NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley et al v. City Of San Jose et al
Plaintiff: Peter Allen, Jose Gustavo Flores Rodriguez, Joseph Maldonado, Leslie Vasquez, Mahmoudreza Naemeh, Yessica Riles, NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley, Megan Swift, Cindy Cuellar, Joseph Canas, Shaunn Cartwright, San Jose Peace and Justice Center, M. Michael Acosta and Alex Lee
Defendant: Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Jared Yuen, FNU Delgado, Sean Michael Curry, David Sykes, Jason Dwyer, Lee Tassio, City Of San Jose and Ronnie A. Lopez
Case Number: 4:2021cv01705
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia J. Donahue (Donahue, Alicia) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 21, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Azim Johnson (Johnson, Chris) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Hamilton re #56 Discovery Letter Brief. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022)
March 22, 2022 Filing 56 Discovery Letter BriefJoint filed by M. Michael Acosta, Peter Allen, Joseph Canas, Shaunn Cartwright, Cindy Cuellar, Jose Gustavo Flores Rodriguez, Alex Lee, Joseph Maldonado, NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley, Mahmoudreza Naemeh, Yessica Riles, San Jose Peace and Justice Center, Megan Swift, Leslie Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, Def's Rsps to Plfs' Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 1b, Defs' Resps to Plfs' Interrogs)(Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 22, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal (Carbajal, Lauren) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
December 13, 2021 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCity Of San Jose, Sean Michael Curry, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Ronnie A. Lopez, David Sykes, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen. (Chow, Yue-Han) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED REQUEST TO ENLARGE DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER AND ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #52 Stipulation. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 10, 2021 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ENLARGE DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER filed by City Of San Jose, Sean Michael Curry, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Ronnie A. Lopez, David Sykes, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen. (Pritchard, Matthew) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/22/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/21/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/14/2022. Motion for class certification to be heard by 11/10/2022. Designation of Experts due by 11/18/2022. Rebuttal Reports due by 1/6/2023. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/3/2023. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 4/20/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Jury Selection and Jury Trial (3 weeks) set for 10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2021)
October 21, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16520783.) filed by M. Michael Acosta, Peter Allen, Joseph Canas, Shaunn Cartwright, Cindy Cuellar, Jose Gustavo Flores Rodriguez, Alex Lee, Joseph Maldonado, NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley, Mahmoudreza Naemeh, Yessica Riles, San Jose Peace and Justice Center, Megan Swift, Leslie Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shroff, Zal) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 21, 2021 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety re #49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice. ***Addres s of record is incorrect (does not reflect Kansas address). Co-counsel address of record is incomplete.*** (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 18, 2021 Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/pjh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconfe rence are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 14, 2021 Filing 47 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City Of San Jose, Sean Michael Curry, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Ronnie A. Lopez, David Sykes, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen. (Chow, Yue-Han) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #43 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Hamilton re #27 Motion to Dismiss. (pjhlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 11, 2021 Filing 44 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/12/21, before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #40 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/4/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2021. (Related documents(s) #40 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 9/11/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order filed by NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Redlined version of proposed protective order)(Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 42 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 2:00 PM is VACATED until the pleadings are settled. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/12/2021 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Motion Hearing held on 8/12/2021 re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ronnie A. Lopez, Sam Liccardo, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, City Of San Jose, David Sykes, Sean Michael Curry, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 38 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY; PLEASE IGNORE; SAME AS DOCUMENT NO. #37 *** Statement: Chart Requested by the Court re #35 Order, by M. Michael Acosta, Peter Allen, Joseph Canas, Shaunn Cartwright, Cindy Cuellar, Jose Gustavo Flores Rodriguez, Alex Lee, Joseph Maldonado, NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley, Mahmoudreza Naemeh, Yessica Riles, San Jose Peace and Justice Center, Megan Swift, Leslie Vasquez. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 8/11/2021) Modified on 8/12/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/12/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/12/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2021 Filing 37 Statement: Claims Chart Requested by the Court in its Order re Motion to Dismiss re #35 Order by M. Michael Acosta, Peter Allen, Joseph Canas, Shaunn Cartwright, Cindy Cuellar, Jose Gustavo Flores Rodriguez, Alex Lee, Joseph Maldonado, NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley, Mahmoudreza Naemeh, Yessica Riles, San Jose Peace and Justice Center, Megan Swift, Leslie Vasquez. (Ressl-Moyer, Tifanei) (Filed on 8/11/2021) Modified on 8/12/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2021 Filing 36 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing re #27 Motion to Dismiss set for 8/12/2021 at 01:30 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/pjh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proce edings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (F iled on 8/11/2021)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/10/2021. (pjhlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY (re #27 MOTION to Dismiss) ISO Req. for Judicial Notice and Incorporation By Reference in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by City Of San Jose, Sean Michael Curry, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Ronnie A. Lopez, David Sykes, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen. (Chow, Yue-Han) (Filed on 7/19/2021) Modified on 7/20/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2021 Filing 33 REPLY (re #27 MOTION to Dismiss) filed by City Of San Jose, Sean Michael Curry, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Ronnie A. Lopez, David Sykes, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen. (Pritchard, Matthew) (Filed on 7/19/2021) Modified on 7/20/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2021 Filing 32 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byNAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 31 OBJECTIONS to Defendants Request for Judicial Notice filed in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by M. Michael Acosta, Peter Allen, Joseph Canas, Shaunn Cartwright, Cindy Cuellar, Jose Gustavo Flores Rodriguez, Alex Lee, Joseph Maldonado, NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley, Mahmoudreza Naemeh, Yessica Riles, San Jose Peace and Justice Center, Megan Swift, Leslie Vasquez. (Flynn, Robert) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 30 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byM. Michael Acosta, Peter Allen, Joseph Canas, Shaunn Cartwright, Cindy Cuellar, Jose Gustavo Flores Rodriguez, Alex Lee, Joseph Maldonado, NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley, Mahmoudreza Naemeh, Yessica Riles, San Jose Peace and Justice Center, Megan Swift, Leslie Vasquez. (Flynn, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR PAGE EXTENSION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #28 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Page Extension for Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss re #27 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by City Of San Jose, Sean Michael Curry, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Ronnie A. Lopez, David Sykes, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen, Peter Allen, Joseph Canas, Shaunn Cartwright, Cindy Cuellar, Jose Gustavo Flores Rodriguez, Alex Lee, Joseph Maldonado, NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley, Mahmoudreza Naemeh, Yessica Riles, San Jose Peace and Justice Center, Megan Swift, Leslie Vasquez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Allowing Excess Pages)(Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 6/30/2021) Modified on 7/1/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City Of San Jose, Sean Michael Curry, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Ronnie A. Lopez, David Sykes, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/6/2021. Replies due by 7/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice and Incorporation by Reference ISO Motion to Dismiss)(Pritchard, Matthew) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on September 16, 2021 at 2:00 P.M. - Videoconference Only, the HONORABLE PHYLLIS J. HAMILTON will conduct the Initial Case Management Conference previously noticed for June 17, 2021, in this matter. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME FOR BRIEFING RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #24 Stipulation. Motion to Dismiss due by 6/7/2021. Opposition due 7/6/2021. Reply due 7/19/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME FOR BRIEFING RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, filed by City Of San Jose, Sean Michael Curry, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Ronnie A. Lopez, David Sykes, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen, Peter Allen, Joseph Canas, Shaunn Cartwright, Cindy Cuellar, Jose Gustavo Flores Rodriguez, Alex Lee, Joseph Maldonado, NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley, Mahmoudreza Naemeh, Yessica Riles, San Jose Peace and Justice Center, Megan Swift, Leslie Vasquez . (Pritchard, Matthew) (Filed on 5/12/2021) Modified on 5/13/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Case C-21-1705-PJH is NOT related to case C-21-1849-BLF. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/23/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON MOTION TO RELATE re 21-cv-00519-SVK. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/15/2021. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) Modified on 4/16/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/5/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON MOTION TO RELATE IN 20-CV-04824-BLF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/5/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to assigned to the case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Matthew W Pritchard as Counsel, filed by City Of San Jose, Sean Michael Curry, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Ronnie A. Lopez, David Sykes, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen (Pritchard, Matthew) (Filed on 3/30/2021) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Case Management Conference held on 3/30/2021. The pending motion to relate cases 20-cv-04824-BLF and 21-cv-01705-NC was discussed. Total Time in Court: 33 minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. For Plaintiffs Sanderlin et al. in 20-cv-04824-BLF: Sarah Marinho via Zoom webinar. For Plaintiffs NAACP of San Jose/Silicon Valley et al. in 21-cv-01705-NC: Rachel Lederman and Tifanei Ressl-Moyer via Zoom webinar. For Defendants: Ardell Johnson, Yue-Han Chow, and Matthew Pritchard via Zoom webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/30/2021)
March 25, 2021 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 26, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 25, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City Of San Jose.. (Chow, Yue-Han) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 26, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/23/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #9 Order, #11 Opposition/Response to Motion on Consolidation by NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Relate Case ) Defendants' Statement in Opposition to Consolidation filed byCity Of San Jose. (Chow, Yue-Han) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #9 Order on Potential Consolidation by NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER PROVIDING PARTIES OPPORTUNITY TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/15/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/25/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City Of San Jose, Sean Michael Curry, FNU Delgado, Jason Dwyer, Edgardo Garcia, Sam Liccardo, Ronnie A. Lopez, David Sykes, Lee Tassio, Jared Yuen. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/25/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Relate Case: C-20-4824-BLF filed by NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 3/11/2021) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT corrected to include cover sheet against All Defendants. Filed byNAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15685792.). Filed byNAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley. (Lederman, Rachel) (Filed on 3/11/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley et al v. City Of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Garcia
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Represented By: Matthew W. Pritchard
Represented By: Yue-Han Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Liccardo
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Represented By: Matthew W. Pritchard
Represented By: Yue-Han Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Yuen
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Represented By: Matthew W. Pritchard
Represented By: Yue-Han Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Delgado
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Represented By: Matthew W. Pritchard
Represented By: Yue-Han Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Michael Curry
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Represented By: Matthew W. Pritchard
Represented By: Yue-Han Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sykes
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Represented By: Matthew W. Pritchard
Represented By: Yue-Han Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Dwyer
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Represented By: Matthew W. Pritchard
Represented By: Yue-Han Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Tassio
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Represented By: Matthew W. Pritchard
Represented By: Yue-Han Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Represented By: Yue-Han Chow
Represented By: Matthew W. Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie A. Lopez
Represented By: Matthew W Pritchard
Represented By: Matthew W. Pritchard
Represented By: Yue-Han Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Allen
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gustavo Flores Rodriguez
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Maldonado
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Vasquez
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmoudreza Naemeh
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yessica Riles
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAACP of San Jose/ Silicon Valley
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Chris Azim Johnson
Represented By: Alicia J. Donahue
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Swift
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Cuellar
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Canas
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaunn Cartwright
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Jose Peace and Justice Center
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Michael Acosta
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Lee
Represented By: Tifanei Nikol Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Lauren Jacqueline Carbajal
Represented By: Zal Kotval Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?