Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. v. IEE Indoor Environmental Engineering
Plaintiff: Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: IEE Indoor Environmental Engineering
Case Number: 4:2021cv02884
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Attorney Arif Virji must update ECF profile with current contact information. [err102] Re: #20 Notice of Appearance filed by IEE Indoor Environmental E ngineering. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byIEE Indoor Environmental Engineering. (Virji, Arif) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 21, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Arif Virji (Virji, Arif) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by IEE Indoor Environmental Engineering, Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. (Shafer, Jessica) (Filed on 5/18/2021) Modified on 5/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Amanda Lee DeFord (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15958726) filed by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. (DeFord, Amanda) (Filed on 5/12/2021) Modified on 5/13/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2021 Filing 16 Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.s Certificate of Service of Order Setting Case Management Conference and Requiring Joint Case Management Conference Statement. (Gershen, Alexander) (Filed on 5/5/2021) Modified on 5/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/5/21.Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2021 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698#The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/05/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc... (Gershen, Alexander) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Lucy Jewett Wheatley. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Corrected Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15906453.) Filing fee previously paid on April 29, 2021 filed by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.. (Wheatley, Lucy) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 *** Please see #10 for Corrected Filing *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15906453.) filed by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.. (Wheatley, Lucy) (Filed on 4/29/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. re Remark, Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.s Notice Regarding AO Form 120 (Gershen, Alexander) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. re #6 Summons Issued, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, (Gershen, Alexander) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to IEE Indoor Environmental Engineering. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 REMINDER to Counsel - submit missing documents: Counsel is reminded to docket the AO120 form- Report on Filing of Action Regarding Patent or Trademark using ECF event Patent/Trademark Report. The form can be found on our civil forms webpage. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AirClean Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Falfurrias Capital Partners III, LP, Corporate Parent Charles H. Waddell for Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.. (Gershen, Alexander) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gershen, Alexander) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15868490.). Filed byGlobal Plasma Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gershen, Alexander) (Filed on 4/21/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Plasma Solutions, Inc. v. IEE Indoor Environmental Engineering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IEE Indoor Environmental Engineering
Represented By: Jessica Catherine Shafer
Represented By: Arif Virji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Plasma Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Jacob Gershen
Represented By: Amanda DeFord
Represented By: Lucy Jewett Wheatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?