Jones v. State Farm General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Jones and Shannon B. Jones, Trustees of the Jeffrey & Shannon Jones Trust, Jeffrey M. Jones and Shannon B. Jones
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv04172
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byState Farm General Insurance Company. (Roberts, Todd) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJeffrey M. Jones, Shannon B. Jones. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State Farm General Insurance Company.. (Roberts, Todd) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 29, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State Farm General Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/8/2021. Replies due by 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Todd A. Roberts, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Todd A. Roberts, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Todd A. Roberts, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Todd A. Roberts, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Todd A. Roberts, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Todd A. Roberts, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Todd A. Roberts, #9 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Todd) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey M. Jones, Shannon B. Jones (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey M. Jones, Shannon B. Jones (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #10 Certificate of Service filed by Shannon B. Jones, Jeffrey M. Jones (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jeffrey M. Jones.. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 3, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:21-cv-4172-DMR. Re: #8 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Jeffrey M. Jones (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jeffrey M. Jones identifying Corporate Parent None for Jeffrey M. Jones. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to State Farm General Insurance Company. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 2, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The Correct event is Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. The corr ect event is found under Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #4 Notice (Other) filed by Jeffrey M. Jones (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/16/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jeffrey M. Jones and Shannon B. Jones, Trustees of the Jeffrey & Shannon Jones Trust Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Jeffrey M. Jones and Shannon B. Jones, Trustees of the Jeffrey & Shannon Jones Trust (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 6/2/2021) Modified on 6/3/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm General Insurance Company with jury demand( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16033868.). Filed by Jeffrey M. Jones and Shannon B. Jones, Trustees of the Jeffrey & Shannon Jones Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Shannon) (Filed on 6/2/2021) Modified on 6/3/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. State Farm General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd Andrew Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Jones and Shannon B. Jones, Trustees of the Jeffrey & Shannon Jones Trust
Represented By: Shannon Ball Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Jones
Represented By: Alan Palmer Jacobus
Represented By: Shannon Ball Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon B. Jones
Represented By: Shannon Ball Jones
Represented By: Alan Palmer Jacobus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?