Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Khan et al
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training & Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California and Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Iqbal Bano Khan, Sierra Building Maintenance, LLC, Mohammed Khan and Sierra Building Maintenance
Case Number: 4:2021cv01176
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 5/19/2021 01:30 PM has been rescheduled to 5/12/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than 5/5/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, record ing, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.u scourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training & Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California.. (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/19/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Iqbal Bano Khan, Mohammed Khan, Sierra Building Maintenance, Sierra Building Maintenance, LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/4/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Iqbal Bano Khan, Mohammed Khan, Sierra Building Maintenance, Sierra Building Maintenance, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15587927.). Filed byLaborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training & Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lozano-Batista, Concepcion) (Filed on 2/17/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Khan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Kristina Marie Zinnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health & Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Kristina Marie Zinnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Training & Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Kristina Marie Zinnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Kristina Marie Zinnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iqbal Bano Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Building Maintenance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Building Maintenance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?