Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC v. Logitech, Inc.
Plaintiff: Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC
Defendant: Logitech, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv02554
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Erica J. Van Loon (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC.. (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Logitech, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patents (cc: form mailed to register). (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Logitech, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15812363.). Filed byCorrelated Magnetics Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC v. Logitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC
Represented By: Erica J. Van Loon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?