heather) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jack Edward Pace ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15555723.) filed by Apex Clearing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Heather) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for J. Mark Gidley ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15555695.) filed by Apex Clearing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Heather) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Burke on behalf of Apex Clearing Corp (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. ETrade Financial Corporation served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Barclays Bank PLC served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Apex Clearing Corporation served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Alpaca Securities LLC served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Shane Cheng, Terell Sterling Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. The Charles Schwab Corporation served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Square Inc. served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Sequoia Capital Operations LLC served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. Charles Schwab & Co. Inc. served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ally Financial Inc., Alpaca Securities LLC, Apex Clearing Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Cash App Investing LLC, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, Dough LLC, ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC, Freetrade, Ltd., Fumi Holdings, Inc., IG Group Holdings PLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, M1 Finance, LLC, Melvin Capital Management LP, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, Square Inc., Stash Financial, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Trading 212 Ltd., Trading 212 UK Ltd., WeBull Financial LLC, eToro USA Securities, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 2, 2021 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety in ONE summons listing out all the parties in attachment pages. Re: #4 Proposed Summons filed by Terell Sterling, Shane Cheng. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/16/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15516981.). Filed byTerell Sterling, Shane Cheng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/1/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheng et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square Inc.
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Alfred Carroll Pfeiffer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freetrade, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trading 212 Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Kercher
Represented By: Adam L Hoeflich
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Broome
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Justin Thomas Reinheimer
Represented By: William Anthony Burck
Represented By: Marina Lev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Securities LLC
Represented By: Gina M Cora
Represented By: Brian S Weinstein
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stash Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Robin L Nunn
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fumi Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WeBull Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Allen Niemi
Represented By: Kelly Hope Yin
Represented By: Adam Seth Paris
Represented By: Marc De Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Capital Management LP
Represented By: Maya Ginsburg
Represented By: Thomas E Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Zarema Arutyunova Jaramillo
Represented By: Kevin Oliver Grange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: Gina M Cora
Represented By: Brian S Weinstein
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash App Investing LLC
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Alfred Carroll Pfeiffer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interactive Brokers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dough LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Richard D. Owens
Represented By: Lilia B Vazova
Represented By: Colleen Elise Heyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation
Represented By: Gregory M Boyle
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Financial Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Gina M Cora
Represented By: Brian S Weinstein
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Securities LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Kercher
Represented By: Adam L Hoeflich
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Broome
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Justin Thomas Reinheimer
Represented By: William Anthony Burck
Represented By: Marina Lev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open to the Public Investing, Inc.
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: Brendan Jasper Coffman
Represented By: Kenneth Ryan O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital Operations LLC
Represented By: Korinna Stefel Anderson
Represented By: Linda Jane Brewer
Represented By: Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpaca Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tastyworks, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Gerard
Represented By: Paul Olszowka
Represented By: Kevin Dale Rising
Represented By: Thomas G. Haskins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Clearing Corporation
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Bryan Daniel Gant
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IG Group Holdings PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M1 Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trading 212 UK Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Financial Corporation
Represented By: Gina M Cora
Represented By: Brian S Weinstein
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eToro USA Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC
Represented By: Paul Timothy Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terell Sterling
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Anupama K. Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Cheng
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Represented By: Anupama K. Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?