Jackson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Jackson and Queen Jackson
Defendant: U.S. Bank and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2021cv04677
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 26 Statement of Non-Opposition re #22 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Dev D. Patel filed byU.S. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Kolesin, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 25 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by U.S. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kolesin, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearings on the ( #9 , #11 ) motions to dismiss, previously set for September 16, 2021 and the case management conference, previously set for October 5, 2021, are all continued to October 21, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 23, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Judges name is incorrect on the signature line of the Proposed Order. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should refere nce the Judges name as Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on future filings. Re: #22 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Dev D. Patel filed by Robert Jackson, Queen Jackson (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must notice the #22 motion to withdraw as counsel for hearing before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 22 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Dev D. Patel filed by Queen Jackson, Robert Jackson. Responses due by 8/5/2021. Replies due by 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Patel, Dev) (Filed on 7/22/2021) Modified on 7/22/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for OCTOBER 5, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by SEPTEMBER 28, 2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-04677-HSG.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. of Standing Order for District Judge Haywood S. Gilliam. Jr. (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 19 Renotice motion hearing re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint to September 16, 2021 at 2:00 p.m., Courtroom 2 filed byWells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 12, 2021 Filing 18 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed byU.S. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Logan, Jana) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 7/9/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/7/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Bank.. (Logan, Jana) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT U.S. BANK Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendant U.S. Bank shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/2/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING CHAMBERS COPIES. Pursuant to General Order 78, the courtesy copy requirement in the local rules is suspended pending further notice, unless a judge orders otherwise in a specific case. Accordingly, the filing party shall lodge a chambers copy of #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. Bank, and all related documents and tabbed exhibits, if applicable, within 5 days of this order. The chambers copy must comply with Para. 5 of the undersigned's standing order, available at: https://cand.uscourts.gov/kaw_standing_order_general_2_11_2021/ Additionally, the parties shall lodge chambers copies of all briefing pertaining to this pending motion within 3 days of filing. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/25/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. Bank. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 7/8/2021. Replies due by 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Logan, Jana) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed byWells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 7/8/2021. Replies due by 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, N.A. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. by U.S. Bank, N.A. (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2021) Modified on 6/21/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is MSC21-00790. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 0971-16088703). Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2021) Modified on 6/21/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jackson
Represented By: Dev Dilip Patel,
Represented By: Gary Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queen Jackson
Represented By: Dev Dilip Patel,
Represented By: Gary Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank
Represented By: Jana Logan
Represented By: Matthew Henry Aguirre
Represented By: Michael J Kolesin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?