American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Just Futures Law, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Immigrant Defense Project and Mijente Support Committee
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 4:2021cv02632
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/3/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee.. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. Correction of Dkt 10 (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed Summons for Attorney General's Office)(Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. Correction of Dkt 9 (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. Correction of Dkt 8 (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. Correction of Dkt 7 (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 20, 2021 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, filed by Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, #9 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, filed by Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, #10 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, filed by Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, #8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, filed by Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. Service on United States (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed Summons for Attorney General's Office)(Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/28/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing Fee $402, receipt number 0971-15829272). Filed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/13/2021) Modified on 4/14/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Futures Law
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immigrant Defense Project
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mijente Support Committee
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?