National Interstate Insurance Company v. Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: National Interstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, Inc., PREVOST CAR (US), INC, SEG AUTOMOTIVE NORTH AMERICA LLC and Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv01593
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #21 Steven B. Epstein's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15910261.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/30/2021 filed by PREVOST CAR (US), INC. (Epstein, Steven) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15910261.) filed by PREVOST CAR (US), INC. (Julian, Jocelyn) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Please re-file the application using the ECF login and password for the attorney who seeks to be admitted. Re: #20 MOTIO N for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15910261.) filed by PREVOST CAR (US), INC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SEG AUTOMOTIVE NORTH AMERICA LLC.. (Brainich, Marc) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice John A. Hubbard ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15782407.) filed by SEG AUTOMOTIVE NORTH AMERICA LLC. (Brainich, Marc) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Eric A. Parzianello ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15782350.) filed by SEG AUTOMOTIVE NORTH AMERICA LLC. (Brainich, Marc) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Interstate Insurance Company.. (Aziz, Zahra) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #3 : Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled to 6/16/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/23/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) Modified on 3/23/2021 (ig, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT SEG AUTOMOTIVE NORTH AMERICA LLC Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant SEG Automotive North America LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc... (Julian, Jocelyn) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 DEFENDANT SEG AUTOMOTIVE NORTH AMERICA LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND bySEG AUTOMOTIVE NORTH AMERICA LLC. (Brainich, Marc) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Zahra H Aziz (Aziz, Zahra) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Volvo Group North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent VNA Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent AB Volvo, Other Affiliate Mack Trucks, Inc. for Volvo Group North America, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Julian, Jocelyn) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by PREVOST CAR (US), INC identifying Corporate Parent AB Volvo, Other Affiliate VNA Holding, Inc. for PREVOST CAR (US), INC. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Julian, Jocelyn) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #6 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc., #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc., #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volvo Group North America, LLC, Corporate Parent PREVOST CAR (US), INC for PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Julian, Jocelyn) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volvo Group North America, LLC for PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Julian, Jocelyn) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PREVOST CAR (US), INC for PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Julian, Jocelyn) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 5, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. The corre ct event can be found at: Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[1-5] Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Prevost), [1-6] Certification of Interested Entities or Persons ( VGNA) and [1-7] Corporate Disclosure Statemen,, filed by PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Answer filed in Superior Court of California, County of Marin on March 5, 2021. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/19/2021. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV2003562. with jury demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15663810). Filed by PREVOST CAR (US), INC, Volvo Group North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 SEG's Consent to Removal, #4 Consent to Removal by Defendant Robert Bosch, #5 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Prevost), #6 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (VGNA), #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Julian, Jocelyn) (Filed on 3/5/2021) Modified on 3/8/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Interstate Insurance Company v. Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Interstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Zahra H Aziz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jocelyn Ann Julian
Represented By: Anthony Evan Sonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREVOST CAR (US), INC
Represented By: Jocelyn Ann Julian
Represented By: Anthony Evan Sonnett
Represented By: Steven B. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEG AUTOMOTIVE NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: William Blake Rowell
Represented By: Eric A Parzianello,
Represented By: Marc Brainich
Represented By: John A. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?