Stewart Cellars, LLC v. West Coast Wine Partners LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stewart Cellars, LLC
Defendant: BACAS HOLDINGS LTD, West Coast Wine Partners LLC doing business as Madrone Estate at Valley of the Moon Winery, Bacas Holding, Inc. and Bacas Holdings, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2021cv02153
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 Amended Summons Issued as to Bacas Holding, Inc., Bacas Holdings, Ltd., West Coast Wine Partners LLC. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Stewart Cellars, LLC as to Bacas Holdings, Ltd., West Coast Wine Partners LLC. (Passarelli, Christopher) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, against West Coast Wine Partners LLC, Bacas Holdings Ltd., Bacas Holding, Inc.. Filed by Stewart Cellars, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons (ALL))(Passarelli, Christopher) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/3/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bacas Holdings, Ltd., West Coast Wine Partners LLC. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2021 02:00 PM. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stewart Cellars, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Michael Stewart, Other Affiliate Caroline Stewart Guthrie, Other Affiliate James Stewart for Stewart Cellars, LLC. (Passarelli, Christopher) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Passarelli, Christopher) (Filed on 3/30/2021) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stewart Cellars, LLC.. (Passarelli, Christopher) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Passarelli, Christopher) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bacas Holding, Ltd., West Coast Wine Partners LLC (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15759799). Filed by Stewart Cellars, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Passarelli, Christopher) (Filed on 3/26/2021) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart Cellars, LLC v. West Coast Wine Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BACAS HOLDINGS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Wine Partners LLC doing business as Madrone Estate at Valley of the Moon Winery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacas Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacas Holdings, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart Cellars, LLC
Represented By: Christopher James Passarelli
Represented By: Brett Jay Leininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?